Grace Qunying Zhao Tzao v. Kyle Lee Andrusenki et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC536727

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrusenki Cynthia, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

No Logo Andrusenki Kyle Lee, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

No Logo Does 1 Through 10, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

No Logo Tzao Grace Qunying Zhao, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 01/16/2015
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUES OF ACTION
    Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Answer
      Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Proof-Service/Summons
        Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Proof-Service/Summons
          Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Complaint

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 97 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?