Okor v. Atari Games Corp., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-11503
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 1:15 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Joseph Kwame Okor, Plaintiff

Represented by Joseph Kwame Okor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Kwame Okor
No Logo Atari Games Corp, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Porter +1 617 367 0025 +1 617 367 2155 porterm@jacksonlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Porter +1 617 367 0025 +1 617 367 2155 porterm@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo Midway Games, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com
v.
No Logo Atari Games Corp, Defendant

Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com
No Logo Bandai Co, Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell W. Binns +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rbinns@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas C Doskocil +1 617 570 1215 +1 617 523 1231 ddoskocil@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Lewis D'Amato Brisbois & Brisgaard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Makous +1 213 250 1800 +1 213 250 1800
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glen S. Umeda +1 213 250 1800
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Y. Lau +1 650 988 8500
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart P. Meyer +1 650 858 7286 +1 650 858 7286 smeyer@fenwick.com

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Porter +1 617 367 0025 +1 617 367 2155 porterm@jacksonlewis.com

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl M Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@velaw.com
No Logo Jaleco Usa, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Brody & Jacobs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Brody +1 617 367 3300 +1 617 367 8697
No Logo Konami Of America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mirut P. Dalal +1 214 978 3097
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Charles McCormack +1 214 978 3007 +1 214 978 3099 brian.mccormack@bakermckenzie.com

Represented by ForbesGallagher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Owen Gallagher +1 617 273 9570 +1 508 613 9480 ogallagher@gallagherlaw.com

Represented by Gallagher & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett J. Harris +1 617 598 3810 +1 617 598 3500 gharris@forbesgallagher.com

Represented by Masuda, Funai, Eifert & Mitchell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence P. Becker
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy E. Sasamoto
No Logo Midway Games, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com

Represented by Jenkens & Gilchrist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marion B. Adler
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL J. BURNHAM. +1 312 425 8513
No Logo Namco of America Inc., Defendant

Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore E. Dinsmoor +1 617 345 3825 +1 617 345 3299 TDinsmoor@B-L.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RONALD L.WANKE
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel T. Pelz +1 312 222 9350 +5270 527 527 0484 jpelz@jenner.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/05/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin G. McGurn +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 kmcgurn@seyfarth.com

Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Tocci +1 617 542 6200 +1 617 542 6201 jtocci@toccilee.com
No Logo Sammy USA Corp., Defendant

Represented by Bell Boyd & Lloyd, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY H. CANFIELD,

Represented by Fitzhugh & Mariani LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/21/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Cashore Mariani +1 617 695 2330 +1 617 695 2335 amariani@fitzhughlaw.com

Represented by Laff, Whitesel, Conte & Saret, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin L. Stern, Esq.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C. Trock +1 312 661 2100 +6610 661 661 0029

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/02/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Robins +1 617 345 1000 +1 866 382 5886 mrobins@nixonpeabody.com

Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/21/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence R. Robins lrobins@sandw.com

Represented by Unknown Entity DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Bazarian +1 978 296 4755 +1 978 470 8338 sbazarian@dfllp.com
Sega Enterprises, Ltd. Sega Enterprises, Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Bruce Bower +1 404 653 6465 bruce.bower@finnegan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard H. Smith +1 202 408 4000

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter B. Ellis +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 pellis@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Taito of America Inc., Defendant
No Logo Joseph Kwame Okor, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Joseph Kwame Okor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Kwame Okor
Space Joseph Kwame Okor
Space Joseph Kwame Okor
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (155) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
Mandate from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Re: appeal AFFIRMING the judgment of the district court. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
    USCA for the Federal Circuit Notice of Entry of Judgment Accompanied by Opinion; The district court's judgments in all three cases are affirmed. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: None
      Notice of change of address filed by Darryl M. Woo in 1:00-cv-11503 by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 . (eye) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Memorandum and Order entered. The defendants in these actions press a motion to stay appeal until the plaintiff provides a bond appeal to secure costs. I decline to issue the stay. Throughout, I have sought to decide on the merits the plaintiff's several cases concerning his patent rights. As my multiple memoranda resolving the cases make clear, I did not view plaintiff's contentions to be frivolous or without foundation. I decline to condition his appeal of my determinations upon facilitation of the defendants' collection efforts for litigation related costs. Terminating: [149-1] motion for reconsideration of [0-0] endorsed order re: motion to require Okor to post bond [EOD Date 1/24/03] cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
          Letter from Garrett Harris dated: 1/22/03 to: J. Woodlock re: w/enclosed Federal Circuit Order filed. (eaf) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
            Letter by Garrett Harris in 1:00-cv-11503 dated: 1/2/03 to: Judge Woodlock re: motion to reconsider filed. (mr) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None
              Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for reconsideration of [0-0] endorsed order re: motion to require Okor to post bond , filed. (mr) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None
                Order of the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: [137-1] appeal; Joseph Kwame Okor moves for reconsideration of the court's order dismissing his appeals for failure to pay the filing fee. Okor has now paid the filing fee. Based on these circumstances, the court grants Okor's motion to reinstate his appeal. See Order No. 148 for further details. (jr) (Entered: 11/22/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None
                  Receipt for return of sealed documents #87 and #95 to Gallagher & Gallagher. (mr) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Order re: return of sealed documents, entered. cc/cl [EOD Date 8/20/02] (mr) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: None
                      Mandate of US Court of Appeals for The Federal Circuit re: [137-1] appeal, dismissing [137-1] appeal. (jr) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: None
                        Memorandum by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 in opposition to [142-1] motion to require Okor to post Bond for defendants' costs and fees on appeal , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                          Memorandum by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [142-1] motion to require Okor to post Bond for defendants' costs and fees on appeal , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                            Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 to require Okor to post Bond for defendants' costs and fees on appeal , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                              Memorandum and Order re: bill of costs entered.Costs taxed against Joseph K. Okor for: Jaleco - $920.55 (on 00-11503 anc 00-11504); Konami - $1,758.20 (on 00-11503 and 00-11504); Capcom - $1,758.29 (on 00-11503 and 00-11503); Nintendo - $40.40 (on 01-10610) and Nintendo - $4,748.68 (on 98-12176). cc/cl [EOD Date 5/28/02] (mr) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: None
                                Notice of filing bill of costs by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 by Nancy E. Sasamoto in 1:00-cv-11503, Laurence P. Becker in 1:00-cv-11503, filed. (Bill of costs received for filing) (mr) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: None
                                  Affidavit of Brian C. McCormack in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: Bill of Costs , filed. (mr) Modified on 05/08/2002 (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                    Affidavit of Emily Lau Ward in 1:00-cv-11503, re:bill of costs , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None
                                      Notice of appeal to Federal Circuit by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 filed. Appealing: [136-1] judgment order, [135-1] memorandum order (mr) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Judgment entered for Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 against Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503. Dismissal of all plaintiff's claims against defendants Dandai Co., LTD and Taito Corporation. cc/cl [EOD Date 3/27/02] (mr) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Memorandum and Order entered. denying [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent, granting [74-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, granting [70-2] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849, granting [66-1] motion for summary judgment, granting [88-1] motion for summary judgment, granting [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851, granting [77-1] motion for summary judgment, granting [76-1] motion for summary judgment; As to Civil Action No. 00-11503, alleging infringement of the '851 patent by ten arcade game manufacturers, I GRANT summary judgment of non-infringement to the eight defendants, duly served, who have so moved (Capcom, Jaleco, Konami, Midway, MGW, Namco, Sega, and Sammy) and direct dismissal of the case against Bandai and Taito for want of prosecution in undertaking service upon them. I DENY plaintiff Okor's cross-motion for summary judgment. As to Civil Action No. 00-11504, alleging infringement of the '849 patent by the same ten arcade game manufacturers, I GRANT summary judgment of non-infringement to the eight defendants, duly served, who have so moved (Capcom, Jaleco, Konami, Midway, MGW, Namco, Sega, and Sammy), and direct dismissal of the case against Bandai and Taito for want of prosecution in undertaking service upon them. I DENY plaintiff Okor's cross-motion for summary judgment. As to Civil Action No. 01-10610, alleging infringement of the '851 patent by repeat defendants Sega, Nintendo and Sony, and nine additional parties, I GRANT Sega, Nintendo and Sony's motion to dismiss. Because the disposition of the motion is necessarily applicable to the remaining defendants as well, I direct the clerk to dismiss the case against them as well. I decline to grant movants Sega, Nintendo and Sony injunctive relief, or to award them reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses. cc/cl [EOD Date 3/27/02] (mr) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None
                                            Notice of change of address filed by Russell Beck in 1:00-cv-11503 by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: None
                                              Notice of change of address filed by Garrett Harris in 1:00-cv-11503 by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: motion hearing; Okor's failure to serve defendant Bandai is to be dismissed out for failure to prosecute/failure to perfect service through the Hague convention; issue of sanctions addressed; [112-1] motion to strike [106-1] affidavit, [105-1] statement of undisputed facts taken under advisement, [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement the patent taken under advisement, [74-1] motion for judgment of non-infringement taken under advisement, [70-1] motion to dismiss taken under advisement, [70-2] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849 taken under advisement, [66-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement, [88-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement, [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 taken under advisement, [77-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement, [76-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Transcript of proceedings for held on proceeding date: 2/20/02 before Judge: Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of appearance of attorney for Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 by Stephen C. Bazarian, filed. (mr) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of withdrawal of counsel by attorney Lawrence R. Robins for Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, attorney Amy C. Cashore for Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 filed. (mr) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Certificate of R. Bruce Bower in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [127-1] motion for R. Bruce Bower to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 36952 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Motion by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503 for R. Bruce Bower to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 36952 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Affidavit of Stuart P. Meyer in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [125-1] motion for Stuart P. Meyer to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 37043 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 for Stuart P. Meyer to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 37043 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Assented to Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to continue motion hearing , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: Motion hearing set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [112-1] motion to strike [106-1] affidavit, [105-1] statement of undisputed facts, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [74-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [70-1] motion to dismiss, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [70-2] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [66-1] motion for summary judgment, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [77-1] motion for summary judgment, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [76-1] motion for summary judgment, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [88-1] motion for summary judgment . cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    Reply by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      Assented to Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 for leave to file reply memorandum late , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        Reply by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [76-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                          Reply by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [74-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                            Reply by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [88-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate of service by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [116-1] statement, [115-1] opposition response , filed. (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                Statement of Facts by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  Reply by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [70-2] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    Reply by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [77-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      Reply/response by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 to [105-1] statement , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        Motion by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 to strike [106-1] affidavit, [105-1] statement of undisputed facts , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          Reply by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to response to [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                            Compbined Response by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 to [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent and reply to palintiff's respond to defendants Jaleco USA, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment as to non-infringement, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                              Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to extend time to 10/5/01 to file replies/oppositions , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                Exhibits by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Statement of Facts by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [104-1] cross motion for summary judgment of infringement of the patent , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Cross motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment of infringement of the patent , and opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Letter by Russell Beck in 1:00-cv-11503 dated: 8/27/01 to: Judge Woodlock re: motion to enlarge time filed. (mr) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Assented to Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 to extend time to 9/14/01 to respond to motions for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration of Yasumichi Kaneko, re: [76-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. (copy of declaration filed as exhibit 1 to memorandum in support) (mr) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of change of address filed by Theodore E. Dinsmoor in 1:00-cv-11503 by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Stipulated Protective Order entered. cc/cl [EOD Date 7/17/01] (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for Mirut Dalal to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 32421 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for Brian C. McCormack to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 32421 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of appearance of attorney for Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 by Garrett Harris, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Richard T. Wisniewski, re: [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 , filed. FILED UNDER SEAL. (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Declaration of Brian McCormack, re: [93-1] motion to seal/impound declaration of Richard Wisniewski , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to seal/impound declaration of Richard Wisniewski , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for leave to late file Declaration of Richard Wisniewski , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Emily S. Lau in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [88-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Mr. Takashi Kubuzono, re: [88-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Memorandum by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [88-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT (declaration) placed in vault. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Brian C. McCormack, re: [85-1] motion to seal/impound declaration , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to seal/impound declaration , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Mirut P. Dalal, re: [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Facts by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [81-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '851 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibits by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 [77-1] motion for summary judgment (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Facts by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [77-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [77-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Motion by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment , with memorandum in support, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix/exhibits by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [74-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment of non-infringement , with memorandum in support, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 for leave to file brief in excess of 20 pages , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Facts by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [70-1] motion to dismiss, [70-2] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [70-1] motion to dismiss, [70-2] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 to dismiss , and for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix/exhibits by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [66-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [66-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Facts by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 re: [66-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of withdrawal of counsel by attorney Kristin G. McGurn for Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Nancy E. Sasamoto in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [62-1] motion for Laurence Becker & Nancy Sasamoto to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 31763 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Laurence P. Becker in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [62-1] motion for Laurence Becker & Nancy Sasamoto to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 31763 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 for Laurence Becker & Nancy Sasamoto to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 31763 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Status report by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Answer to amended Complaint and counterclaim by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, filed. Answer amends [50-1] answer to amended complaint .; jury demand (mr) (Entered: 05/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to [45-1] Scheduling order by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to [45-1] Scheduling order by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Daniel J. Burnham , re: [55-1] motion for Marion B. Adler and Daniel J. Burnham to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: 100.00 Receipt #: , filed. , filed. (jf) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Marion B. Adler , re: [55-1] motion for Marion B. Adler and Daniel J. Burnham to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: 100.00 Receipt #: , filed. , filed. (jf) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 for Marion B. Adler and Daniel J. Burnham to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: 100.00 Receipt # 31033: , filed. (jf) Modified on 05/18/2001 (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Ronald L. Wanke in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [53-1] motion for Ronald Wanke to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30850 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for Ronald Wanke to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30850 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to amended complaint, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of appearance of attorney for Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 by Kristin G. McGurn, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to amended complaint and Counterclaim by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 against Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of change of address filed by Lawrence R. Robins in 1:00-cv-11503 by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 . (mr) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Richard Smith, re: [47-1] motion for Richard Smith to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30518 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to Motion by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503 for Richard Smith to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30518 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of proceedings for held on proceeding date: 4/23/01 before Judge: Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Scheduling Order entered setting SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. cc/cl [EOD Date 4/27/01] (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: scheduling conference; some parties to be served still; by 5/21/01 Okor to report on what steps he has taken to serve defendants who have not yet been served; Midway & Atari to file answer to amended complaint by 5/8/01 - See 00-11504 and 00-10610 for further details. Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of appearance of attorney for Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503 by Owen Gallagher, filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Darryl Woo , re: [40-1] motion for Emily Lau & Darryl Woo to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 30456 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Emily S. Lau, re: [40-1] motion for Emily Lau & Darryl Woo to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 30456 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 for Emily Lau & Darryl Woo to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 30456 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 to amended complaint, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 04/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to complaint; jury demand and Counterclaim by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 against Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 04/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer to complaint and Counterclaim by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 against Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 , filed. Demand for jury trial. (mr) (Entered: 04/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Statement/Status report by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503, Sega Enterprises in Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11503 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status report by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 04/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 2:30 4/23/01 . cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Emily S. Lau in support of [32-1] opposition response , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 in opposition to [29-1] motion to amend [1-1] complaint , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [30-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RENEWED Motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503 to dismiss , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 to amend [1-1] complaint , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11503 to amended complaint, filed.; jury demand (fmr) (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of appearance of attorney for Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 by Steven M. Brody, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 to stay proceedings , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of appearance of attorney for Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11503 by Russell Beck, filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Peter B. Ellis dated: 11/15/00 to: Joseph Okor re: Serving Sega Enterprises filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 for Kevin C. Trock to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: 50.00 Receipt #: 26702 , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 for Martin L. Stern to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: 50.00 Receipt #: 26703 , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 for Jeffrey H. Canfield to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: 50.0 Receipt #: 26704 , filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of appearance of attorney for Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11503 by Mark D. Robins, Amy C. Cashore, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of change of address filed by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 . c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: Status Conference; Plaintiffs to serve defendants per Hague Convention motion to dismiss denied wop; service is not quashed; Hague convention to be satisfied w/in 60 days as to all others not served. Motion to extend tim to answer 20 days after ruling on SJ in 98-12177;12176; Case is stayed for 20 day period following action in 98-12176 & 12177;Okor to provide an address where mail can be sent within 3 days; # 16 allowed in 00-11503; Court Reporter: Pam Owens (fmr) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Scheduling Order entered (see document # 17, for full Scheduling Order). cc/cl [EOD Date 11/1/00] (fmr) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to convert scheduling conference to status conference , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 2:30 10/31/00 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/29/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to complaint , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Joel T. Pelz in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [12-1] motion for Joel T. Pelz to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 25359 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 for Joel T. Pelz to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 25359 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 in opposition to [5-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503 in opposition to [5-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Glen S. Umeda in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [7-1] motion for David Makous & Glen Umeda to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 24806 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 08/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of David N. Makous in 1:00-cv-11503 , re: [7-1] motion for David Makous & Glen Umeda to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 24806 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 08/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503 for David Makous & Glen Umeda to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 24806 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503 in support of [5-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503 to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of appearance of attorney for Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11503 by Douglas C. Doskocil, Russell W. Binns Jr., filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11503 to extend time to 20 days after Court's ruling on pending motions for summary judgment to respond to complaint , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/23/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11503, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11503 to extend time to 9/20/00 to respond to complaint , filed. . (mr) (Entered: 08/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Woodlock. Receipt #: 24181 Amount:$ 150. Fee Status: paid (mr) (Entered: 08/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?