Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00008
District Judge Designated Philip M. Pro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 5:56 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fortunet Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Austine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Comarow +1 702 260 8062 +1 702 446 5426 david@austine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Rounds +1 775 324 4100 +1 775 333 8171 mrounds@bhfs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fortunet Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fortunet, Inc. +1 702 796 9090
No Logo Bingo Card Minder Corp, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Stuart Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Bingo Card Minder Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold White & Durkee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Morico +1 713 787 1400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D.C. TOEDT III +1 713 787 1400

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charles McIntyre +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Vargas Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Lerude

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael S. Brandt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Brandt +1 775 586 9500 +1 775 586 9550

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claude Michael Stern +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 claudestern@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Stuart Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALBERT B. DEAVER, JR

Toggle Switch Represented by trumanlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald W. Truman +1 702 821 1821 +1 888 958 0541 ront@trumanlawfirm.com
No Logo Fortunet Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
LETTER frm cnsl re case status. (Entered: 11/26/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None
    ORDER ORD Jt mtn to dism w/prej is GRANTED, all claims between Fortunet and Bingo Card Minder Corp are DISM w/prej. FUR ORD Each pty waives any right to appeal the dism, each pty to bear own costs/fees. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None
      MOTION TO DISMISS Joint mtn to dism w/prej. (ord attached) (DISPO: GRANTED #532 (Entered: 02/10/2003)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
        MISCELLANEOUS HEARING Ct Reporter: Erica Davis RE: Tele stat hrng (see doc for spfcs). ORD pty have indicated settlement as between P Fortunet & Ds Bingo Tech & Bingo Card Minder, stips for dism shall be filed by 2/9/01. FUR ORD as to case CV-S-95-0008-PM (Entered: 02/10/2003)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None
          LETTER (fax cpy) frm Skinner, Sutton, Watson & Rounds re case has settled, stip for dism to be filed 1/22/01. (Entered: 02/10/2003)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT fld by Stuart Entertainmt. Inc. (m) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF HEARING Jt Status Conf is set for 1/26/01 @ 8:30 am in Ctrm #7C. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                NOTICE (OTHER) of filing Original signatures to replace fax signatures on Jt Status Rprt. (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                  ORDER ORD Ct will cont stay to 1/16/01. FUR ORD Ptys shall have to/include 1/16/01 to file Jt Stat rprt, etc (see doc for spfcs). cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT as per ord #523 (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: None
                      ORDER ORD Ptys shall have to/include 11/1/00 to file Jt Status Rprt. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re mailing of VP's & design's obo Ds. (m) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                          DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Eric Lerude design loc/cnsl obo D Gametech Int'l. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                            VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE David McIntyre out/state cnsl obo D Gametech Int'l. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                              DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Eric Lerude design loc/cnsl obo D Gametech Int'l. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                                VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Evette D. Pennypacker out/state cnsl obo D Gametech Int'l. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                                  DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Eric Lerude design loc/cnsl obo D Gametech Int'l. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None
                                    VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Claude M. Stern out/state cnsl obo D Gametech Int'l. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: None
                                      ORDER ORDER Jones Vargas is substituted as atty of rrecrd for Ds Bingo Card Minder Corp in place & stead of Sierra Paten Group Ltd. Cpys dist. (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: None
                                        DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL re Ronald Truman desig loc/cnsl obo D Stuart Entertainment. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None
                                          VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE re Albert B. Deaver Jr. out/state cnsl obo D Stuart Entertainment. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: None
                                            ORDER ORDER D Stuart Entertainment Inc substitutes Albert Deaver Jr of Howrey Simon Arnold & White in place and stead of D.C. Toedt III formerly of Arnold White & Durkee. Cpys dist. (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: None
                                              MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE of mailing re VP & Desig obo D. (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                ORDER ORD Ptys shall have the req 90 dy period to/include 9/29/00 to cont to explore all settlement oppoturnities in this case. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                  STATUS REPORT w/orig signatures (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS REPORT no orig signatures - filed w/note stating orig signatures will be filed on 6/2/00. (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY P hereby stubstitutes Michael D. Rounds of Skinner Sutton Watson & Rounds in place/stead of David Comarow. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER ORD Ptys to this actn shall file Jt Status Rprt on/before 5/31/00. cpys dist (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?