Okor v. Atari Games Corp., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-11504
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:12 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Joseph Kwame Okor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Kwame Okor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Kwame Okor
No Logo Atari Games Corp, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com
No Logo Midway Games, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com
v.
No Logo Atari Games Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com
No Logo Bandai Co, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell W. Binns +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 rbinns@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas C Doskocil +1 617 570 1215 +1 617 523 1231 ddoskocil@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis D'Amato Brisbois & Brisgaard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Makous +1 213 250 1800 +1 213 250 1800
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glen S. Umeda +1 213 250 1800
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Y. Lau +1 650 988 8500
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart P. Meyer +1 650 858 7286 +1 650 858 7286 smeyer@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Porter +1 617 367 0025 +1 617 367 2155 porterm@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl M Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@velaw.com
No Logo Jaleco Usa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brody & Jacobs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Brody +1 617 367 3300 +1 617 367 8697

Toggle Switch Represented by Masuda, Funai, Eifert & Mitchell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence P. Becker
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy E. Sasamoto
No Logo Konami Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mirut P. Dalal +1 214 978 3097
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Charles McCormack +1 214 978 3007 +1 214 978 3099 brian.mccormack@bakermckenzie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph O'Connor +1 312 861 2790 +1 312 698 2325 Daniel.J.Oconnor@Bakernet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David I. Roche +1 312 861 8608 +1 312 698 2363 david.i.roche@bakernet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ForbesGallagher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Owen Gallagher +1 617 273 9570 +1 508 613 9480 ogallagher@gallagherlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett J. Harris +1 617 598 3810 +1 617 598 3500 gharris@forbesgallagher.com
No Logo Midway Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Reed Riden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Beck +1 617 500 8670 +1 617 500 8665 rbeck@beckreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenkens & Gilchrist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marion B. Adler
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL J. BURNHAM. +1 312 425 8513
No Logo Namco of America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore E. Dinsmoor +1 617 345 3825 +1 617 345 3299 TDinsmoor@B-L.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RONALD L.WANKE
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel T. Pelz +1 312 222 9350 +5270 527 527 0484 jpelz@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/05/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin G. McGurn +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 kmcgurn@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Tocci +1 617 542 6200 +1 617 542 6201 jtocci@toccilee.com
No Logo Sammy USA Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzhugh & Mariani LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Cashore Mariani +1 617 695 2330 +1 617 695 2335 amariani@fitzhughlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence R. Robins lrobins@sandw.com
Sega Enterprises, Ltd. Sega Enterprises, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Bruce Bower +1 404 653 6465 bruce.bower@finnegan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard H. Smith +1 202 408 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter B. Ellis +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 pellis@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Taito of America Inc., Defendant
No Logo Joseph Kwame Okor, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Kwame Okor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Kwame Okor
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
Mandate from the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Re: appeal AFFIRMING the judgment of the district court. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
    USCA for the Federal Circuit Notice of Entry of Judgment Accompanied by Opinion; The district court's judgments in all three cases are affirmed. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None
      Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for reconsideration of motion to require Okor to post bond (filed in 00-11503) , filed. (mr) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None
        Order of the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: [109-1] appeal; Joseph Kwame Okor moves for reconsideration of the court's order dismissing his appeals for failure to pay the filing fee. Okor has now paid the filing fee. Based on these circumstances, the court grants Okor's motion to reinstate his appeal. See Order No. 113 for further details. (jr) (Entered: 11/22/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Order re: return of sealed documents entered. cc/cl [EOD Date 8/20/02] (mr) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: None
            Mandate of US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: [109-1] appeal, dismissing [109-1] appeal. (jr) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
              Memorandum and Order re: bill of costs entered. Costs taxed against Joseph K. Okor for: Jaleco - $920.55 (on 00-11503 anc 00-11504); Konami - $1,758.20 (on 00-11503 and 00-11504); Capcom - $1,758.29 (on 00-11503 and 00-11503); Nintendo - $40.40 (on 01-10610) and Nintendo - $4,748.68 (on 98-12176). cc/cl [EOD Date 5/28/02] (mr) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None
                Notice of appeal to Federal Circuit by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 filed. Appealing: [108-1] judgment order, [107-1] memorandum order (mr) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Judgment entered for Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 against Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504. Dismissal of all plaintiff's claims against defendants Bandai Co., LTD and Taito Corporation. cc/cl [EOD Date 3/27/02] (mr) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Memorandum and Order entered. denying [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment, granting [76-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, granting [78-1] motion for summary judgment, granting [60-1] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '851, granting [56-1] motion for summary judgment, granting [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849, granting [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849, granting [62-1] motion for summary judgment. As to Civil Action No. 00-11503, alleging infringement of the '851 patent by ten arcade game manufacturers, I GRANT summary judgment of non-infringement to the eight defendants, duly served, who have so moved (Capcom, Jaleco, Konami, Midway, MGW, Namco, Sega, and Sammy) and direct dismissal of the case against Bandai and Taito for want of prosecution in undertaking service upon them. I DENY plaintiff Okor's cross-motion for summary judgment. As to Civil Action No. 00-11504, alleging infringement of the '849 patent by the same ten arcade game manufacturers, I GRANT summary judgment of non-infringement to the eight defendants, duly served, who have so moved (Capcom, Jaleco, Konami, Midway, MGW, Namco, Sega, and Sammy), and direct dismissal of the case against Bandai and Taito for want of prosecution in undertaking service upon them. I DENY plaintiff Okor's cross-motion for summary judgment. As to Civil Action No. 01-10610, alleging infringement of the '851 patent by repeat defendants Sega, Nintendo and Sony, and nine additional parties, I GRANT Sega, Nintendo and Sony's motion to dismiss. Because the disposition of the motion is necessarily applicable to the remaining defendants as well, I direct the clerk to dismiss the case against them as well. I decline to grant movants Sega, Nintendo and Sony injunctive relief, or to award them reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses. cc/cl [EOD Date 3/27/02] (mr) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None
                      Notice of change of address filed by Russell Beck in 1:00-cv-11504 by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: None
                        Notice of change of address filed by Garrett Harris in 1:00-cv-11504 by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: motion hearing; Okor's failure to serve: defendant Bandai is to be dismissed out for failure to prosecute/faiulre to prefect service through the Hague convention; issue of sanctions addressed; [91-1] motion to strike [82-1] affidavit and statement of undisputed facts taken under advisement, cross motion for summary judgment taken under advisement, [76-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement under advisement, [78-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement, [60-1] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '851 taken under advisement, [56-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement, [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 taken under advisement, [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 taken under advisement, [62-1] motion for summary judgment taken under advisement Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Transcript of proceedings for held on proceeding date: 2/20/02 before Judge: Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
                              Assented to Motion by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504 for R. Bruce Bower to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 37195 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
                                Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 for Stuart P. Meyer to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 37043 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: None
                                  Assented to Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to continue motion hearing , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: Motion hearing set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [91-1] motion to strike [82-1] affidavit and statement of undisputed facts, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [76-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [78-1] motion for summary judgment, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [60-1] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '851, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [56-1] motion for summary judgment, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849, set for 2:30 2/20/02 for [62-1] motion for summary judgment . (mr) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
                                      Declaration of Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment , filed. (substitute for #82 which was unsigned) (mr) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
                                        Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 to substitute Declaration of Joseph Kwame Okor , filed. (mr) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None
                                          Reply by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 to response to [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: None
                                            Reply by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to response to [76-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                              Reply by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to response to [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                Reply by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 to response to [62-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                  Reply/response by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 to plaintiff's statement of undisputed facts , filed. (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                    Motion by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 to strike [82-1] affidavit and statement of undisputed facts , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                      Statement of Facts by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 re: [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                        Reply by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 to response to [60-1] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '851 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                          Affidavit of Emily S. Lau in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment, [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                            Reply by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 to response to [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                              Combined Response by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 to [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment and reply to plaintiff's response to Jaleco USA, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment as to non-infringement, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                Assented to Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504, Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504, Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504, Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Taito of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to extend time to 10/5/01 to file replies/oppositions , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  Exhibits by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      Declaration of Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [81-1] cross motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        Cross motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of change of address filed by Theodore E. Dinsmoor in 1:00-cv-11504 by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 . (mr) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Stipulated Protective Order entered. cc/cl [EOD Date 7/17/01] (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment , with memorandum in support, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for leave to late file declaration of Richard Wisniewski , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment of non-infringement , filed. (supporting documents filed in 00cv11503-DPW). (mr) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    Declaration of Mirut P. Dalal in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [74-1] motion for Mirut P. Dalal to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 32329 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for Mirut P. Dalal to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 32329 , filed. c/s (mr) Modified on 07/16/2001 (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of Brian C. McCormack in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [72-1] motion for Brian C. McCormack to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 32329 , filed. (mr) Modified on 07/16/2001 (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for Brian C. McCormack to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 32329 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of appearance of attorney for Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 by Garrett Harris, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                              Affidavit of Emily S. Lau in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                Affidavit of Mr. Takashi Kubuzono, re: [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [67-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Declaration of Mirut P. Dalal, re: [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Memorandum by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Statement of Facts by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 re: [63-1] motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment of non-infringement of patent '849 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion by Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment , filed. (supporting documents filed in 00-cv-11503) (mr) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Memorandum by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [60-1] motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '851 , filed. cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment of noninfringement of patent '851 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Appendix/exhibits by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [56-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Statement of Facts by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 re: [56-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Memorandum by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [56-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Motion by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of withdrawal of counsel by attorney Kristin G. McGurn for Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 07/09/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Nancy E. Sasamoto in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [52-1] motion for Laurence Becker & Nancy Sasamoto to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 31841 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Laurence P. Becker in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [52-1] motion for Laurence Becker & Nancy Sasamoto to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 31841 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Motion by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 for Laurence Becker & Nancy Sasamoto to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 31841 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Amended Answer to amended Complaint and counterclaim by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, filed. Answer amends [43-1] answer to amended complaint .; jury demand c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Response to [40-1] Scheduling order by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Daniel J. Burnham , re: [47-1] motion for Marion B. Adler and Daniel J. Burnham to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: 100.00 Receipt # 31034: , filed. c/s. , filed. (jf) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Marion B. Adler , re: [47-1] motion for Marion B. Adler and Daniel J. Burnham to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: 100.00 Receipt # 31034: , filed. c/s. , filed. (jf) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Motion by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 for Marion B. Adler and Daniel J. Burnham to appear pro hac vice fee status: pd fee amt: 100.00 Receipt # 31034: , filed. c/s. (jf) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Ronald L. Wanke in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [45-1] motion for Ronald Wanke to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30850 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Motion by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for Ronald Wanke to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30850 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Answer by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to amended complaint, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Answer to amended complaint; and Counterclaim by Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 against Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Richard H. Smith in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [41-1] motion for Richard H. Smith to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30724 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504 for Richard H. Smith to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: Receipt #: 30724 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Scheduling Order entered setting SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [EOD Date 4/27/01] (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of appearance of attorney for Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 by Owen Gallagher, filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Darryl M. Woo in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [36-1] motion for Emily Lau & Darryl Woo to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 30457 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Emily S. Lau in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [36-1] motion for Emily Lau & Darryl Woo to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 30457 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 for Emily Lau & Darryl Woo to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 30457 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Answer by Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 to amended complaint, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 04/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 2:30 4/23/01 , Status report due on Status report due on 4/17/01 . cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Answer by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to amended complaint, filed. (eaf) (Entered: 02/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by Konami of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for O'Connor & Roche to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: 100. Receipt #: 29096 , filed. (eaf) (Entered: 02/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Emily S. Lau , re: [30-1] opposition response , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Response by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 in opposition to [27-1] motion to amend [1-1] complaint , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [28-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RENEWED Motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504 to dismiss , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 to amend [1-1] complaint , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer by Sega Enterprises in 1:00-cv-11504 to amended complaint, filed.; jury demand (fmr) (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of appearance of attorney for Jaleco USA Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 by Steven M. Brody, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer by Sammy USA Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504 to complaint; jury demand, filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 01/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 to stay , proceedings filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of appearance of attorney for Atari Games Corp. in 1:00-cv-11504, Midway Games Inc. in 1:00-cv-11504 by Russell Beck, filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter by Peter B. Ellis dated: 11/15/00 to: Joseph Okor re: Serving Sega Enterprises filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of change of address filed by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 . c/s (fmr) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of appearance of attorney for Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 by Kristin G. McGurn, filed. (fmr) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: Status Conference: Plaintiff to serve defs per Hague Convention motion to Dismiss denied; service is not quashed; Hague Convention to be satisfied w/in 60 days as to all others not served; motion to extend time to answer 20 days after ruling on SJ in 98-12177 & 12176; Case is stayed for 20 day period following action in 98-12176 & 12177; Okor to provide an address where mail can be sent within 3 days; #16 in allowed in 00-11503; Court Reporter: Pam Owens (fmr) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Scheduling Order entered the plaintiff shall serve any unserved defendants pursuant to the requirements of the Hague Convention, by no later than 12/31/00; with respect to all defendants who have been served or have agreed to accept service, the Plaintiff shall file proof of same with this Court forthwith if he has not already don so;these cases are stayed to the extent that answers or responsive pleadings to the Complaint are stayed for a 20 day period following action on the pending motion in Civil Action numbers 98-12176 and 98-12177; hearings on the pending motions in civil action numbers 98-12176 and 98-12177 shall be set for a hearing within the next 2 months, and the parties in these cases may appear if they so desire;due to past problems of both counsel and the court in communicating with plaintiff by mail, by 12/3/00, the plaintiff is ordered to provide this court with a mailing address where mail can be sent and received at all times during this litigation. If the plaintiff has access to an e-mail address and wishes to provide this information to the Court, he may do so as well. cc/clEOD Date 11/1/00] (fmr) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504, Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to convert scheduling conference to status conference , filed. c/s (fmr) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 2:30 10/31/00 . c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/29/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to complaint , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Joel T. Pelz in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [12-1] motion for Joel T. Pelz to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 25359 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion by Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 for Joel T. Pelz to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 25359 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 in opposition to [5-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504 in opposition to [5-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Glen S. Umeda in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [7-1] motion for David Makous & Glen Umeda to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 24805 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 08/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of David N. Makous in 1:00-cv-11504 , re: [7-1] motion for David Makous & Glen Umeda to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 24805 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 08/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504 for David Makous & Glen Umeda to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $100 Receipt #: 24805 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504 in support of [5-1] motion to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion by Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504 to dismiss , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of appearance of attorney for Bandai Co. LTD. in 1:00-cv-11504 by Douglas C. Doskocil, Russell W. Binns Jr., filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to Motion by Capcom Entertainment in 1:00-cv-11504 to extend time to 20 days after Court's ruling on pending motions for summary judgment to respond to complaint , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/23/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint motion by Joseph Kwame Okor in 1:00-cv-11504, Namco Of America in 1:00-cv-11504 to extend time to 9/20/00 to respond to complaint , filed. . (mr) (Entered: 08/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Woodlock. Receipt #: 24181 Amount:$ 150. Fee Status: paid (mr) (Entered: 08/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?