Parkland Corporation v. Maxximum Company, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-00338
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 1:47 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Parkland Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Dale A. Gaar, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Lynch +1 208 331 5088 +1 208 331 0088 lynchlaw@qwest.net

Represented by Law Offices of Ken Pedersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ken Pedersen +1 208 343 6355 +1 208 343 6341 ken@pedersenco.com

Represented by Moffatt Thomas Barrett Rock & Fields, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Martin +1 208 345 2000 +1 208 385 5384 jlm@moffatt.com

Represented by Richard C Fields

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Fields
v.
No Logo David B Tower, Defendant
No Logo Duane Stueckle, Defendant

Represented by Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradlee R Frazer +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 342 3829 bfrazer@hawleytroxell.com
TERMINATED: 01/16/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene A Ritti +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 344 6505 eritti@hawleytroxell.com

Represented by HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS AND HAWLEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L Meadows +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 342 3829 CLM@HTEH.com

Represented by Moore, Smith, Buxton & Turcke, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M Allyn Dingel, Jr. +1 208 331 1800 CLB@msbtlaw.com
No Logo J Robert Tullis, Defendant

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A Donovan +1 208 334 4204 +1 208 334 4298 tom.donovan@doi.idaho.gov

Represented by ORMISTON KORFANTA DUNBAR & HOLLAND

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Ormiston +1 208 336 1234

Represented by WILLIAM R SNYDER & ASSOC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R Snyder +1 208 336 9080 +1 208 343 4539 main@wrslegal.com
No Logo Maxximum Company, Defendant

Represented by Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradlee R Frazer +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 342 3829 bfrazer@hawleytroxell.com
TERMINATED: 01/16/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene A Ritti +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 344 6505 eritti@hawleytroxell.com

Represented by HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS AND HAWLEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L Meadows +1 208 344 6000 +1 208 342 3829 CLM@HTEH.com

Represented by Moore Smith Buxton & Turcke, CHTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M Allyn Dingel, Jr. +1 208 331 1800 CLB@msbtlaw.com
No Logo Quintex Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General, Civil Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A Donovan +1 208 334 4204 +1 208 334 4298 tom.donovan@doi.idaho.gov

Represented by ORMISTON KORFANTA DUNBAR & HOLLAND

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Ormiston +1 208 336 1234

Represented by WILLIAM R SNYDER & ASSOC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R Snyder +1 208 336 9080 +1 208 343 4539 main@wrslegal.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (159) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: None
MANDATE from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals dismissing the appeal [147-1] (cd) (Entered: 06/16/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE of service of US Marshals sale by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE of service of notice of levy by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE of service of writ of execution, notice of levy and notice of US Marshals sale by Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE of service of publication of notice of sale by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of publication by James H. Benham (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE OF US MARSHALS SALE by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LEVY by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: None
STATEMENT OF ISSUED ON APPEAL by plaintiff Parkland Corporation (cd) (Entered: 02/04/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form - Transcripts not required. (cd) (Entered: 02/04/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: None
COSTS taxed for defendant Quintex Corporation in the amount of $ 4,274.28 against plaintiff Parkland Corporation (cc: all counsel) (cd)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to withdraw attorney [146-1] ; terminating attorney James B Lynch for Parkland Corporation (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 01/17/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (patent case) by plaintiff Parkland Corporation from Dist. Court decision [144-2] (cd) Modified on 02/03/1997
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to withdraw attorney (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: None
BILL OF COSTS by Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis re judgment [144-2] ; Taxation ddl set for 1/21/97 (wm) (Entered: 01/02/1997)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: None
JUDGMENT: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle ; dismissing case Book: 43 Page: 65 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 12/18/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1], granting motion for summary judgment [46-1] dismissing case (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: None
STIPULATION for revised scheduling order (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: None
MINUTES OF PENDING MOTIONS/STATUS CONFERENCE - taking under advisement on 11/13/96 the motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1] and the motion for summary judgment [46-1], finding the motion to compel discovery pursuant to subpoena directed to Morris Grigg [84-1] moot, finding the motion to compel full response by Quintex and Tullis to plas requests for production of documents numbers 32 &33 [85-1] moot, finding the motion to compel full response by Quintex and Tullis to plas second request for production of documents [87-1] moot, granting motion to strike pla's brief on pending discovery issues and affidavit of James Lynch [140-1] ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 11/25/96 for parties to submit scheduling litigation plan ; Status hearing held 11/13/96 ; All Pending Motions Hrg held 11/13/96 LMB (wm) (Entered: 11/15/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: None
OBJECTION by defs Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis to supplemental brief on pending discovery issues [138-1] (dkh) (Entered: 10/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of James B. Lynch regarding memorandum [138-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by pla of pending discovery issues (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by pla in opposition re: motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/15/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: None
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant David B Tower (wm) (Entered: 10/04/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/18/1996, Entered: None
MINUTES OF PENDING MOTIONS/STATUS CONFERENCE - denying in part motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1], granting in part that default may be entered as to David B. Tower and denying in part in that the court will defer the judgment [52-1] granting motion to set aside default [59-1], denying motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] ; Status Hrg and All Pending Motions Hrg set for 11/13/96 at 10:00am additional briefs due by 10/9/96 and responses by 10/23/96, LMB (wm) (Entered: 09/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to vacate pending hearings [131-1] ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 8/27/96 is reset for 9/18/96 at 10:00am (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 08/26/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: None
OBJECTION by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis to motion to vacate pending hearings [131-1] (wm) (Entered: 08/26/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of James B. Lynch regarding motion to vacate pending hearings [131-1] (wm) (Entered: 08/20/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to vacate pending hearings (wm) (Entered: 08/20/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney James L Martin, Richard C Fields and Ken J Pedersen for Parkland Corporation and substituting attorney James B Lynch (wm) (Entered: 08/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 8/27/96 1:30 before LMB in Boise (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 08/05/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle denying motion to clarify the memorandum decision and order of 6/4/96 [124-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: None
JOINDER by dfts Maxximum Company, Duane Stueckle joining motion to clarify the memorandum decision and order of 6/4/96 [124-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/25/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: None
RESPONSE by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis to motion to clarify the memorandum decision and order of 6/4/96 [124-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/24/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion to clarify the memorandum decision and order of 6/4/96 [124-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to clarify the memorandum decision and order of 6/4/96 (wm) (Entered: 06/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting in part and denying in part motion for updated docketing re: affidavits [107-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2], granting in part and denying in part motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3], granting in part and denying in part motion to vacate and reset trial [107-4], granting in part and denying in part motion to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe [107-5] see oder for details (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 06/05/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: None
MINUTES OF PENDING MOTIONS HEARING - taking under advisement on 5/15/96 the motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2], taking under advisement on 5/15/96 the motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3] LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by pla regarding reply memorandum in support of plas motion for reconsideration (wm) (Entered: 05/13/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of Charles R. Clark's certificate of assurance (wm) (Entered: 05/13/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of Ken J. Pedersen's certificate of assurance (wm) (Entered: 05/13/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE by Paul F. Horton's certificate of assurance (wm) (Entered: 05/13/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: None
REPLY by pla re: motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2] (wm) (Entered: 05/13/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None
JOINDER IN RESPONSE by dfts Maxximum Company, Duane Stueckle re: motion for updated docketing re: affidavits [107-1], re: motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2], re: motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3], re: motion to vacate and reset trial [107-4], re: motion to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe [107-5] (wm) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion for updated docketing re: affidavits [107-1], , granting motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3], granting motion to vacate and reset trial [107-4], granting motion to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe [107-5] motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2] 10:00 5/15/96 ; Trial set for 6/3/96 is vacated (cc: all counsel) (wm) Modified on 05/08/1996 (Entered: 05/01/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William R. Snyder in support of motion response [113-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None
RESPONSE by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis to motion for updated docketing re: affidavits [107-1], motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2], motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3], motion to vacate and reset trial [107-4], motion to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe [107-5] (wm) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Kevin W. McCann regarding motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/30/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: None
SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Ken J. Pedersen regarding motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/30/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for limited purposes for pla by Richard C Fields, James L Martin (wm) (Entered: 04/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Charles R. Clark regarding motion for updated docketing re: affidavits [107-1], regarding motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2], regarding motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3], regarding motion to vacate and reset trial [107-4], regarding motion to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe [107-5] (wm) (Entered: 04/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion for updated docketing re: affidavits [107-1], of motion for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 [107-2], of motion to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order [107-3], of motion to vacate and reset trial [107-4], of motion to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe [107-5] (wm) (Entered: 04/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for updated docketing re: affidavits , and for reconsideration of memorandum decision and order of 3/29/96 , or in the alternative to amend the 3/29/96 memorandum decision and order , and to vacate and reset trial , and to stay proceedings until the foregoing motions are ripe (wm) (Entered: 04/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting in part and denying in part motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] CASE STAYED - as to allow pla to obtain counsel , ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 4/2/96 is vacated (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 04/01/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None
REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Tim O'Neal regarding motion to set aside default [59-1], regarding motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] (wm) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None
REPLY by dfts Maxximum Company, Duane Stueckle to response to motion to set aside default [59-1], motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] (wm) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: None
RESPONSE by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis to motion to compel full response by Quintex and Tullis to plas second request for production of documents [87-1], motion to compel full response by Quintex and Tullis to plas requests for production of documents numbers 32 &33 [85-1], motion to compel discovery pursuant to subpoena directed to Morris Grigg [84-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Duane Stueckle regarding motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: None
REPLY by dfts Maxximum Company, Duane Stueckle to response to motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: None
MINUTES OF PENDING MOTION - taking under advisement on 3/21/96 the motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 4/2/96 at 10:00am LMB (wm) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: None
REPLY by dfts Maxximum Company, Duane Stueckle to response to motion for summary judgment [46-1], motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1], motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: None
SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Steven R. Ormiston regarding motion reply [97-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/22/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis to response to motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/22/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Harry Little regarding motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Duane Stueckle regarding motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis in support of motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Thomas A. Donovan regarding motion for summary judgment [46-1], regarding motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1], regarding motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by pla regarding motion to compel (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by pla re: joinder in motions [58-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Kevin W. McCann re motion response [89-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by pla to motion to set aside default [59-1], motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] (wm) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: None
MINUTES OF PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS HEARING - finding the motion for informal conference to settle discovery disputes [63-1] moot, finding the motion for protective order re: depositions of Parkland Corp and Kevin McCann [63-2] moot, motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] 10:00 3/21/96 ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 4/2/96 at 10:00am LMB (wm) (Entered: 03/18/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to compel full response by Quintex and Tullis to plas second request for production of documents (wm) (Entered: 03/18/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS by Joseph M Meier to subpoena (wm) (Entered: 03/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to compel full response by Quintex and Tullis to plas requests for production of documents numbers 32 &33 (wm) (Entered: 03/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to compel discovery pursuant to subpoena directed to Morris Grigg (wm) (Entered: 03/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING motion for informal conference to settle discovery disputes [63-1] 2:00 3/14/96, motion for protective order re: depositions of Parkland Corp and Kevin McCann [63-2] 2:00 3/14/96 before LMB in Boise (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 03/12/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of William R. Snyder regarding motion reply [81-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/11/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: None
REPLY by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis to response to motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/11/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
SECOND DECLARATION of kevin W. McCann re motion response [77-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/06/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Glenn D. Austin re motion response [77-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/06/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion response [77-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/06/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by pla to motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/06/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Duane Allen on 3/8/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SECOND NOTICE of taking deposition of J. Robert Tullis on 3/7/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SECOND NOTICE of taking deposition of Quintex Corp on 3/1/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Duane Stueckle on 3/4/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SECOND NOTICE of taking deposition of Paul Johnson on 3/6/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SECOND NOTICE of taking deposition of Dorothea Christiansen on 3/6/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Paul Johnson on 2/20/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Zero Defects, Inc served on 1/26/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Rechelle Manske served on 1/25/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Electronic Controls Co served on 1/25/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Duane Stueckle of amended complaint on 11/17/95 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Tullis, Grigg & Hytrek, P.C. served on 2/16/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Little-Morris, P.A. served on 2/16/96 (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for informal conference to settle discovery disputes , and for protective order re: depositions of Parkland Corp and Kevin McCann (wm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Bradlee R. Frazer in support of motion to set aside default [59-1], regarding motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] (wm) (Entered: 02/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Duane Stueckle in support of motion to set aside default [59-1], regarding motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] (wm) (Entered: 02/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dfts Maxximum Company and Duane Stueckle in support of motion to set aside default [59-1], of motion to enforce settlement agreement [59-2] (wm) (Entered: 02/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts Maxximum Company and Duane Stueckle to set aside default , or in the alternative to enforce settlement agreement (wm) (Entered: 02/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: None
JOINDER by dfts Maxximum Company and Duane Stueckle joining motion for summary judgment [46-1], motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1], motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/28/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None
DECLARATION Kevin W. McCann re motion response [55-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/26/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Kevin W. McCann re motion response [55-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/26/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by pla to motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/26/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Ken J. Pedersen regarding motion for entry of default as to David B Tower [52-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/20/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
BRIEF by pla in support re: motion for entry of default as to David B Tower [52-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/20/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
APPLICTION by pla for entry of default as to David B Tower (wm) (Entered: 02/20/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William R. Snyder in support of motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Steven R. Ormiston regarding motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Dorothea Christiansen in support of motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
STATEMENT OF FACTS NOT IN DISPUTE by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis in support of motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis in support of motion for summary judgment [46-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis for summary judgment (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY, by dfts Quintex Corporation, Robert Tullis with attorney Steven R Ormiston (wm) (Entered: 02/16/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 3/21/96 10:00 before LMB in Boise (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 02/09/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Judy Hanson in support of motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William R. Snyder in support of motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis in support of motion to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts [40-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis to dismiss the complaint as to these dfts (wm) (Entered: 02/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: None
AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle ; Trial set for 5/13/96 is reset for 6/3/96 at 9:00am ; Discovery ddl set for 3/12/96 ; Motion Filing ddl 2/16/96 (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle approving attorney substitution [36-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 01/22/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle finding the motion for status conference [25-1] moot, granting motion for modification of pretrial order [25-2] ; Discovery ddl set for 3/12/96 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 01/22/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Eugene A Ritti and Craig L Meadows for Duane Stueckle, and Maxximum Company and substituting attorney M Allyn Dingel, Bradlee R Frazer (wm) (Entered: 01/18/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis regarding response to requests for production (wm) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis regarding response for requests for production (wm) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Quintex Corporation on 1/10/96 (wm) (Entered: 01/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon dft David B Tower on 12/22/95 (wm) (Entered: 01/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of J. Robert Tullis on 1/12/96 (wm) (Entered: 01/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition of Dorothea Christiansen on 1/11/96 (wm) (Entered: 01/10/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla re: motion for status conference [25-1], of motion for modification of pretrial order [25-2] (wm) (Entered: 01/08/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by pla to motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 01/02/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Charles R. Clark regarding motion for status conference [25-1], regarding motion for modification of pretrial order [25-2] (wm) (Entered: 01/02/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Ken J. Pedersen regarding motion for status conference [25-1], regarding motion for modification of pretrial order [25-2] (wm) (Entered: 01/02/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for status conference , and for modification of pretrial order (wm) (Entered: 01/02/1996)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Dorothea Christiansen in support of motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/20/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William R. Snyder in support of motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/20/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dfts Quintex Corporation, J Robert Tullis in support of motion to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection [21-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/20/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None
MOTION by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis to disqualify atty Ken Pedersen and associates and for supplemental protection (wm) (Entered: 12/20/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None
ANSWER by dft Maxximum Company (wm) (Entered: 12/11/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None
ANSWER by dft Duane Stueckle (wm) (Entered: 12/11/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by pla (wm) (Entered: 11/16/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to add party dft Duane Stueckle [11-1], pla must file within 10 days and thereafter cause to served on Stueckle and amended complaint within 20 dyas after entry of this order (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 11/07/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: None
DEFAULT ENTERED as to dft Maxximum Company as to the issue of liability (wm) (Entered: 11/01/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Ken J. Pedersen regarding motion for entry of default as to Maxximum Company [13-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
BRIEF by pla in support re: motion for entry of default as to Maxximum Company [13-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for entry of default as to Maxximum Company (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
BRIEF by pla in support re: motion to add party dft Duane Stueckle [11-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
MOTION by pla to add party dft Duane Stueckle (wm) (Entered: 10/02/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: None
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle ; Status Conference held 5/9/95 ; Non-Jury Trial set for 5/13/96 at 9:00am this is a second setting, as an alternative, the trial is also set for 6/3/96 at 9:00 as a first setting ; Discovery ddl set for 1/12/96 ; Dispositive Motion ddl set for 2/16/96 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 05/12/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/1995, Entered: None
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - ; Discovery ddl set for 1/12/96 ; Motion Filing ddl 2/16/96 ; Trial set for 5/13/96 at 9:00am , pretrial conf held LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/11/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: None
REPORT OF MEETING OF COUNSEL (wm) (Entered: 04/27/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ; Scheduling Conference set for 2:30pm on 5/9/95 before LMB in Boise (wm) (Entered: 04/21/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None
ANSWER by dfts Quintex Corporation and J Robert Tullis (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon def J Robert Tullis on 12/21/94 (dkh) Modified on 12/23/1994 (Entered: 12/23/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon Dorthea Christiansen, President of dft Quintex Corporation on 11/30/94 (wm) (Entered: 12/15/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS unexecuted - attempted as to dft J Robert Tullis (wm) (Entered: 12/15/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon Duane Stueckle, registered agent for dft Maxximum Company on 11/22/94 (wm) (Entered: 12/15/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: None
COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - no summons issued (jml) (Entered: 08/02/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 36 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?