Arnoldussen v. Portal Software, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-05817
District Judge Vaughn R. Walker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 6:37 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Todd Arnoldussen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M. Goldberg +1 800 977 7401 +1 800 536 0065 michael@goldberglawpc.com
v.
No Logo Arthur Patterson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Easton, Michelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
No Logo David Labuda, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Easton, Michelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
No Logo Howard A. Bain, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Easton, Michelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
No Logo John E. Little, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Easton, Michelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
No Logo Marc Aronson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Easton, Michelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
No Logo Portal Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Easton, Michelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Nielsen +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 pnielsen@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Walker granting (177) motion for attorney fees; granting (184) motion for settlement in case 3:03-cv-05138-VRW (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007). (Entered: 11/26/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CASE CONSOLIDATION AND SCHEDULING. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case. Cases C03-5138, C03-5519, C03-5536, C03-5817 and C04-0127 are consolidated into Master File No. C03-5138 VRW In re Portal Software, Inc. Securities Litigation.. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/2/2004. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2004) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: None
      STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Stipulation and [Proposed] Consolidation and Scheduling Order by Marc Aronson, Howard A. Bain III, David Labuda, John E. Little, Arthur Patterson, Portal Software, Inc.. (Nielsen, Peri) (Filed on 1/29/2004) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
        *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 9 *** STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Stipulation and [Proposed] Consolidation and Scheduling Order by Marc Aronson, Howard A. Bain III, David Labuda, John E. Little, Arthur Patterson, Portal Software, Inc.. (Nielsen, Peri) (Filed on 1/28/2004) Modified on 2/3/2004 (br, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time for defendants to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 01/26/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2004) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc Aronson, Howard A. Bain III, David Labuda, John E. Little, Arthur Patterson, Portal Software, Inc. re 5 Stipulation, service by mail (Locker, Nina) (Filed on 1/26/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
              STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Marc Aronson, Howard A. Bain III, David Labuda, John E. Little, Arthur Patterson, Portal Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Attestation)(Locker, Nina) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT of attorney Peter A. Binkow by Todd Arnoldussen. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2003) (Entered: 12/29/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Related Case (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2003) (Entered: 12/29/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: None
                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2004. Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2004 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 standing orders# 2 special notice)(mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2003) (Entered: 12/29/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Marc Aronson, Howard A. Bain III, David Labuda, John E. Little, Arthur Patterson, Portal Software, Inc. (Filing fee $ 150.). Filed by Todd Arnoldussen. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2003) (Entered: 12/29/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 53 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?