Mackarvich, et al v. Minute Man Anchors, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02608
District Judge Julie E. Carnes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 4:31 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles J. Mackarvich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334
No Logo Tie Down, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334
No Logo Minute Man Anchors, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
No Logo Minute Man Products, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
v.
No Logo Minute Man Anchors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Minute Man Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Robert Slotkin, Jr. +1 404 370 1041 bobby@slotkincaiola.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flint & Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cort R. Flint, Jr. +1 864 232 4261
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Lee, Jr. +1 864 232 4261

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Charles J. Mackarvich, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334
No Logo Tie Down, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Orrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Porter +1 404 233 2334 aporter@porterorrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Orrison & Doster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simuel F. Doster, Jr. +1 404 233 2334
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 281
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes, dismissing complaint and counterclaims w/prejudice (cc) (jph) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes, Discovery ends 5/1/02 , motions for sum jgm due 5/21/02, if no motions for sum jgm then pre-trial order due on 5/31/02 , [37-1] order to be submitted on 6/3/02 if no motions for sum jgm or pto filed Parties are reminded to comply w/LR 5.1B regarding font (cc) (jph) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None
      Attorney appearance for defendants by Frank B. Strickland and F. Robert Slotkin, Jr. (jph) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
        Application for admission of Cort R. Flint Jr. pro hac vice for defendants (to JEC) (jph) (Entered: 09/12/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: None
          Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule. (to judge) (jph) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: None
            Certificate of interested persons. (to judge) (jph) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None
              ANSWER by Charles J. Mackarvich, Tie Down, Inc. to counterclaim [31-2] . (jph) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                ANSWER by Minute Man Anchors, Minute Man Products to complaint [11-1] and COUNTERCLAIM against Charles J. Mackarvich, Tie Down, Inc. Discovery ends 12/9/01, 8/1/01 for Charles J. Mackarvich (jph) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None
                  Supplement by plaintiff to [23-1] response (jph) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [25-1] motion for leave to file supplement to plas' memorandum in opposition to dfts' motion to dismiss, DENYING [22-1] motion to dismiss by Minute Man Products, Minute Man Anchors, DENYING [22-2] motion to transfer case by Minute Man Products, Minute Man Anchors, DENYING [22-3] motion to stay by Minute Man Products, Minute Man Anchors, (cc) (jph) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None
                      REPLY by defendant to response to [22-1] motion to dismiss, [22-2] motion to transfer case, [22-3] motion to stay (jph) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                        REPLY by defendants to response to [22-1] motion to dismiss (jph) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: None
                          Memo by CRD striking [24-1]response reply to, The dfts are directed to refile this pldg w/i 5 days [26-1] notice to be submitted on 5/22/01 Parties are reminded to comply w/LR 5.1B regarding font. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 05/10/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None
                            MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file supplement to plas' memorandum in opposition to dfts' motion to dismiss with supplement attached. (jph) Modified on 05/08/2001 (Entered: 05/08/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None
                              REPLY by defendants to response to [22-1] motion to dismiss ***Struck per ntc dated 5/9/01 for font violation*** (jph) Modified on 05/10/2001 (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
                                Memorandum by plaintiff in opposition to [22-1] motion to dismiss, [22-2] motion to transfer case, [22-3] motion to stay (jph) (Entered: 04/11/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by defendants to dismiss , to transfer case , or to stay with brief in support. (jph) (Entered: 04/09/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [17-1] motion to extend time for 10 days thru 4/3/01 subsequent to the determination of whether the plas can amend their cmp for dfts' to reply to [12-1] response, DENYING w/o prejudice [5-1] motion to dismiss by Minute Man Anchors Answer to complaint due 4/9/01 for Minute Man Products, for Minute Man Anchors, (cc) (jph) (Entered: 04/02/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None
                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Minute Man Products mailed 2/2/01 Answer due by 4/3/01 for Minute Man Products, for Minute Man Anchors (jph) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: None
                                        Letter by defendant stating that they were accepting service of the amd cmp and agree that the answer is due 4/3/01. (jph) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                                          Memo by CRD stating that no motion is needed to amend the complaint. Hence, the amended cmp will be accepted for filing. The dft is directed to file an answer. or motion to dismiss w/i 10 days. The parties are reminded to comply with LR 7.1D regarding font. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by defendant to extend time for 10 days subsequent to the determination of whether the plas can amend their cmp for dfts' to reply to [12-1] response with order attached. (jph) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
                                              Memo by CRD reminding parties that pldgs must comply with LR 7.1D regarding font. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                Response regarding amended cmp by plaintiff in opposition to [14-1] notice (jph) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                  Memo by CRD pla must file a motion, brief and proposed order to amend the cmp or submit a consent order within 20 days. Parties are reminded to comply w/ LR 7.1D. The parties are hereby put on notice that the court may not accept pldgs that violate the above local rules. (cc by CRD) (jph) (Entered: 02/27/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of filing depositions of Robert Hanson and Albert Moreno Jr. by plaintiff. (jph) (Entered: 02/22/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                      Memorandum by plaintiff in opposition to [5-1] motion to dismiss (jph) (Entered: 02/22/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiffs adding Minute Man Products (jph) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [7-1] motion to extend time for pla to respond to defendant's [5-1] motion to dismiss, [5-1] motion to dismiss to be submitted on 2/26/01 (cc) (web) (Entered: 01/09/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                            Notice to take deposition of Minute Man Products, Inc. by plaintiffs (web) (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                              Notice to take deposition of Minute Man Anchors, Inc by plaintiffs (web) (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to respond to defendant's [5-1] motion to dismiss with brief in support. (dfb) (Entered: 12/29/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Julie E. Carnes GRANTING [4-1] motion to extend time thru 12/8/00 for dft to answer [1-1] complaint, Answer due 12/8/00 for Minute Man Anchors (cc) (web) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION by defendant to dismiss with brief in support. (adg) (Entered: 12/12/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      Consented MOTION by defendant to extend time thru 12/8/00 for dft to answer [1-1] complaint (To JEC for approval) (web) (Entered: 12/08/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Minute Man Anchors mailed 10/5/00. Answer due by 12/4/00 for Minute Man Anchors (web) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                          ANSWERS TO MANDATORY DISCLOSURES by plaintiffs. (web) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT filed. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 460918 (web) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?