Peter Trepp v. Inktank Storage Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC568524

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Trepp Peter, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Inktank Storage, Inc., Defendant
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant
Type Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Removal to Federal Court 06/15/2015
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Ord-Nunc Pro Tunc
CASE MANAGEMENT CONF. SET 7/14/15 SET IN ERROR - HEARING VACATED
    Blank 7 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 6 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Notice Of Ruling
      re: 6-15-15
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Notice-Case Management Conference
        CASE MANAGEMENT CONF. VACATED-SET IN ERROR
          Blank 4 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Proof of Service
            Blank 3 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Ntc of Removal to Federal Court
            2
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Notice-Case Management Conference
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Complaint

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 104 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?