Chafik Kasablaq Vs. John Jezzini, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC041796

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kasablaq Chafik, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office Of Lawrence P. House

v.
No Logo Jezzini John, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Steven M. Sepassi

No Logo Zepeda Ruth A., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Steven M. Sepassi

Type Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)
Status Other Judgment 04/03/2006
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Notice of Stay
OF PROCEEDINGS
    Blank 40 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Notice
    OF CONTINUANCE OF EXAMINATION OF THIRD PARTY WITNESS
      Blank 39 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice
      OF CONTINUANCE OF THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION OF WAJIHA SIDDIQUI
        Blank 38 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Proof of Service
        served: Wajiah Siddiqui
          Blank 37 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
          ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR; ORDER WAJIAH SIDDIQUI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
            Blank 36 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
            ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR, ORDER WAJIAH SIDDIQUI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMIANTION
              Blank 35 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
              ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR, ORDER WAJIAH SIDDIQUI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
                Blank 34 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR, ORDER WAJIAH SIDDIQUI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
                  Blank 33 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 Proof of Service
                    Blank 32 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                    ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR, ORDER JOHN JEZZINI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                      ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR AS TO JOHN JEZZINI
                        Blank 30 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                        ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR ORDER JOHN JEZZINI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                          ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, ORDER JOHN JEZZINI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINA TION
                            Blank 28 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                            ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, ORDER JOHN JEZZINI TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINA TION
                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Filed Writ of Exec
                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Notice
                                OF RULING ON DEFECTIVE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice
                                  of relation of cases and changes to hearing dates
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Filed Writ of Exec
                                    MONEY JUDGMENT
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Notice Of Ruling
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Motion for an Order
                                        amending judgment; memo of pts & autho. & decl. of Lawrence P. House in support thereof
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Exparte Application
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                                            OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR: JOHN JEZZINI
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Judgment*
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Opposition
                                                TO PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR FURTHER ORDER REGARDING ENFORCEMENT OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; DECLARATION OF JOHN JEZZINI IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 miscellaneous other
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR FURTHER ORDERS ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Exparte Application
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Opposition
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Notice Of Ruling
                                                        ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Exparte Application
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Order
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Objection
                                                              TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Notice of Settlement
                                                                AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                  WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT, RUTH ZEPEDA ONLY***
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Order
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Stipulation
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Answer
                                                                        BY DEFENDANT, RUTH A. ZEPEDA
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Notice of Motion
                                                                          AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS OF THE COMPLAINT AND OTHER IRRELEVANT PORTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Demurrer
                                                                            TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                              AND COMPLAINT
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Complaint filed
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Complaint
                                                                                  OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,795 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?