Micron Semiconductor v. Texas Instruments

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-00352
District Judge Marion J. Callister, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Marion J. Callister
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 12:40 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Micron Semiconductor, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold White & Durkee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clarence E Eriksen +1 713 787 1400 +7892 789 789 2679
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. BRYAN FARNEY
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne M Harding +1 713 787 1400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas McLemore +1 713 787 1400 +7892 789 789 2679
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GLENN W. RHODES +1 415 293 8185
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES D. SMITH +1 512 917 9452

Represented by Brown & Bain

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Randall Bain
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene D Cohen +1 602 351 8000

Represented by Cosho Humphrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M Penny +1 208 344 7811 +1 208 338 3290 dpenny@cosholaw.com

Represented by Greener Burke Shoemaker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard H Greener +1 208 319 2600 +1 208 319 2601 rgreener@greenerlaw.com

Represented by Moffatt Thomas Barrett Rock & Fields, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk R Helvie +1 208 345 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R B Rock +1 208 345 2000 +1 208 345 2000
Texas Instruments, Inc. Texas Instruments, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Micron Technology, Inc.

Represented by Carl Prosser Burke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Prosser Burke

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Wesley Burt +1 312 269 4266 +1 214 969 5100 swburt@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Wayne Turner +1 214 969 3700 +1 214 969 5100 rwturner@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Weller +1 216 586 3939
v.
Texas Instruments, Inc. Texas Instruments, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Micron Technology, Inc.

Represented by Carl Prosser Burke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Prosser Burke

Represented by JOHNSON & GIBBS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D Petruzzi +1 214 977 9000

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Wesley Burt +1 312 269 4266 +1 214 969 5100 swburt@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay C Johnson +1 216 586 3939
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Wayne Turner +1 214 969 3700 +1 214 969 5100 rwturner@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L. Wamsley, III +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 jlwamsleyiii@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Weller +1 216 586 3939
No Logo Micron Semiconductor, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Arnold White & Durkee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. BRYAN FARNEY
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne M Harding +1 713 787 1400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas McLemore +1 713 787 1400 +7892 789 789 2679
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GLENN W. RHODES +1 415 293 8185

Represented by Moffatt Thomas Barrett Rock & Fields, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk R Helvie +1 208 345 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R B Rock +1 208 345 2000 +1 208 345 2000
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/15/1994, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister : dismissing case in its entirety, w/prejudice, parties to bear own costs and atty fees for the reason that all claims and counterclaims have been resolved and settled (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 03/17/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
STIPULATION re stipulation for extension of time to respond to plf's 2nd interrogs and 1str requests for production of documents served on dft on or about 1/18/94 to 3/18/94 [147-1] (mn) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/11/1994, Entered: None
STIPULATION for exxtension of time to respond to plf's discovery to 3/18/94 (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/9/1994, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister denying motion for summary judgment of infringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [115-1], granting motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1] denying motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1], denying motion for summary judgment of invalidity of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 02/10/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/9/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM DECISION by Honorable Marion J. Callister (mn) (Entered: 02/10/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/13/1994, Entered: None
MINUTES OF HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS - ; All Pending Motions Hrg held 1/13/94 taking under advisement on 1/13/94 the motion for summary judgment of infringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [115-1], taking under advisement on 1/13/94 the motion to dismiss U.S. patent #4,639,664 [122-1], taking under advisement on 1/13/94 the motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1], taking under advisement on 1/13/94 the motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1], taking under advisement on 1/13/94 the motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1], taking under advisement on 1/13/94 the motion for summary judgment of invalidity of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] and stipulation and order of dismissal w/o prej. as to Microns misuse defense (MJC) (mn) (Entered: 01/21/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/6/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY, by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor with attorney Richard H Greener, David M Penny (mn) (Entered: 01/07/1994)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
NOTICE by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor of withdrawal of motion for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint [98-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney James D Smith to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff Micron Semiconductor [139-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 12/06/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: None
DECLARATION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor re motion for attorney James D Smith to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff Micron Semiconductor [139-1] (mn) (Entered: 12/03/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor for attorney James D Smith to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff Micron Semiconductor (mn) (Entered: 12/03/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: None
SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION by defendant Texas Instruments to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] (mn) (Entered: 11/26/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Texas Instruments to response to motion for summary judgment of infringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [115-1] (mn) (Entered: 11/26/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Texas Instruments to response to motion to dismiss U.S. patent #4,639,664 [122-1] (mn) (Entered: 11/26/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting motion for attorney James D Petruzzi to appear pro hac vice [134-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 11/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/19/1993, Entered: None
APPLICATION by defendant Texas Instruments for attorney James D Petruzzi to appear pro hac vice (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/19/1993, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 12/2/93 2:00 before (MJC) in Boise, ID (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting stipulation to extend time to 10/29/93 for dft to file reply briefs re Microns pending motions for S. J. on various patents [126-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to response to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to response to motion for summary judgment of invalidity of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to response to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Douglas Kelly regarding motion reply [127-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to response to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: None
STIPULATION to extend time to 10/29/93 for dft to file reply briefs re Microns pending motions for S. J. on various patents (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Fredrick J. Telecky regarding motion response [123-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion response [123-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Texas Instruments to motion for summary judgment of invalidity of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments to dismiss U.S. patent #4,639,664 SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion response [120-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Texas Instruments to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion response [118-1] (mn) (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Texas Instruments to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] SEALED - IN VALULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion response [116-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Texas Instruments to motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1] SEALED -IN VAULT- (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None
CROSS MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments for summary judgment of infringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 SEALED - IN VAULT- (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 10/13/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister extending time to respond to motions for motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 10/7/93, motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 10/7/93, motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 10/7/93, motion for summary judgment of invalidity of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] ; Response to motion ddl extended to 10/7/93 (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 08/19/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/6/1993, Entered: None
STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to pla's motions for summary judgment (jb) (Entered: 08/11/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of R. B. Rock regarding motion reply [111-1] (mn) Modified on 08/05/1993 (Entered: 08/05/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to response to motion for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint [98-1] (mn) Modified on 08/05/1993 (Entered: 08/05/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Bradlee R. Frazer regarding memorandum [109-1] (mn) (Entered: 07/20/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Texas Instruments in opposition re: motion for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint [98-1] (mn) (Entered: 07/20/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Jay C Johnson to appear pro hac vice [105-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 07/06/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister : granting stipulation for extension of time to respond to plas motions for summary judgment to 8/17/93 [103-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 07/01/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: None
CONSENT TO DESIGNATION of Local Counsel (jb) (Entered: 07/01/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by dft for attorney Jay C Johnson to appear pro hac vice (jb) (Entered: 07/01/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by dft for attorney James L Wamsley III to appear pro hac vice (jb) (Entered: 07/01/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: None
STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to plas motions for summary judgment (wm) (Entered: 06/28/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting stipulation to extend time to 7/15/93 to respond to motion for leave to file 2nd amended complaint [101-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 08/05/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: None
STIPULATION to extend time to 7/15/93 to respond to motion for leave to file 2nd amended complaint (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Kirk R. Helvie regarding motion for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint [98-1] (mn) (Entered: 06/02/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor, counter-defendant Micron Semiconductor in support of motion for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint [98-1] (mn) (Entered: 06/02/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor, counter-defendant Micron Semiconductor for leave to file 2nd Amended Complaint (mn) (Entered: 06/02/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: None
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister : granting stipulation re protective order governing the designation, disclosure and use of protected information by the parties in this action [96-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: None
STIPULATION re protective order governing the designation, disclosure and use of protected information by the parties in this action (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/21/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSTION by plaintiff to dft's. motion for protective order and in favor of plf's. attached proposed protective order [90-1] (mn) (Entered: 05/24/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister(see minutes #93) (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 05/18/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/13/1993, Entered: None
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE - motion for protective order [90-1] 10:00 5/28/93 , ; Discovery ddl set for 11/15/94 and expert witnesses to be disclosed by 7/13/94 (MJC) (mn) (Entered: 05/17/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/13/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Maureen Honeycutt regarding motion for protective order [90-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/13/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Texas Instruments in support of motion for protective order [90-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/13/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments for protective order (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM DECISION by Honorable Marion J. Callister (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting motion to extend time to 7/2/93 to respond to motions for S.J. and for discovery [81-1] that Micron shall not be compelled to produce any discovery that could reveal trade secrets until a stipulated confidentiality order is entered into between the parties and if parties cannot agree on this matter, they are to present the disputed issues to the Court as soon as possible to get this matter resolved (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/6/1993, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of taking deposition of plf. Micron (mn) (Entered: 05/07/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister denying motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], denying motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] ; Teleconf set for 5/13/93 2:30 before Judge Callister via telephone (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM DECISION by Honorable Marion J. Callister (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/16/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to motion to extend time to respond to motions for S.J. and for discovery [81-1] (mn) (Entered: 04/19/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion to extend time to respond to motions for S.J. and for discovery [81-1] (mn) (Entered: 04/06/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Texas Instruments in support of motion to extend time to respond to motions for S.J. and for discovery [81-1] (mn) (Entered: 04/06/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments to extend time to respond to motions for S.J. and for discovery (mn) (Entered: 04/06/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/25/1993, Entered: None
MINUTES OF HEARING ON MOTIONS TO SEVER - taking under advisement on 3/25/93 the motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1] (MJC) (mn) (Entered: 03/30/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/25/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Scott W. Burt regarding motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], regarding motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/24/1993, Entered: None
THIRD AFFIDAVIT of R. B. Rock (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion reply [72-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William D. Harris, Jr. regarding motion reply [72-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Fredrick J. Telecky Jr. by defendant Texas Instruments re motion reply [72-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of James D. Petruzzi regarding motion reply [72-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Donald J. Quigg by defendant Texas Instruments re motion reply [72-1] (mn) Modified on 03/23/1993 (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Texas Instruments to response to motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
SECOND AFFIDAVIT of R. B. Rock regarding affidavit [55-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/22/1993, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor re declaration [57-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Roger Lee regarding motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
BRIEF by plaintiff in support re: motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 [67-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,697,330 (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Thomas M. Trent regarding motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
BRIEF by plaintiff in support re: motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 [64-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patents nos. 4,301,518,4,314,362, and 3,940,747 (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Douglas Kelly regarding motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
BRIEF by plaintiff in support re: motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff for summary judgment of noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of William H. Dana regarding motion for summary judgment of invalididty of U.SS> patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
BRIEF by plaintiff in support re: motion for summary judgment of invalididty of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 [58-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff for summary judgment of invalidity of U.S. patent no. 4,639,664 (mn) Modified on 04/12/1993 (Entered: 03/22/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/15/1993, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Robert J. McAughan, Jr. by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor noninfringement of U.S. patent no. 4,495,376 [61-1] (mn) Modified on 03/23/1993 (Entered: 03/23/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/15/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Harris regarding motion for severance and stay of proceedings [54-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/16/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/15/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of R. B. Rock regarding motion for severance and stay of proceedings [54-1] (mn) (Entered: 03/16/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/15/1993, Entered: None
SUPPLLEMENTAL MEMORNDUM IN OPPOSITION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn) (Entered: 03/16/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1] 2:00 3/25/93, motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] 2:00 3/25/93 before (MJC) in Boise, ID ( previously set for 3/9/93 10:00) cc: all counsel) (mn) Modified on 03/08/1993 (Entered: 03/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Carl R. Roth regarding motion reply [50-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Mark N. Reiter regarding motion reply [50-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Texas Instruments to response to motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1] 10:00 3/9/93, motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] 10:00 3/9/93 before (MJC) in Boise, ID (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/22/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of R. B. Rock regarding motion response [47-1] (mn) (Entered: 02/24/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/22/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn) (Entered: 02/24/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Carl Burke regarding motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], regarding motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn) (Entered: 02/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Texas Instruments in support of motion to sever proceedings re certain patents [44-1], and motion to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 [44-2] (mn) (Entered: 02/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments to sever proceedings re certain patents , and to stay of proceedings pertaining to U.S. patents Nos. 4,533,843 and 4,748,349 (mn) (Entered: 02/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: None
MINUTES OF HEAR ON MO. FOR P.O. - granting motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] 11:00 2/5/93 (MJC) (mn) (Entered: 02/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting motion to reduce time required for notice of hearing [34-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 02/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] (mn) (Entered: 02/08/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
DECLARATION of James D. Petruzzi in support of motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] (jb) (Entered: 02/05/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING dft's motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] set for 11:00 am on 2/5/93 before MJC in Boise (cc: all counsel) (jb)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Mark E. Patrick re motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] (jb)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Carl Burke regarding motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] (jb)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dft in support of motion for protective order re Bernacki deposition [35-1] (jb)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by dft Texas Instruments for protective order re Bernacki deposition (jb)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: None
EX PARTE MOTION by dft to reduce time required for notice of hearing (jb)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/1993, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Robert W Turner to appear pro hac vice [31-1], granting motion for attorney Scott W Burt to appear pro hac vice [30-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/1993, Entered: None
CONSENT TO DESIGNATION of Local Counsel, Carl Burke, as resident atty. for dft. Texas Instruments (mn) (Entered: 01/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments, counter-claimant Texas Instruments for attorney Robert W Turner to appear pro hac vice (mn) (Entered: 01/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/1993, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments, counter-claimant Texas Instruments for attorney Scott W Burt to appear pro hac vice (mn) (Entered: 01/14/1993)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/23/1992, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] (cc: all counsel) SEALED - IN VAULT - (jl) Modified on 10/14/1993
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of C. Randall Bain regarding motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] (mn) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Eugene D. Cohen regarding motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] SEALED - IN VAULT - (mn) Modified on 10/14/1993 (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Wayne M. Harding by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor re motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] (mn) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Clarence E. Eriksen by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor re motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] (mn) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael T. McLemore by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor re motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] (mn) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
DECLARATION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor re motion for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice [22-1] (mn) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/18/1992, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor for attorney Wayne M. Harding, Michael T. McLemore, W. Bryan Farney, Clarence E Eriksen, C Randall Bain, Eugene D Cohen to appear pro hac vice (mn) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/14/1992, Entered: None
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM [18-2] by counter-defendant Micron Semiconductor (mn) (Entered: 12/15/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/1992, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister granting stipulation that there are forty patents referenced in the amended complaint and currently at issue in this case [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 12/02/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/24/1992, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Texas Instruments regarding answer and counterclaim (mn) (Entered: 11/27/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/24/1992, Entered: None
ANSWER to complaint [3-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Texas Instruments against plaintiff Micron Semiconductor (mn) (Entered: 11/27/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/1992, Entered: None
STIPULATION that there are forty patents referenced in the amended complaint and currently at issue in this case (mn) (Entered: 11/24/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/1992, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM DECISION by Honorable Marion J. Callister (mn) (Entered: 11/10/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/1992, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable Marion J. Callister denying motion for more definite statement [6-1] and that the only patents at issue in this case are the thirty-nine patents listed in paragraph 12 of Micron's amended complaint filed 9/4/92, and further that the defense of inequitable conduct is not now an issue in this case (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 11/10/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/1992, Entered: None
MINUTES OF HEAR ON DFT'S MO FOR MORE - taking under advisement on 10/30/92 the motion for more definite statement [6-1] (MJC) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/27/1992, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Texas Instruments to response to motion for more definite statement [6-1] (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/21/1992, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Texas Instruments on 9/4/92 thru C. T. Corporation Systems (mn) (Entered: 10/22/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING setting hearing on motion for more definite statement [6-1] 10:00 10/30/92 before (MJC) in Boise, ID (cc: all counsel) (mn)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/13/1992, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of R. B. Rock regarding motion response [8-1] (mn) (Entered: 10/15/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/13/1992, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Larry L. Grant regarding motion response [8-1] (mn) (Entered: 10/15/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/1992, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor to motion of dft for more definite statement [6-1] (mn) (Entered: 10/15/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/2/1992, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion for attorney Robert Weller to appear pro hac vice [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (mn) (Entered: 10/05/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/1992, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Texas Instruments for more definite statement (mn) (Entered: 09/28/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/1992, Entered: None
CONSENT OF COUNSEL re designation as resident atty for defendant Texas Instruments by attorney Carl P Burke (mn) (Entered: 09/28/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/1992, Entered: None
APPLICATION by defendant Texas Instruments for attorney Robert Weller to appear pro hac vice (mn) (Entered: 09/28/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT for patent infringement and declaratory relief [1-1] by plaintiff Micron Semiconductor; jury demand (mn) (Entered: 09/08/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Texas Instruments on 9/3/92 thru atty R. B. Kading (mn) (Entered: 09/08/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/2/1992, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (consent notice issued/furnished) (mn) (Entered: 09/03/1992)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 68 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?