Sudha Tokala v. Donald J Trump et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC502452

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bandera Crane Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Bandera Fisher Family Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Bandera Fisher Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Bandera Grosfeld Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Bandra Richard Fisher Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Bicknell Ryan, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo California Fund Control Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Collingridge Tracy, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Crane Joshua, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Davis, Richard Dean, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Division Fiduciaria, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 Through 300p Inclusive, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Dolker Jason, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo First American Fund Control Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Fisher, Adam, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Fisher, Richard, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Frere Maria Laure, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Grosfeld Jason, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Hourston Renee, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Irongate Capital Partners Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Irongate Deelopment, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Irongate Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Irongate Wilshire Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo J.p. Morgan Grupofinanciero, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Landamerica Title Company, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Lawyers Title Company, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Low Voltility Advisors Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Mann Robert Brendan, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Mka Capital Group Advisors Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Mka Real Estate Fund Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Mka Real Estate Opportunity Fund I Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Morgan Banco J.p., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Pb Impulsores S.a. De C.v., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Punta Bandera Investores Usa Ii Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Resort Dynamics Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo S&p Destination Properties L.p., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo S&p Destination Properties S.a. De D.v., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo S&p Destination Properties U.s. Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo S.a.institucion De Banca Multiple, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Sanchez Mark, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Southland Title Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Southland Title Of San Diego, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Sugarman Jason, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Susel Matias Rodolfo, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Trump Corporation The, Defendant/Respondent
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant/Respondent
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Trump Donald Jr"
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant/Respondent
Trump Marks Baja LLC Trump Marks Baja LLC, Defendant/Respondent
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Defendant/Respondent
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Trump Organization Inc. The"
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Trump Organization Llc The"
No Logo Tokala Sudha, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Park & Sylva

Type Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 11/15/2013
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Request and Entry of Dismissal
ENTIRE ACTION
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Notice-Settlement
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Statement-Case Management
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Notice of Case Assignment
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Notice of Reassignment and Order
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Partial Dismissal
            with Prejudice) (see attachment 1
              Blank 6 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
              2
                Blank 5 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Partial Dismissal
                  with Prejudice) (as to Punta Bandera Investments USA,LLC and Does 51-100
                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 Partial Dismissal
                    with Prejudice) (see attachment 1
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 Notice-Case Management Conference
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 Complaint

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1,211 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?