Deborah M Webb v. Jp Morgan Chase et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC498502

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo California Reconveyance Company, Defendant/Respondent
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Doies 1 - Z, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Equity Title Company, Defendant/Respondent
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Jp Morgan Chase Bank"
No Logo West Coast Escrow, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Webb Deborah M., Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Type Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 07/08/2013
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Request for Certified Copy
    Blank 32 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Notice Of Ruling
    RE RELATED CASES
      Blank 31 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice-Related Cases
        Blank 30 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Notice of Entry of Judgment
          Blank 29 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Notice
          OF ENTRY OF ORDER EXPUNGING LIS PENDENS
            Blank 28 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Order
            EXPUNGING LIS PENDENS
              Blank 27 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice
                Blank 26 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Judgment*
                FOR DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIONAL BROKERAGE COMPANY, EQUITY TITLE COMPANY AND WEST COAST ESCROW
                  Blank 25 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Notice
                    OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
                      Blank 23 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Joinder
                      IN THE DEMURRER
                        Blank 22 Filed: 5/25/2013, Entered: 5/25/2013 Opposition Document
                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 Demurrer
                          ntc of hearing of demurrer
                            Blank 20 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                            after hearing on motion to compel deposition of plaintiff and production of documents
                              Blank 19 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Notice
                              of non-opposition to defts motion to compel pltffs deposition
                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Exparte Application
                                  FOR ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION DECLARATION OF MARIA T. MANNING; MEMO P&As IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                      NAME OF PERSON SERVED: STEFAN PEROVICH, ESQ.
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 First Amended Complaint
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Motion to Compel
                                                DEPOSITION
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Opposition Document
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Exparte Application
                                                          for order shortening time to advance hearing on demurrer
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Order
                                                            granting ex parte application
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Demurrer
                                                              TO COMPLAINT
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Complaint

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?