Lela Mattern-Burke v. John Hatterer, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 15-4000

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 2:24 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012252831 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: Motion to Withdraw Case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke without costs. Certificate of Service dated 04/04/2016. (DJD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012253004 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), filed. (JK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012242537 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
      Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012241455 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER (FISHER, JORDAN and VANASKIE, Circuit Judges) granting Motion to reopen case and extension of time to file Case opening forms filed by Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke, filed. Panel ID CCO-049. FISHER, Authoring Judge. (JK)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012241502 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
          ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 03/23/2016 , to be filed by 04/25/2016. (JK)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012195002 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke to Reopen Case. Certificate of Service dated 02/01/2016. (DJD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012187667 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
              NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke requesting Motion to Reopen. Compliance due 01/28/2016. (JK)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012186496 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 01/22/2016. (TYW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012187624 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Daniel J. D'Antonio, Esq. for Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke.. (JK)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012187631 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                    TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1) ordering transcript of the proceedings. (JK)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012187636 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                      CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke, received. (JK)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012187639 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                        CONCISE SUMMARY OF THE CASE on behalf of Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke, received. (JK)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012187656 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                          MOTION filed by Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke for a 14 Day Extension of Time to file Case Opening Forms and Appeal Fees. Response due on 02/02/2015. Certificate of Service dated 01/19/2015. (JK)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012182814 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephanie L. Hersperger John T. Pion James DeCinti on behalf of Appellee(s) John Hatterer, Lily Transportation Corp., Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Commercial Trailer Leasing, Inc. and Eric Upchurch. (SLH)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012182830 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                              ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Lily Transportation Corp, filed. (SLH)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012182835 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ryder Truck Rental Inc, filed. (SLH)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012182838 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Commercial Trailer Leasing Inc, filed. (SLH)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012171170 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                    FOLLOW UP LETTER to James DeCinti, Esq. for Ryder Truck Rental Inc, Lily Transportation Corp, John Hatterer, Commercial Trailer Leasing Inc and Eric Upchurch, Stephanie L. Hersperger, Esq. for Ryder Truck Rental Inc, Lily Transportation Corp, John Hatterer, Commercial Trailer Leasing Inc and Eric Upchurch and John T. Pion, Esq. for Ryder Truck Rental Inc, Lily Transportation Corp, John Hatterer, Commercial Trailer Leasing Inc and Eric Upchurch requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/19/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 01/19/2016. (JK)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012171125 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                      FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael J. Pisanchyn, Esq. for Lela Mattern-Burke requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/19/2016. Information Statement on or before 01/19/2016. Concise Summary on or before 01/19/2016. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 01/19/2016.. (JK)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012167990 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                                        PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Louis E. Bricklin, Esq. for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co will not participate in this appeal, received. (JK)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012161022 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                          CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Lela Mattern-Burke in District Court No. 2-15-cv-05171. (SB)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 202 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?