Polline Dormayr v. Christian Walter Banerjee
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC508548

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dormayr Polline, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Banerjee Christian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rich Randall B.
No Logo Banerjee Christian Walter, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Dormayr Polline, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Law Offices Of Michael E. Fox

Type Intentional PI/PD/WD (eg. assault) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Verdict 06/19/2015
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 103 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Motion
FOR STATUTORY ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; FOX DECLARATION
    Blank 102 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Memorandum Of Costs
    TOTAL - $573,771.36
      Blank 101 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Declaration
      SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS
        Blank 100 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Judgment*
          Blank 99 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Notice of Entry of Judgment
            Blank 98 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Opposition
            TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
              Blank 97 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Notice
              OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT [PROPOSED JUDGMENT]
                Blank 96 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Stipulation
                RE: EXHIBITS, IS SIGNED AND FILED THIS DATE.
                  Blank 95 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Stipulation and Order
                  REGARDING FACTS, EVIDENCE AND LIABILITY FOR: 1. ASSAULT; AND 2. BATTERY SUBMITTED BY COUNSEL.
                    Blank 94 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Statement of Damages
                    REVISED
                      Blank 93 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Motion in Limine
                      #6 - FOR COURT LEAVE TO INTRODUCE DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY INTO EVIDENCE AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; FOX DECLARATION
                        Blank 92 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 miscellaneous other
                        PLAINTIFF DORMAYR'S [PROPOSED] RVISED WRITTEN VOIR DIRE QUESTIONNAIRE
                          Blank 91 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Statement of Case
                          SHORT
                            Blank 90 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Exhibit
                            REVISED LIST OF PRE MARKED
                              Blank 89 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Request For Judicial Notice
                                Blank 88 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Opposition
                                TO DEFENDANT'S MOITON IN LIMINE #6 TO PRECLUDE ALL PRIOR STATEMENTS MADE ON FACEBOOK
                                  Blank 87 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Opposition
                                  TO DEFNEDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO PRECLUDE PLAINITFF FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S FELONY CONVICTIONS; FOX DECLARATION
                                    Blank 86 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Opposition
                                    TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO PRECLUDE PLAINITFF FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE OF THE BANERJEE FAMILY TRUST
                                      Blank 85 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Opposition
                                      #3 - TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND EXEMPLARY DAMGES; FOX DECLARATION
                                        Blank 84 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Opposition
                                        #2 - TO PRECLUDE PLAINITFF FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES; FOX DECLARATION
                                          Blank 83 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Opposition
                                          TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES; FOX DECLARATION
                                            Blank 82 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Reply
                                            TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED
                                              Blank 81 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Reply
                                              TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF OF HER BURDEN OF PROVING DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL CONDITION AND TO PRECLUDE DEFENDAN FROM OBJECTING TO EXEMPLARY...
                                                Blank 80 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Statement of Case
                                                SHORT
                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 List of Witnesses
                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Exhibit
                                                    PRE MARKED
                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Notice
                                                      OF DEFENDANT'S IN LIMINE MOTION #6 DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Brief
                                                        TRIAL
                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Reply
                                                          TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE NO DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY
                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Opposition
                                                            TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY
                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Declaration
                                                              SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY
                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice
                                                                OF DEFENDANT'S IN LIMINE MOTION #1; DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice
                                                                  OF DEFENDANT'S IN LIMINE MOTION #3 DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice
                                                                    OF DEFENDANT'S IN LIMINE MOTION #4 DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Opposition
                                                                      TO PLAINTIFF'S IN LIMINE MOTION #3 DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Opposition
                                                                        TO PLAINTIFF'S IN LIMINE MOTION #1; DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice
                                                                          OF DEFENDANT'S IN LIMINE MOTION #5 DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice
                                                                            OF DEFENDANT'S IN LIMINE MOTION #2 DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Opposition
                                                                              TO PLAINTIFF'S LIMINE MOTION #2; DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Notice of Motion
                                                                                TO REOPEN DISCOVERY; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                  SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM CALLING EXPERT WITNESSES TO TESTIFY
                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                    #5 - TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM CALLING EXPERT WITNESSES TO TESTIFY; MEMORANDUM OF PINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                      SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENSES TO ASSAULT AND BATTERY
                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                        #4 - TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENSES TO ASSAULT AND BATTERY
                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                          SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED; HISTORY OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE; INFLUENCE OF DRUGS/ALCOHOL; FAKE ID; AND UNDERAGE PRESENCE IN A BAR;
                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                            #3 - TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF OF HER BURDEN OF PROVING DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL CONDITION AND TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM OBJECTING TO EXEMPLARY DAMAGES IN THE ABSENCE OF PROOF; MEMORANDUM ...
                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                              SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO RELIEVE PLAITNIFF OF HER BURDEN OF PROVING DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL CONDITION AND TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM OBJECTING TO ...
                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                #1 - TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                  SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY
                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                    #2 - TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED; HISTORY OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE; INFLUENCE OF DRUGS/ALCOHOL; FAKE ID; AND UNDERAGE PRESENCE IN A BAR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL - OPPOSING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL TWO MENTAL EXAMS
                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL - SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL TWO MENTAL EXAMS
                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Motion
                                                                                                          FOR INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF; CCP 2032.210; 2032.310 2032.650; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RANDALL RICH
                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Reply
                                                                                                            TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH, MODIFY, CONDITION COMPLIANCE WITH AND/OR PROTECT AGAINST, SUBPOENAS AND COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PAY COSTS AND FEES INCURRED
                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL - FOX DECLARATION SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MOTION TO QUASH, MODIFY, CONDITION COMPLIANCE WITH AND/OR PROTECT AGAINST, SUBPOENAS AND COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PAY COSTS...
                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM; DECLARATIO NOF RANDALL RICH
                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                  TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL TWO MENTAL EXAMS
                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                    OPPOSING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL TWO MENTAL EXAMS
                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                      TO EVIDENCE SUPPORTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMS
                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Statement - General
                                                                                                                        SEPARATE - IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMS
                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                          SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH, MODIFY CONDITION COMPLIANCE WITH AND/OR PROTECT AGAINST, SUBPOENAS AND COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PAY COSTS AND FEES INCURRED
                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Statement - General
                                                                                                                            SUPPORTING MOTION TO QUASH, MODIFY, CONDITION COMPLIANCE WITH AND/OR PROTECT AGAINST, SUBPOENAS AND COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PAY COSTS AND FEES INCURRED
                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                              MODIFY CONDITION COMPLIANCE WITH AND/OR PROTECT AGAINST, SUPBOENAS AND COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PAY COSTS AND FEES INCURRED; MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Transfer of Action
                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                    RE EPA RE MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAM. OF PLT
                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                      OF MICHAEL FOX
                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                        RE MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAM. OF PLT
                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER RE TRANSFER TO SANTA MONICA DEPT O
                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                            RE TRANSFER TO DEPT 55 JUDGE MACKEY
                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014 Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                CIVIL DEPOSIT
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                  OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                    RE DISCOVERY ISSUES
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                      in supporting plaintiff's opp to defendant's motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                        to defendant's motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                          RE DEFT EX PARTE
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                            RE RESET MOTION
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                              OF MICHAEL E FOX
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                RE CONT MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF FINANCIAL INFO.
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Motion for an Order
                                                                                                                                                                    PERMITTING THE DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL INFORMATION
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                      (7) FILED DECLARATIONS
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE DEFENDANT BANERJEE'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                465980128
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY FROM COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                        OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Statement of Damages
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Memorandum - Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES X2 DOC
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Notice of Reassignment and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    1/14/14
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                      1/22/14
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (DENIED

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 552 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?