Christopher Carpenter Vs. Universal Studios, Inc., et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC037142
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Carpenter, Christopher, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew L. Ellis & Associat

v.
No Logo Mca Inc (doe 2), Defendant

Represented by Schrieffer & Downey, LLP

No Logo Universal City Studios Productions Lllp, Defendant

Represented by Schrieffer & Downey, LLP

No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Schrieffer & Downey, LLP

No Logo Universal Studios, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Schrieffer & Downey, LLP

Attributes
Type Prdct Liablty (not asbes,tox,envi (General Jurisdiction)
Status Judgment on Verdict 06/17/2005
Timeline
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 95 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Remittitur Filed.
APPEAL FORM JUDGMENT OF 6/17/05 ,REMITITTUR FILED, JUDGMENT AFFIR- MED, EACH PARTY BEAR ITS OWN COST ON APPEAL.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 94 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Notice of Designation of Record
Request RequestSpace
Blank 93 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Notice of Entry of Judgment
RE COSTS IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1032
Request RequestSpace
Blank 92 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 miscellaneous other
JUDGMENT RE COSTS IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 91 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Notice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 90 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Notice of Appeal
Fee received for $655.00 - Check no. 4352 Notice of Appeal sent on 9/14/05
Request RequestSpace
Blank 89 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Substitution of Attorney
Request RequestSpace
Blank 88 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Notice Of Ruling
REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT AND NEW TRIAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 87 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Opposition
TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. GOODMAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 86 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Opposition
TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PAUL K. SCHRIEFFER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Motion for New Trial
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANDREW ELLIS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 84 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Motion
FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT; DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. ELLIS IN SUPPORT THEREOF;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Notice of Entry of Judgment
ON SPECIAL VERDICT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 82 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Memorandum Of Costs
INTHE AMOUNT OF $ 13,408.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 81 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Memorandum Of Costs
$ 293.00
Request RequestSpace
Blank 80 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Memorandum Of Costs
IN THE AMOUNT OF $293.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Memorandum Of Costs
$293.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 78 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Judgment*
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Jury Verdict
special verdict
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Motion
FOR DIRECTED VERDICT ON THE ISSUE OF DEFENDANT'S DEFENSE OF BEING A SPECIAL EMPLOYER; DECLARATION OF ANDREW ELLIS IN SUPPORT THEREOF;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Motion
FOR NON SUIT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Request RequestSpace
Blank 74 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Statement
OF THE CASE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 miscellaneous other
WITNESS LIST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 72 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 miscellaneous other
AMENDED PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 71 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 miscellaneous other
WITNESS LIST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 70 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Exhibit
Request RequestSpace
Blank 69 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 miscellaneous other
SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Statement
OF THE CASE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Brief
(TRIAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Exhibit
Request RequestSpace
Blank 63 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Request For Judicial Notice
IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM ARGUING AT TRIAL THAT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC WAS NOT HIS SPECIAL EMPLOYER AND TO DEEM ADMITTED THAT UNIVERSA
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Opposition
TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO WORKERS COMPENSATION BENEFITS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GOODMAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Supplement
WITNESS LIST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING THE INTRODUCTION OR REFERENCING OF PLAINTIFFS SEX LIFE AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. GOODMAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM ARGUING AT TRIAL THAT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC WAS NOT HIS SPECIAL EMPLOYER AND TO DEEM ADMITTED THAT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC WAS IN FACT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR ORDER PRECLUDING INTRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ENTITLED REMITTANCE ADVICE, INVOICE, AND DETALILED INVOICE, DATED NOVEMBER 18, 2003 AND MARCH 11, 2004, AND DOCUMENT ENTITLED UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVIS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 57 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING WITNESSES, EVIDENCE OR CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN THEIR DISCOVERY RESPONSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR ORDER TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF THE PARTIES' EXPERT TO WORK PERFORMED AND OPINIONS RENDERED AT THE TIME OF THEIR DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Opposition
TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION AND NON QUALIFIED EXPERT OPINION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. GOODMAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 54 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE EXPERT OPINION AND NON-QUALIFIED EXPERT OPINION; DECLARATION OF ANDEREW L. ELLIS IN SUPPORT THEREOF;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 53 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING THE INTRODUCTION OF PHOTOGRAPHS OF PLAINTIFF'S INJURIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. GOODMAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 52 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING THE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT SAFETY MEASURES UNDER EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 1151; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
FOR AN ORDER TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER INCIDENTS AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A HEARING PURSUANT TO EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 402; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GOODMAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion for an Order
PRECLUDING MICHAEL HIGHTOWER FROM TESTIFYING AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL SCHRIEFFER AND MATTHEW C. ANDERSON
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
CONCERNING WILLFUL SUPPRESSION OF EVIDENCE JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion in Limine
TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO WORKERS COMPENSATION BENEFITS; DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. ELLIS IN SUPPORT THEREOF;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 47 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 miscellaneous other
AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 46 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 miscellaneous other
DEFENDANT'S SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 43 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Response
Defendants' response to plaintiff objections to defendants' witness list.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Notice of Lien
filed by Guilford Steiner Sarvas & Carbonara LLP on behalf of Continental Casualty Company
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Order
granting exparte to continue trial
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Declaration
of Kenneth Silverstein in support of exparte
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Exparte Application
for order continuing the current trial date; memo of points and authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 38 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 reply to motion
INLIMINE FOR ORDER PRECLUDING INTRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ENTITLED REMITTANCE ADVICE, INVOICE AND DETALIED INVOICE DATED NOVEMBER 18 2003 AND MARCH 11,2003 AND ENTITLE UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 miscellaneous other
supplemental request for judicial notice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Reply Brief
in support of motion for summary judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 34 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 miscellaneous other
reply to plaintiff's statement of disputed material facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Objection
to plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 32 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Request For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Reply to Opposition
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Objection
to evidence in support of motion for summary judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Opposition
to separate statement of undisputed material facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Opposition
to motion for summary judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Opposition
to motion to bifurcate
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Motion
TO BIFURCATE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Motion
FOR NON SUITE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CAUSE OF ACTION FOR PRODUCT LIABILITY;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Reply to Opposition
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Opposition
to motion to specially set hearing for motion for summary judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Motion
TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Answer To Unverified Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Amendment to Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Amendment to Complaint
DOE 1 IS NOW, UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS PRODUCTIONS LLLP, L.P.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Answer To Unverified Complaint
BY DEFENDNAT UNIVERSAL STUDIOS INC
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Motion
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Amended Answer to Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Notice
of non opposition to motion for leave to file amended answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Motion for Leave
to file amended answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Notice
of final status conference and trial
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Default Entered
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Answer To Unverified Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Statement of Damages
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Request for Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Notice
of order to show cause re failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 11 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?