Blevins v. AbbVie, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00967

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 4:31 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Howard J Blevins, II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
Space Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
v.
Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Abbott Laboratories"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boisvert +1 215 994 2312 chip.boisvert@dechert.com
No Logo AbbVie Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boisvert +1 215 994 2312 chip.boisvert@dechert.com
AbbVie, Inc. AbbVie, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Reata Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boisvert +1 215 994 2312 chip.boisvert@dechert.com
No Logo Besins Healthcare Inc., Defendant
No Logo Besins Healthcare Sa, Defendant
No Logo Solvay Sa, Defendant
No Logo Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boisvert +1 215 994 2312 chip.boisvert@dechert.com
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
SHORT FORM ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AbbVie Products, Inc., AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC(Boisvert, Christopher) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Products, Inc., AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC by Christopher Boisvert (Boisvert, Christopher) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
      WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Howard J Blevins, II. AbbVie Products, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2016, answer due 3/25/2016; AbbVie, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2016, answer due 3/25/2016; Abbott Laboratories waiver sent on 1/25/2016, answer due 3/25/2016; Besins Healthcare Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2016, answer due 3/25/2016; Besins Healthcare S.A. waiver sent on 1/25/2016, answer due 3/25/2016; Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 1/25/2016, answer due 3/25/2016. (Hellums, Chris) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
        PAYMENT regarding 1 of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11522702. (Hellums, Chris) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
          PAYMENT regarding 1 of Filing fee $ 400. (Hellums, Chris) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard J. Blevins by Chris T. Hellums (Hellums, Chris) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hellums, Chris) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?