Marcum v. Wells Lamont Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:00-cv-01259
District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 1:55 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dianna Marcum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder clb@hoveywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rahm, Rahm & McVay, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Rahm +1 660 747 5152 +1 660 747 1242 kirk@rahmlaw.com
v.
No Logo Quality Stores, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PITZER SNODGRASS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Todd Applegate +1 314 421 5545 +1 314 421 3144 applegate@pspclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RABBITT AND PITZER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Priscilla F. Gunn +1 314 421 5545 +1 314 421 3144 gunn@rabbittlaw.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica L. Thompson +1 312 368 4000 monica.thompson@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack T. Bangert +1 816 960 0090 +1 816 960 0041 Jack.Bangert@kutakrock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of E. Wayne Taff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Wayne Taff +1 816 229 2579 +1 877 518 1942 ewt@tafflawfirm.com
No Logo Wells Lamont Corporation;, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica L. Thompson +1 312 368 4000 monica.thompson@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack T. Bangert +1 816 960 0090 +1 816 960 0041 Jack.Bangert@kutakrock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of E. Wayne Taff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Wayne Taff +1 816 229 2579 +1 877 518 1942 ewt@tafflawfirm.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None
CONSENT INJUNCTION AND JUDGMENT(Jones, Robin) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None
    Clerk's ORDER of Dismissal as to defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. w/prejudice(Related document(s) 25 ).(Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: None
      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Dianna Marcum. (Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Wells Lamont Corporation filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Dianna Marcum. (Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
          SCHEDULING and Trial ORDER by Judge Gaitan - discovery due by 10/30/2001; accelerated jury trial held on 3/25/2002 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 7C, Kansas City (FJG); summary judgment motions due by 12/3/2001.(Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None
            PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach, Michael Elbein, Priscilla F. Gunn, Kirk Rahm, E. Wayne Taff, Monica L. Thompson, J. Todd Applegate on behalf of all parties.(Applegate, J.) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF ENDORSEMENT filed by J. Todd Applegate of Rabbitt, Pitzer & Snodgrass on behalf of Quality Stores, Inc.(Applegate, J.) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None
                PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Jointly Submitted) filed by Michael Elbein, Kirk Rahm, Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Dianna Marcum.(Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by E. Wayne Taff of Sherman, Taff & Bangert, P.C. on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wells Lamont Corporation.(Taff, E.) (Entered: 04/10/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Elbein, Kirk Rahm, Cheryl Lynn Burbach of Shughart Thomson & Kilroy, P.C. on behalf of Dianna Marcum.(Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/09/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Arthur B. Federman with settlement conference hearing to be held on 4/27/2001 at 1:30pm (Courtroom 6B, Kansas City, Missouri).(Kee, Georgia) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Gaitan - proposed scheduling order due by 4/23/2001. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                          DESIGNATION of Place of Trial filed by E. Wayne Taff of Sherman, Taff & Bangert, P.C. on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Taff, E.) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                            Disclosure of Corporate Interests filed by E. Wayne Taff on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Taff, E.) Modified on 3/13/2001 to correct document type (Honeycutt, Cassaundra). (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to complaint (Related Doc # 1 ) (related document(s) 1 ) filed by E. Wayne Taff of Sherman, Taff & Bangert, P.C. on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Taff, E.) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                                DESIGNATION of Place of Trial filed by E. Wayne Taff of Sherman, Taff & Bangert, P.C. on behalf of Wells Lamont Corporation.(Taff, E.) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                                  STATEMENT OF CORPORATE INTEREST filed by E. Wayne Taff on behalf of Wells Lamont Corporation.(Taff, E.) Modified on 3/13/2001 to correct document type (Honeycutt, Cassaundra). (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to complaint (Related Doc # 1 ) (related document(s) 1 ) filed by E. Wayne Taff of Sherman, Taff & Bangert, P.C. on behalf of Wells Lamont Corporation.(Taff, E.) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
                                      MOTION AND ORDER for Pro Hac Vice was filed for Monica Thompson.(Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Gaitan granting defendants' motion for extension of time to answer complaint (Related Doc # 5 ) until 3/12/01 for defendants Wells Lamont Corp and Wal-Mart Stores; granting defendant Quality Stores' motion for leave to file (Related Doc # 7 ) answer. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for leave to file Answer to Complaint on behalf of Quality Stores, Inc.(Applegate, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                            Entry of Appearance of P. Gunn for Quality Stores, Inc. Filed by J. Todd Applegate of Rabbitt, Pitzer & Snodgrass on behalf of Quality Stores, Inc.(Applegate, J.) Modified on 2/22/2001 to correcty document type(Honeycutt, Cassaundra). (Entered: 02/21/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for extension of time to answer complaint (related document(s) 1 ) on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wells Lamont Corporation.(Taff, E.) (Entered: 02/20/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE filed by E. Wayne Taff of Sherman, Taff & Bangert, P.C. on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wells Lamont Corporation.(Taff, E.) (Entered: 02/20/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to complaint Filed by J. Todd Applegate of Rabbitt, Pitzer & Snodgrass on behalf of Quality Stores, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Applegate, J.) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of EAPJ was mailed to party.(Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                      COMPLAINT against Quality Stores, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wells Lamont Corporation. filed by Michael Elbein, Kirk Rahm of Shughart Thomson & Kilroy, P.C. on behalf of Dianna Marcum. Receipt #180916. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit Notice of Exhibit Attachment)(Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?