L.a. Federal Credit Union Vs. Areg Khachikian, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC048952

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Los Angeles Federal Credit Union, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Khachikian Areg, Defendant
No Logo Madatyan Edward, Defendant
No Logo Madatyan Egar (doe 21 & Doe 51), Defendant
No Logo Madatyan Elvis, Defendant
No Logo Madatyan Manuel, Defendant
No Logo Sohrabyan Armik, Defendant
No Logo Gad Auto Body Shop, Defendant's DBA
No Logo Lieber, Jeffrey E., Mediator
No Logo Madatyan Edgar, Defendant's AKA
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Judgment by Court 11/29/2010
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 miscellaneous other
REJECTION OF WRIT
    Blank 49 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Remittitur Filed.
    Affirmed
      Blank 48 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 miscellaneous other
      bench warrant for Adrina Agakhanyan
        Blank 47 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 miscellaneous other
        bench warrant for Edward Madatyan aka Edgar Madatyan
          Blank 46 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Filed Writ of Exec
            Blank 45 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Abstract - misc
            ABC LEGAL
              Blank 44 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Proof of Service
                Blank 43 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Notice
                NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
                  Blank 42 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Proof of Service
                  SERVED: ADRINA AGAKHAYAN
                    Blank 41 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                    ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR EDWARD MADATYAN ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
                      Blank 40 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Appl. & Ord. for appearance & exam
                      ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT DEBTOR ADRINA AGAKHANYAN ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION
                        Blank 39 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Notice
                        TO REPORTERS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Filed Writ of Exec
                          AMT REMAIN IS $46,315.09
                            Blank 37 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 Notice of Designation of Record
                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                Blank 35 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011 Notice-Atty-Notice of Appeal
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Reply to Opposition
                                      TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Abstract - misc
                                        ABC LEGAL
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Opposition
                                          TO MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL; DECL OF PAUL PITTS
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Declaration
                                            of Derek L. Tabone in Support of Motion for New Trial
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Declaration
                                              of Elvis Madatyan in Support of Motion for New Trial
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                in Support of Motion for New Trial
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Declaration
                                                  OF DEREK L TABONE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Motion for New Trial
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 Judgment*
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Brief
                                                          TRIAL
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Answer
                                                            TO COMPLAINT
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Amendment to Complaint
                                                              doe 21 & doe 51 is EDGAR MADATYAN
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Statement
                                                                FIRST MEDIATION HAS NOT ENDED
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Notice
                                                                    of Ruling
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Reply to Opposition
                                                                            TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Opposition
                                                                                TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DECL. OF ALANA ANAYA
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Req for Entry of Court's Judgment
                                                                                  REQUIRED CIVIL DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Declaration
                                                                                    OF CRAIG STALNAKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP585D
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Default Entered
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                        ITEM 5A,B,C IS OMITTED.
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Default Entered
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ARJIK SOHRABYAN DBA AS GAD AUTO BODY SHOP ONLY
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Summons Filed
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Complaint

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 449 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?