Diane Quigley v. Fred Sands First Class Real Estate
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC035891

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Quigley Diane, Plaintiff

Represented by Hosp, Gilbert, Bergsten & Phillips

No Logo Quigley, Kevin, Plaintiff

Represented by Hosp, Gilbert, Bergsten & Phillips

v.
No Logo Archer Deann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shane Digiuseppe & Millhouse Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage, Inc. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage"

Toggle Switch Represented by Shane Digiuseppe & Millhouse Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Cox Shilo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shane Digiuseppe & Millhouse Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Fred Sands First Class Real Estate, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shane Digiuseppe & Millhouse Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Aragon Jim, Defendant and Cross-Complainant
No Logo Attie Maurice J., Mediator
No Logo F.y.i. Property Inspections, Defendant's DBA
No Logo Garrison, Thomas, Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Pemberton Janice, Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per
Type Other Real Property Rights Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 02/07/2005
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 70 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Request For Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE - COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANTS FRED SANS FIRST CLASS REAL ESTATE, COLDWELL BANKER RESI- DENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY AND DEANN ARCHER ONLY.
    Blank 69 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 68 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Decl & Ord for Refund of Jury Fees
        Blank 67 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Notice of Settlement
          Blank 66 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Notice Of Ruling
          RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADOPTING PARTY STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES.
            Blank 65 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Stipulation
            PARTY STIPULATION REGARDING JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES
              Blank 64 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Exparte Application
              OF ORDER ADOPTING PARTY STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
                Blank 63 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Order
                RE EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADOPTING PARTY STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES
                  Blank 62 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Exparte Application
                    Blank 61 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Stipulation
                      Blank 60 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Notice Of Posting Of Jury Fees
                        Blank 59 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Substitution of Attorney
                          Blank 58 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Statement-Non-Agreement
                          FIRST
                            Blank 57 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Notice-Mediation Hrg Date
                              Blank 56 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Notice Of Ruling
                                Blank 55 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE, MEDIATION AND POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF LISA ANNE COLE;
                                  Blank 54 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Answer To Third Amended Complaint
                                    Blank 53 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Opposition
                                    TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;
                                      Blank 52 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Opposition
                                      TO DEMURRER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;
                                        Blank 51 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                        TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMNENDED COMPLAINT;
                                          Blank 50 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Notice of Motion
                                          TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS, DEANN ARCHER AND FRED SANDS FIRST CLASS REAL ESTATE;
                                            Blank 49 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 Request For Dismissal
                                            WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AT TO DEFENDANT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY ONLY
                                              Blank 48 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Third Amended Complaint
                                                Blank 47 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply in Support
                                                OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS DEANN ARCHER, FRED SANDS FIRST CLASS REAL ESTATE AND COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Notice
                                                  OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR
                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Opposition
                                                    TO DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Notice of Motion
                                                          AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY;
                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Proof of Service
                                                            OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT JANICE PEMBERTON
                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Answer
                                                                            TO UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                UNVERIFIED
                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Opposition
                                                                                        TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Opposition
                                                                                          TO DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                              RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON JIM ARAGON
                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                      TO STRIKE BY FRED SANDS FIRST CLASS REAL ESTATE AND DEANN ARCHER PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                                                                                        TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Answer
                                                                                                          TO UNIVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                first appearance fee paid for defendants JANICE PEMBERTON AND THOMAS GARRISON
                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                        OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Notice
                                                                                                                            OF CASE MANAGMENT CONERENCE HEARING
                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                              OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Opposition
                                                                                                                                  TO DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;
                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer
                                                                                                                                      TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                        OF COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT F.Y.I. PROPERTY INSPECTIONS
                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Complaint

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?