Haleh Iryami v. Ryan Manuel Karapetian et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC526926

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Karapetian German, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Karapetian Ryan Manuel, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Iryami Haleh, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Law Offices Of Burg & Brock

Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 09/30/2015
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Request and Entry of Dismissal
W/ PREJ ENTIRE ACTION
    Blank 8 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 OSC-DISMISSAL
    Notice of Settlmnt
      Blank 7 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Notice-Settlement
        Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
        PI - CONTINUE FSC/TRIAL FSC 9/21/15 TRIAL 10/5/15
          Blank 5 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Answer
            Blank 4 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Demand For Jury Trial
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Receipt
              #464980079
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Proof of Service
                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Complaint

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 270 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?