USA v. Dominguez et al

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00605-RJS-4
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 11, 2025 at 11:32 AM EDT (2.1 weeks ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn Geovjian Crowley +1 212 637 1034 +1 212 637 2527 shawn.crowley@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew James DeFilippis +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2527 andrew.defilippis@usdoj.gov
Space Stephanie Lindsay Lake +1 212 637 1066 stephanie.lake@usdoj.gov
Space James M. McDonald +1 212 637 2405 +1 202 434 5029 James.McDonald2@usdoj.gov
Other Parties
No Logo Marlon Sisnero-Gil, Defendant (4)

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marlon Geoffrey Kirton +1 646 435 5519 +1 212 808 3020 kirtonlawfirm@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained JUSTIN LEVINE +1 718 992 9600 +1 718 293 2891 justlevine@aol.com
Space OLIVER STORCH +1 212 587 2383 +1 212 732 7080 oliver.storch@verizon.net

Represented by Colson Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah Austern Colson +1 212 257 6455 +1 212 257 6453 dcolson@colsonlaw.com

Represented by Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Sabrina P. Shroff +1 212 417 8713 +1 212 571 0392 sabrina_shroff@fd.org

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabrina P. Shroff +1 212 417 8713 +1 212 571 0392 sabrina_shroff@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4)
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/2/2015
County Bronx
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
115-mj-01664-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846=CD.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
Count 1s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846=CD.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE/POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
Count 1ss
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846=CD.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
Count 2ss
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841B=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841B=CD.F CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE - SELL, DISTRIBUTE, OR DISPENSE
Count 1sss
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846=CD.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
Count 2sss
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841B=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841B=CD.F CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE - SELL, DISTRIBUTE, OR DISPENSE
Count 3sss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 3146.F
Offense Level 4
183146.F FAILURE TO APPEAR
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags ECF,PRIOR
Timeline
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/11/2025, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/18/2025, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/14/2025, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/15/2025, Entered: None Reduce Sentence re Amendment 821
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/2/2023, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/22/2022, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 226 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan dated November 12, 2020 re: Sentencing Hearing Joint Letter Document filed by USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
LREF
Legal Document 225 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah A. Colson dated 11/12/2020 re: Remission of Judgment (Colson, Deborah)
LREF
Legal Document 224 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Sentencing of Defendant Marlon Sisnero-Gil is scheduled to take place on November 18, 2020. In light of defense counsel's representation that the parties have been engaged "in the process of resolving a major sentencing issue" in the hopes of "avoiding a Fatico [h]earing," (see, e.g., Doc. No. 222; see also Doc. Nos. 188, 204, 218), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit a joint letter by November 13, 2020 clarifying their positions as to whether there remain any disputed sentencing issues and whether either party requests a Fatico hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the sentencing shall take place in Courtroom 12D at (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/11/2020) (ap)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT [222] LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil...ENDORSEMENT...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing is re-scheduled to November 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. In light of the flexibility required to accommodate the logistics and planning of in-person proceedings during the pandemic, the Court will reserve (and the parties shall calendar) November 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. as an alternate date for sentencing. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/3/2020) (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Sentencing set for 11/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.. (jw)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020, Terminated: 9/4/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
SIXTH LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated 09/03/2020 re: Continuance Request . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [220] LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 7/6/2020 re: suspension of payments. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ms. Linette Sisnero-Gil's request for a six-month suspension of her monthly payments toward the forfeiture judgment is granted. By January 8, 2021, counsel shall submit a status letter apprising the Court of Ms. Sisnero-Gil's ability to resume making payments toward the forfeiture judgment. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/7/2020) (ap)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 7/6/2020 re: suspension of payments (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-605-4) Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated June 15, 2020 re: submitted to request a continuance of the said sentencing to Friday, September 18, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing is re-scheduled to September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/15/2020, United States Circuit Judge, Sitting by Designation)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020, Terminated: 6/15/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
FIFTH LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated June 15, 2020 re: Continuance Request . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-605-4) Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated May 30, 2020 re: I represent co-signer Tanyi Gil in the above-referenced matter. This Court entered an Order of forfeiture on April 26, 2016, against Ms. Gil, because defendant Marlon Sisnero-Gil absconded without permission of the Court. As of today, Ms. Gil has paid $1500.00 toward the bond. Ms. Gil has still not resumed working. I spoke with Ms. Gil yesterday. She informed me that she is not yet back to work. Her employer will update her on June 15, 2020, concerning her future employment. Ms. Gil's financial situation remains the same.1 I request that the Court suspends payment through June 15, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ms. Tanyi Gil's request for a suspension of payments through June 15, 2020 is granted. By June 18, 2020, counsel shall submit a status letter apprising the Court of Ms. Gil's ability to resume making payments toward the forfeiture judgment. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/8/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/30/2020, Entered: 5/30/2020, Terminated: 6/15/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated May 30, 2020 re: Update . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Kirton, Marlon)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-605-04) Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [214] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated April 13, 2020 re: Update. I represent co-signer Tanyi Gil in the above-referenced matter. This Court entered an Order of forfeiture on April 26, 2016, against Ms. Gil, because defendant Marlon Sisnero-Gil absconded without permission of the Court. As of today, Ms. Gil has paid $1500.00 toward the bond.... I request that this Court suspend Ms. Gil's payments through May 31, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ms. Tanyi Gil's request for a suspension of payments through May 31, 2020 is granted. By May 31, 2020, counsel shall submit a status letter apprising the Court of Ms. Gil's ability to resume making payments toward the forfeiture judgment. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/14/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020, Terminated: 4/14/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated April 13, 2020 re: Update . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Kirton, Marlon)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-605-4) Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [212] LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Attorney Deborah Colson dated 4/10/2020 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil's request to suspend payments. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ms. Linette Sisnero-Gil's request for a three-month suspension of her monthly payments toward the forfeiture judgment is granted. By July 10, 2020, counsel shall submit a status letter apprising the Court of Ms. Siserno-Gil's ability to resume making payments toward the forfeiture judgment. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/10/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 4/10/2020 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil's request to suspend payments (Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-605-04) Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [210] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSAs Shawn G. Crowley/Stephanie Lake, dated April 9, 2020 re: Request for Sentencing Adjournment. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing is re-scheduled to June 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11B the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/9/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan dated April 9, 2020 re: Request for Sentencing Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Lake, Stephanie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-605-04) Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [208] LETTER MOTION filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated April 3, 2020 re: Update. I represent co-signer Tanyi Gil in the above-referenced matter. This Court entered an Order of forfeiture on April 26, 2016, against Ms. Gil, because Mr. Sisnero-Gil absconded without permission of the Court. As of today, Ms. Gil has paid $1500.00 toward the bond. There have not been payments since September of 2018. I will apprise the court of Ms. Gil's financial status/ability to pay on or before April 13, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT counsel for Ms. Tanyi Gil shall provide a status update to the Court by April 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/6/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020, Terminated: 4/6/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated April 3, 2020 re: Update . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Kirton, Marlon)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-605-04) Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated March 24, 2020 re: I represent co-signer Tanyi Gil in the above-referenced matter. This Court entered an Order of forfeiture on April 26, 2016, against Ms. Gil, because Mr. Sisnero-Gil absconded without permission of the Court. I want to update the Court regarding the status of Ms. Gil's obligations relative to the Court's Order. I will apprise the Court on or before April 3, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT counsel for Ms. Tanyi Gil shall provide a status update to the Court by April 3, 2020. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Doc. No. 206. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/27/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020, Terminated: 3/27/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Marlon G. Kirton, Esq. dated March 24, 2020 re: Update . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Kirton, Marlon)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) on [204] FOURTH LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated 03/12/2020 re: Continuance Request. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing shall be re-scheduled to April 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 118 of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007.. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/12/2020) (ap)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020, Terminated: 3/12/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
FOURTH LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated 03/12/2020 re: Continuance Request . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020, Terminated: 3/12/2020 Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FOURTH MOTION to Continue Sentencing., FOURTH LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch,Esq. dated 03/12/20 re: Continuance of Sentence . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver) Modified on 3/12/2020 (ka).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set/reset hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Sentencing set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ap)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Notice to Attorney Storch, Oliver to RE-FILE Document [203] FOURTH MOTION to Continue Sentencing.Storch, Oliver FOURTH LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch,Esq. dated 03/12/20 re: Continuance of Sentence. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Notice to Attorney Storch, Oliver to RE-FILE Document [202] FOURTH MOTION to Continue Sentencing. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020, Terminated: 3/11/2020 Motion to Continue
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FOURTH MOTION to Continue Sentencing. Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver) Modified on 3/12/2020 (ka).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Notice of change of address
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. New Address: Oliver S. Storch Attorney at Law, 120 Broadway, 28th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10271, 212-587-2383. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to (15-Cr-605-4) Marlon Sisnero-Gil. At the request of Defendant and with the government's consent, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing is adjourned to March 13, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/21/2020)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Letter - Sentencing
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Hon. Richard J. Sullivan dated February 21, 2020. (Lake, Stephanie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) on [194] SECOND LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated 01/14/2020 re: Continuance of Sentence Request. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing is adjourned to February 28, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant's sentencing submission shall be filed no later than February 14, 2020, and the government's sentencing submission shall be filed no later than February 21, 2020. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/14/2020) (ap)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
SECOND LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated 01/14/2020 re: Continuance of Sentence Request . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set/reset hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Sentencing set for 2/28/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ap)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [188] LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4)...ENDORSEMENT...It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's sentencing is adjourned to January 30, 2020 at 10:00am in Courtroom 23B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan US Courthouse. Defendant's sentencing submission shall be filed no later than January 16, 2020, and the government's sentencing submission shall be filed no later than January 23, 2020. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/10/2019) (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019, Terminated: 12/10/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. dated 12/10/2019 re: Continuance Request . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil:Defendant Replies due by 1/16/2020. Government Responses due by 1/23/2020; Sentencing set for 1/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan (jw)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 9/18/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Plea held on 9/18/19 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Beth Fontane-Howard, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Change of Not Guilty Plea
Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) Count 1sss,2sss,3sss. (jw)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Change of Plea Hearing as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 9/18/2019., Plea entered by Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) Guilty as to Count 1sss,2sss,3sss. Defendant present, in custody, with attorney Oliver Storch. AUSAs Stephanie Lake and Shawn Crowley present. Court reporter and Spanish interpreter present. Defendant withdrew his previously entered plea of not guilty and entered a plea of guilty to Counts One, Two, and Three of the seventh superseding indictment (S7). The Court scheduled sentencing for Wednesday, December 18 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 15A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Defendant shall submit his sentencing submission no later than December 4, 2019, and the government shall submit its sentencing submission no later than December 11, 2019. (jw)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a change-of-plea proceeding on September 18, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/16/2019) (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/19/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 4/19/16 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 5/15/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (mqu)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Hearing held on 5/15/15 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (mqu)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 4/15/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Arraignment held on 4/15/19 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on [176] LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 5/20/2019 re: modification of forfeiture judgment. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, in light of the financial difficulties set forth in this letter, Ms. Sisnero-Gil's monthly payments toward the forfeiture judgment are temporarily suspended for three months. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, beginning August 20, 2019, Ms. Sisnero-Gil shall resume payments toward the forfeiture judgment in the amount of $50 per month. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/20/2019)(lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 5/20/2019 re: modification of forfeiture judgment (Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: The parties shall comply with the following schedule for pre-trial submissions: September 17, 2019 - The government shall file any motions in limine and/or Rule 404(b) notices as well as its exhibit list and witness list. September 24, 2019 - Defendant shall respond to the government's motions and file any of his own motions in limine as well as his exhibit list and witness list. October 1, 2019 - The government shall respond to Defendant's motions in limine, if any. The parties shall submit their joint proposed voir dire, requests to charge, and verdict form. October 11, 2019 - The patties shall appear in Courtroom 15A at 3:00 p.m. for a final pre-trial conference and argument on all pending motions in limine. Trial in this matter will begin at 9:30 a.m. on October 15, 2019 in in Courtroom 15A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/17/2019) (All Deadlines have been set) (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Status Conference
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Oliver S. Storch appearing for Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Appearance Type: Retained. (Storch, Oliver)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Add and Terminate Attorneys
Attorney update in case as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Attorney Andrew James Frisch for Marlon Sisnero-Gil added. Attorney Justin Levine terminated. (jbo)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None arraignment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: In light of Defendant's recent extradition to this District, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a status conference and arraignment on Monday, April 15, 2019 at 3 :30 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. (Arraignment set for 4/15/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Status Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/12/2019) (ap)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stephanie Lindsay Lake appearing for USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan, from Shawn G. Crowley dated 2/26/2019 re: The Government writes to update the court on the status of defendant. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the government shall inform the Court of Defendant's status no later than 24 hours after he has arrived in this district. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/26/2019) (ap)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 1/18/2018 re: I write today to update the Court on Ms. Sisnero-Gil 's financial status. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, beginning January 31, 2018, Linette Sisnero-Gil shall resume payment towards Defendant's forfeited bond in the amount of $100 per month. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/18/2018)(ft)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on [161] LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 10/31/2017. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the suspension of Ms. Sisnero-Gil's payments toward the forfeiture judgment shall remain in place. IT IS ORDERED that, by January 5, 2018, Ms. Sisnero-Gil shall submit an update to the Court addressing her ability to resume payment on Defendant's forfeited bond. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/31/2017) (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 10/31/2017 (Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on [159] LETTER by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Shawn Crowley dated 10/06/17 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil Bond Payments. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ms. Sisnero-Gil shall submit a letter updating the Court as to the status of her employment and child support payments by Tuesday, October 31, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/6/2017) (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Shawn Crowley dated 10/06/17 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil Bond Payments Document filed by USA. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [156] Letter filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil (Government Responses due by 10/6/2017)...ENDORSEMENT...It is HEREBY ORDERED that the government shall submit a response to Ms. Sisnero-Gil's letter by Friday, October 6, 2017. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/3/17)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 10/2/2017 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil (Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [152] Letter filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in light of the changed circumstances set forth in this letter, Ms. Sisnero-Gil's monthly payments toward the forfeiture judgment are temporarily suspended for six months. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by October 3, 2017, Ms. Sisnero-Gil shall apprise the Court of her financial circumstances, including whether she has found employment. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/5/2017)(ft)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 7/5/2017 (Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil on re: [148] Letter filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. re: To request that the Court suspend Ms. Sisnero-Gil's payments for one year to allow her to earn back at least some of the money that was intercepted...ENDORSEMENT...Ms. Sisnero-Gil's request is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. If Ms. Sisnero-Gil wishes to renew her request, she is directed to submit her motion with an updated financial affidavit and citation to relevant authority. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/1/17)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Shawn Crowley dated 5/16/2017 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil Document filed by USA. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 5/11/17 re: Accordingly, I request that the Court suspend Ms. Sisnero-Gil's payments for one year to allow her to earn back at least some of the money that was intercepted...ENDORSEMENT: It is hereby ORDERED that, by May 16, 2017, the government shall respond to bond co-signor Sisnero-Gil's letter setting forth the basis for its objection to her request. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/11/17)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Deborah Colson dated 5/11/2017 re: Linette Sisnero-Gil (Colson, Deborah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 2/13/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to (15-Cr-605-04) Marlon Sisnero-Gil. On April 26, 2016, due to Defendant's fugitive status, the Court entered a $100,000.00 judgment in favor of the United States of America against Defendant Marlon Sisnero-Gil and his two sisters -- Linette Sisnero-Gil and Tanyi Gil -- who co-signed the bond that secured his release on bail. (Doc. No. 80.) On March 20, 2017, the Court held a hearing in aid of judgment execution, at which bond co-signor Tanyi Gil appeared with counsel. Having assessed Ms. Gil's ability to pay, and for the reasons stated on the record at the February 27, 2017 and March 20, 2017 hearings, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Tanyi Gil shall make monthly payments of $100.00 toward the amount owed on the Judgment, with the first payment due April 1, 2017, and subsequent payments due on the first day of each month, continuing until the Judgment is satisfied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/20/2017)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Status Conference as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 3/20/2017. Defendant not present. AUSA Shawn Crowley present. Court reporter and Spanish interpreter present. Bail co-signor Linette Sisnero-Gil present with attorney Deborah Colson. Bail co-signor Tanyi Gil present with attorney Marlon Kirton. Court will issue order setting $100/month judgment payment plan as to Tanyi Gil. (jw)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marlon Geoffrey Kirton appearing for Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Appearance Type: CJA Appointment. Appearing for bail co-signer Tanyi Gil (Kirton, Marlon)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 2/13/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Status Conference as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 2/27/2017, as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil( Status Conference set for 3/20/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) Defendant Marlon Sisnero-Gil not present. AUSAs Andrew DeFilippis and Shawn Crowley present. Court reporter and Spanish interpreter present. Bail co-signor Linette Sisnero-Gil present with attorney Deborah Colson. Bail co-signor Tanyi Gil present with attorney Marlon Kirton. Status conference scheduled for March 20, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. Government to send letter updating Court regarding attachment of property by March 13, 2017 (jw)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Status Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan (jw)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Bond Forfeiture Hearing as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 2/13/2017. Bail co-signor Linette Sisnero-Gil present with Attorney Deborah Colson. Bail co-signor Tanyi Gil present with Attorney Marlon Kirton. AUSA James McDonald present. Court reporter and Spanish interpreter present. Court will issue order appointing Marlon Kirton as CJA counsel for Tanyi Gil. Status conference scheduled for 2/27/2017 at 4:00 p.m. (jw)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 1/12/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Deborah Colson, Esq., is appointed as CJA counsel to Linette Sisnero-Gil, co-signor of the bond agreement of the Defendant in this matter. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/12/2017)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Linette Sisnero-Gil shall make monthly payments of $100.00 toward the amount owed on the Judgment, with the first payment due February 1, 2017, and subsequent payments due on the first day of each month, continuing until the Judgment is satisfied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Linette Sisnero-Gil shall appear with counsel on February 13, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. to address her efforts to pay off the $100,000 judgment. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/12/2017)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Status Conference / Hearing In-Aid-Of Judgment as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 1/12/2017. Bond co-signor Linette Sisnero-Gil present with Attorney Deborah Colson. AUSAs James McDonald and Kathleen Zebrowski present. Court reporter and Spanish interpreter present. Court will issue order setting $100/month judgment payment plan as to co-signor Linette Sisnero-Gil. Court will issue order appointing Deborah Colson as CJA counsel for Linette Sisnero-Gil. Status conference scheduled for 2/13/2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 2/13/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (jbo)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Add and Terminate Attorneys
Attorney update in case as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Attorney Deborah Austern Colson for Marlon Sisnero-Gil added. (jw)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Status Conference as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 12/21/2016. AUSA James McDonald present. Court reporter present. Government updated Court on status of efforts to apprehend Defendant and collect on 4/26/2016 Order and Judgment. Hearing In Aid Of Judgment as to bond co-signor Linette Sisnero-Gil set for 1/12/2017 at 12:30 p.m. (jbo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/25/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 4/25/2016 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Harold Dominguez, Carlos Bermudez Bastard, Jose De Diego Otero, Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Plea held on 03/23/2016 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (Grant, Patricia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER AND JUDGMENT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that, pursuant to Rule 46(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure:(a ) the $100,000 personal recognizance bond (the "Bond") executed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil ("Sisnero-Giln ), Linette Sisnero-Gil and Tanyi Gil be and hereby is FORFEITED; default judgment in the amount of $100,000 in favor of the United States of America against Sisnero- Gil be and hereby is ENTERED and the United States of America shall have execution therefor; judgment in the amount of $100,000 in favor of the United States of America and against Linette Sisnero-Gil and Tanyi Gil, jointly and severally, be and hereby is ENTERED and the United States of America shall have execution therefor; and (d) the property in Puerto Rico posted in support of the Bond be ad hereby is FORFEITED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/26/2016)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Bond Forfeiture Hearing
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016, Terminated: 4/26/2016 Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture
MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture . Document filed by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 indictment
(S7) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) count(s) 1sss, 2sss, 3sss. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil ( Status Conference set for 4/25/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT each of Defendant's co-signors, Linette Gil and Tanyi Gil (the "Co-Signors"), shall appear for a hearing on April 25, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, to show cause why forfeiture should not be ordered of the $100,000 personal recognizance bond and the property in Puerto Rico securing the bond, and default judgment should not be entered in the amount of $100,000 in favor of the government against Defendant and the Co-Signors. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the government shall serve a copy of this Order on the Clerk of the Court, who is the authorized agent for service under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 46(f)(3)(B). The Clerk of the Court is, in turn respectfully directed to serve a copy of this Order on each of the Co-Signors at her last known address, as required under Rule 46(f)(3)(C). SO ORDERED. "The Clerk of the Court has mailed a copy of this Order to [*** Linette Sisnero Gil and Tanyi Gil ***] by [*** U.S. Next Day Air,***], on [4/21/2016] [Tracking #1ZE22E532310005574,1ZE22E532310005565, 1ZE22E532310037423,1ZE22E532310005556] (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/19/2016)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Pretrial Conference as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 4/19/2016. AUSAs Shawn Crowley and James McDonald present for the government. Attorney Justin Levine present for Defendant Sisnero-Gil. Defendant failed to appear. The government informed the Court that it had received information suggesting that Defendant had fled or intended to flee the country. The parties raised no objections to the draft prospective juror examination and preliminary instructions distributed prior to the conference. The Court scheduled a Curcio hearing for Monday, April 25, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. and reserved decision on the government's motion to preclude cross-examination. The Court indicated that it would issue a warrant for Defendant's arrest and order Defendant's co-signors to appear for a bail forfeiture hearing on Monday, April 25, 2016. (Curcio Hearing set for 4/25/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (jbo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016, Terminated: 6/6/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from USA dated 4/18/16 re: Motion to Preclude Cross-Examination . Document filed by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/16/2016, Entered: 4/16/2016 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from USA dated 4/16/16 re: Request for Curcio Document filed by USA. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Document Error
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney James M. McDonald as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Document No. [71] Government's Proposed Verdict Form. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Notice - Other
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Government's Proposed Verdict Form as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (McDonald, James) Modified on 4/15/2016 (ka).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Proposed Examination of Jurors
PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Request to Charge
Request To Charge by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 indictment
(S6) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) count(s) 1ss, 2ss. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 03/25/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 03/25/2016 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2016. (Grant, Patricia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE James M. McDonald appearing for USA. (McDonald, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the pretrial conference previously scheduled in this matter for Thursday, April 21, 2016 is rescheduled to Tuesday, April 19, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The Court regrets any inconvenience caused by this necessary rescheduling. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/4/2016)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Witness List *
WITNESS LIST by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Exhibit
EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Harold Dominguez, Carlos Bermudez Bastard, Jose De Diego Otero, Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Crowley, Shawn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 indictment
(S4) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) count(s) 1s. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Status Conference as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 3/25/2016. AUSA Shawn Crowley present for the government. Attorney Justin Levine present with Defendant Sisnero-Gil, who was not in custody. Court reporter present. Spanish interpreter present. The Court reaffirmed the trial schedule and dates for pretrial motions and submissions set forth at the February 3, 2016 pretrial conference and in the Courts February 4, 2016 Order. (jbo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a plea conference in this matter on Friday, March 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/22/2016)(ft)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/25/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ft)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Harold Dominguez, Carlos Bermudez Bastard, Jose De Diego Otero, Marlon Sisnero-Gil ( Motions due by 3/31/2016., Defendant Replies due by 4/7/2016, Government Responses due by 4/14/2016, Jury Trial set for 4/25/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan., Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) The government shall file any motions in limine and/or Rule 404(b) notices as well as its exhibit list and witness list.Defendant shall respond to the government's motions and file any of his own motions in limine as well as his exhibit list and witness list. The government shall respond to Defendant's motions in limine, if any The parties shall submit their joint proposed voir dire, requests to charge, and verdict form. The parties shall appear in Courtroom 905 at 3:00 p.m. for a final pretrial conference and argument on all pending motions in limine. Trial in this matter will begin at 9:30 a.m. on April 25, 2016 in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/4/2016)(jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Oral Order
ORAL ORDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil: Time excluded from 1/27/16 until 2/3/16. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/27/16)(ajc)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None arraignment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Endorsed Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016, Terminated: 1/25/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Justin Levine dated January 25,2016 re: adjournment of arraignment . Document filed by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Levine, Justin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Harold Dominguez, Carlos Bermudez Bastard, Jose De Diego Otero, Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/17/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Harold Dominguez, Carlos Bermudez Bastard, Jose De Diego Otero, Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: Conference held on 12/17/2015 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (Grant, Patricia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 indictment
(S3) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Harold Dominguez (1) count(s) 1ss, Carlos Bermudez Bastard (2) count(s) 1ss, Jose De Diego Otero (3) count(s) 1s, Marlon Sisnero-Gil (4) count(s) 1. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Case Designated ECF.
Case Designated ECF as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (jm)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 1/20/16. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 12/21/15 until 1/20/16. Follows oral order of 12/21/15. See 12/21/15 DeFilippis affirmation. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/21/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 12/21/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 12/4/15 until 12/21/15. Follows oral order of 12/4/15. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/4/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Shawn Crowley in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 12/4/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 11/4/15 until 12/4/15. Follows oral order of 11/4/15. PD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/4/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 11/4/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 10/5/15 until 11/4/15. Follows oral order of 10/5/15. See 10/4/15 DeFilippis affirmation. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/5/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 10/5/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 9/4/15 until 10/5/15. Follows oral order of 9/4/15. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/4/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 9/4/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 8/5/15 until 9/4/15. Follows oral order of 8/5/15. PD. Affirmation. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 8/5/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 8/5/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil re: [8] Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 7/6/15 until 8/5/15. Follows oral order of 7/6/15. PD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 7/6/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Order to Continue - Interest of JusticeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Time excluded from 6/5/15 until 7/6/15. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 6/5/15)(jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Affirmation in Support
AFFIRMATION of Andrew DeFilippis in Support by USA as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil, the government is requesting a continuance until 7/6/15. (jbo)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin Levine appearing for Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Appearance Type: Retained. (Levine, Justin)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Agreement to forfeit property
AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT REAL PROPERTY by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Personal Recognizance Bond in the amount of $ 100,000 PRB, 2 FRP'S; Secured by Property in Puerto Rico; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Drug Testing/Treatment; Maintain or Seek Lawful Employment; Sister Linette Gil to Serve as 3rd Party Custodian; Deft to Be Released on Own Signature; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by 5/29/15 (dif)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 initial appearanceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Initial Appearance as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil held on 5/15/2015., Deft Appears with Federal Defender Sabrina Shroff with spanish interpreter and AUSA Andrew Defilippis for the government. AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: $100,00 PRB; 2 FRP'S; Secured by Property: Property in Puerto Rico; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Drug Testing/Treatment; Maintain or Seek Lawful Employment; Sister Linette Gil to Serve as 3rd Party Custodian; Deft to Be Released on Owns Signature; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by 5/29/15; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 6/5/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. Sabrina P. Shroff for Marlon Sisnero-Gil appointed.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/15/2015)(dif)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)Court Filing
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Federal Defender Sabrina Shroff Appointed) (dif)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 ComplaintCourt Filing
COMPLAINT as to Marlon Sisnero-Gil. In Violation of 21 U.S.C. 812, 841 (a) (1) & (b) (1) (B) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (dif)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None arrest
Arrest of Marlon Sisnero-Gil. (dif)[1:15-mj-01664-UA]
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 680 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?