La Britt Verge v. Wal-mart Stores Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC591286

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1-30, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lee Tran and Liang APLC

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Represented by Lee Tran and Liang APLC

No Logo Verge La Britt, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Law Offices of Ari Moss

Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Stipulation and Order
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING THE CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT'S DECISION IN KILBY V. CVS PHARMACY
    Blank 5 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Answer to Complaint
      Blank 4 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Proof-Service/Summons
        Blank 3 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
          Blank 2 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Notice-Case Management Conference
            Blank 1 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Complaint

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 616 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?