Regina Hill v. Gizaw Kifle et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC516207

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Administrative Services Cooperative Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Kifle Gizaw, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Hill, Regina, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Green Bryant & French LLP

Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
(FILED BY ADMIN SERVICES) 10-21-15 11-3-15
    Blank 13 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Motion in Limine
    #1 - TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY BY PLTNFS RETAINED EXPERT MARTIN J. BACKMAN, M.D.
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
        Blank 11 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
        (FILED BY A.S.C.) 3-9-15 3-18-15
          Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Brief
          TRIAL
            Blank 9 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Request for Jury Instructions
            JOINT
              Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 List of Exhibits
              JOINT
                Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Statement of Case
                JOINT
                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Substitution of Attorney
                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Answer to Complaint
                      ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES COOPERATIV E, INC., AND GIZAW KIFNE
                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Proof-Personal Service
                        Summons & Complaint, etc.
                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Proof-Personal Service
                          Summons & Complaint, etc.
                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Complaint

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 164 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?