Mehasania v. Krassner et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00195
District Judge James R. Nowlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 5:07 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Zahara Mehasania, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Christensen +1 512 220 1800 +1 512 220 1801 danjchristensen@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith & Carlson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cassandra F. Charles +1 512 346 5688 +1 512 527 0398 ccharles@carlsonattorneys.com
v.
No Logo Alvarez and Marsal Holdings LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Savrick Schumann Johnson McGarr Kaminski & Shirley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Wilson Shirley, III +1 512 347 1604 +1 512 347 1676 wilson@ssjmlaw.com
No Logo Laura Krassner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Savrick Schumann Johnson McGarr Kaminski & Shirley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Wilson Shirley, III +1 512 347 1604 +1 512 347 1676 wilson@ssjmlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Alvarez and Marsal Holdings, LLC, Laura Krassner and Zahara Mehasania. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice)(Shirley, C.) Modified on 6/2/2010 to add filer (dm, ). (Entered: 06/01/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
      Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Cassandra F. Charles; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 100006062. (td) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cassandra Fox Charles. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (td) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cassandra F. Charles on behalf of Zahara Mehasania. (jk, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER for removing party to supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $350 receipt number 100005836), filed by Alvarez and Marsal Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Travis County Court Docket Sheet, # 3 Citation, # 4 Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure, # 5 Defendant Alvarez and Marsal Holdings, LLC's Original Answer and Special Exceptions, # 6 Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet /Supplemental/Receipt)(klw, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 239 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?