John Buck v. Ridgeview Landscape Maintenance Association, Et

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC043121
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Banciu Eleonora, Defendant
No Logo Konat William, Defendant
No Logo Price Peter L., Defendant
No Logo Ridgeview Landscape Maintenance Assoc., Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Arthur Minassian Esq., Mediator
No Logo Buck, John, Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per
No Logo Medellin Mario, Cross-Defendant in Pro Per
Attributes
Type Other Real Property Rights Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 02/15/2008
Timeline
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Request For Dismissal
with prejudice as to the complaint and cross complaint filed by Ridgeview Landscape Maintenance Association on 9-15-06;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Notice
of non jury trial
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Substitution of Attorney
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Substitution of Attorney
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Declaration
IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Declaration
IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Motion to be Relieved/Withdraw
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Statement-Agreement
Partial) (FIRST
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Notice of Change of Address
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Notice-Mediation Hrg Date
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 General Denial
with affirmative defenses
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Summons Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.
RE: ELEONORA BANCIU, AN INDIVIDUAL BY SERVING RINCON CORPORATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.
RE: WILLIAM KONAT, AN INDIVIDUAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.
RE: RIDGEVIEW LANDSCAPE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION BY SERVING WILLIAM KONAT, AGENT FOR SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.
RE: PETER L. PRICE, AN INDIVIDUAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Summons Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Notice
of OSC re trial court delay reduction
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 4 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?