Evelin Sanchez Flores v. Terah Wicker
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC042961

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Flores Evelin Sanchez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Wicker Terah, Defendant

Represented by Gray,york & Duffy

Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Reclassified-Limited-Glendale 11/07/2006
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Statement-Case Management
    Blank 8 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Statement-Case Management
      Blank 7 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Notice Of Association Of Attorneys
        Blank 6 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Answer to Complaint
          Blank 5 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Proof of Service
            Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Summons Filed
              Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Notice-Case Management Conference
                Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Complaint
                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Notice
                  of OSC re trial court delay reduction

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5,489 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?