Tasha Gilleland v. John Guagenti, M.d.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. EC056127

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gilleland Tasha, Plaintiff

Represented by Simonis Julian Law Office

v.
No Logo Guagenti John M.d., Defendant

Represented by Peterson and Bradford LLP

Type Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 10/30/2012
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Request For Dismissal
with prejudice as to the entire action
    Blank 42 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Notice of Settlement
      Blank 41 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Notice of Settlement
        Blank 40 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Opposition
        TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4
          Blank 39 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Opposition
          TO DEF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3
            Blank 38 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Plaintiffs Reply
            in support of motion to compel
              Blank 37 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Motion in Limine
              index
                Blank 36 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Motion to Tax Costs
                #1 to preclude evidence or argument that any other condition or disability caused the incident to occur
                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice
                  that the parties stipulate that deft. shall only introduce the patient chart produced at the deposition
                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                    #4 to preclude evidence or argument on matters where defendant did not respond to supplemental discovery
                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                      #5 to preclude deft. from calling "Joy King" as a witness
                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Motion in Limine
                        #2 to exclude any evidence or argument
                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Notice
                          of mandatory settlement
                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Order
                            ON EX PARTE APPL TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY
                              Blank 29 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Exparte Application
                              to compel deft. to answer supplemental interrogatory and requests for production of documents
                                Blank 28 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Declaration
                                re ex parte notice
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                  RE MEDIATION & POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Notice
                                    of errata re Notice of taking Motion for Summary Judgment off calendar
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Notice
                                      of taking Motion for Summary Judgment off calendar
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Opposition
                                        to Motion for Summary Judgment of deft., John Guagenti, MD
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Objection
                                          to declaration of Ronald L Moy, MD re Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Declaration
                                            of Marilyn Mehlmauer, MD in opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of deft., John Guagenti, MD
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Separate Statement
                                              in opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Declaration
                                                of pltff. Tasha Gilleland in opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of deft., John Guagenti, Md
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                  TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON DEF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Order
                                                    ON EX PARTE APPL TO CONT TRIAL DATE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING, & ASSOCIATED DATES
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Exparte Application
                                                      to continue trial date
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Declaration
                                                        re Ex parte notice
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Exhibits
                                                          in support of deft's Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Opposition
                                                                to pltff's Motion to compel further answers to form interrogatories
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Separate Statement
                                                                  in support of motion to compel further answers to form interrogatories
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                    further answers to form interrogatories
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: 11/21/2011 Order: Case Management
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Demand For Jury Trial
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 Answer
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011 Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.
                                                                              personal svc on 8-25-11
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Notice
                                                                                of osc re trial court delay reduction act
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Summons Filed
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Complaint

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2,279 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?