Herrick v. UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-10274

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 2:32 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Larry Herrick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole L. Thompson +1 517 980 2274 +1 248 593 1244 thomps74@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 115

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Hardin, II +1 248 723 9900 kenhardin@hardinlawpc.net
v.
No Logo UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Radtke +1 248 354 9650 dradtke@michworkerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Rorai +1 248 354 9650 prorai@michworkerlaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice and Without Costs. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF HEARING on 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1). Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to Response re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Tindle v Enochs Case) (Rorai, Patrick) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE to 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Larry Herrick. (Hardin, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF HEARING on 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1). Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole L. Thompson on behalf of Larry Herrick. (Thompson, Nicole) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hardin, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David R. Radtke appearing on behalf of UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071 (Radtke, David) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) by UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 Young v UAW, # 3 Exhibit 2 Rathbun v Operating Eng, # 4 Exhibit 3 State Constitution Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit 4 Gant v AFSCME) (Rorai, Patrick) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071 served on 4/11/2016, answer due 5/2/2016. (Hardin, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2016 03:15 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to 4 Answer to Amended Complaint, Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Larry Herrick. (Hardin, Kenneth)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071. (Rorai, Patrick)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Larry Herrick against UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hardin, Kenneth)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Issued for *UNITED AUTO WORKERS UNION, Local 2071* (DWor) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5524135 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hardin, Kenneth)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 9/28/2016 is Cancelled (AChu)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2016. (AChu)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET at the request of counsel for 5/3/2016 10:45 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?