Whiteman Industries v. Monarch Industries, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00480
District Judge Marion J. Callister, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Marion J. Callister
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 8:49 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Whiteman Industries, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Dykas & Shaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 208 327 8900 frank@dykaslaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Ken Pedersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ken Pedersen +1 208 343 6355 +1 208 343 6341 ken@pedersenco.com

Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy S Howe +1 208 334 1211 +1 208 334 9375 amy.howe@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Monarch Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by PERRY LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B Perry +1 208 338 1001 mbp@perrylawpc.com

Represented by Stewart Taylor & Morris PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom C. Morris tmorris@belnaplaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/22/1993, Entered: None
CONSENT JUDGMENT by Honorable Marion J. Callister Judgment for plaintiff and dft, Monarch, and all persons in active concert or participation with them who receive notcie hereof, are enjoined against infringing or contributing to the infringement of any claim of the '327 and '198 patent during the unexpired term thereof; each party shall bear own costs and atty. fees; terminating case Book: Page: (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 02/25/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Thomas C. Morris regarding motion to vacate jury trial of 3//8/93 9:30 [24-1], regarding motion to extend scheduling deadlines and cutoff dates previously set in Status Conference Order of 7/8/92 [24-2] (mn) (Entered: 01/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Monarch Industries in support of motion to vacate jury trial of 3//8/93 9:30 [24-1], of motion to extend scheduling deadlines and cutoff dates previously set in Status Conference Order of 7/8/92 [24-2] (mn) (Entered: 01/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Monarch Industries to vacate jury trial of 3/8/93 9:30 , and to extend scheduling deadlines and cutoff dates previously set in Status Conference Order of 7/8/92 (mn) Modified on 02/16/1993 (Entered: 01/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/1992, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting stipulation re dft's identification of expert witnesses extended from 12/16/92 to 12/31/92 [22-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 12/30/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/1992, Entered: None
STIPULATION re dft's identification of expert witnesses (mn) (Entered: 12/17/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/1992, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSE FOR TRIAL -Tom Blotter- by plaintiff Whiteman Industries (mn) (Entered: 11/19/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Thorne Research Inc 11/5/92 at 9:00 am in Coeur d'Alene, Idaho (gl) (Entered: 11/03/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/16/1992, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Thorne Research Inc 10/29/92 at 9:00 am (gl)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/17/1992, Entered: None
ANSWER to second amended complaint by defendant Monarch Industries (jb) (Entered: 09/25/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/1992, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff Whiteman Industries; jury demand (mn) (Entered: 09/04/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/1992, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting plas motion to amend complaint [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 08/07/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/1992, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PAST DUE RESPONSE TO MOTION re motion to amend complaint [9-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 8/4/92 (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/1992, Entered: None
STIPULATION to amend complaint (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/8/1992, Entered: None
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister, see minutes of 7/7/92 #12 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 08/05/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/1992, Entered: None
MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE - ; Teleconf held 7/7/92 ; Discovery ddl set 1/15/93 ; pretrial statement ddl 2/26/93 ; Jury trial set 3/8/93 9:30 , ; Motion Filing ddl set 2/15/93 MJC (al) (Entered: 07/08/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/6/1992, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Whiteman Industries in support of motion to amend complaint [9-1] (al) (Entered: 07/07/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/6/1992, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Marvin E. Whiteman (al) (Entered: 07/07/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/1992, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff Whiteman Industries to amend complaint (al) (Entered: 07/07/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/9/1992, Entered: None
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Telephonic Status Conference set for 10:00 7/7/92 before MJC in Boise (al) (Entered: 06/10/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/1992, Entered: None
ANSWER by defendant Monarch Industries (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Monarch Industries through counsel on 1/31/92 (al)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/1992, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting stipulation allowing Monarch Industries to be substituted for Monarch Industries Ltd. [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (al) (Entered: 01/30/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: None
STIPULATION allowing Monarch Industries to be substituted for Monarch Industries Ltd. (al) (Entered: 01/28/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Whiteman Industries terminating defendant Monarch Industries; adding Monarch Industries, John Does 1 - 10 (al) (Entered: 01/28/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/1991, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Monarch Industries on 11/19/91 (al) (Entered: 12/04/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/1991, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for patent infringement, trade dress infringement and unfair competition (Summons(es) issued) (consent notice issued/furnished) (al) (Entered: 11/18/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 32 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?