Castillo v. Parker Drilling Offshore Company, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00024

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 12, 2017 at 1:49 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joe Castillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David S. Toy, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Holmesly +1 713 653 5600 mholmesly@spaglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spagnoletti and Co

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus Raymond Spagnoletti +1 713 653 5600 marcus@spaglaw.com
v.
No Logo Golf Valve & Lubricating Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Parker Drilling Offshore Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A Mouton +1 337 266 2189 +1 337 266 2303 cmouton@mandllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy Freeman +1 713 353 2000
No Logo Parker Drilling Offshore USA, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Sabine Storage & Operations, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Striking Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Pre-Motion Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Pre-Motion Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Request for Pre-Motion Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Holmesly on behalf of Joe Castillo, filed. (Holmesly, Mary) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Setting as to 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Please call the conference line ten minutes prior to the scheduled hearing at 409-766-3734 (jegonzalez, 3) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Joe Castillo, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Marcus) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Substitute Attorney.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kent M. Adams in place of Charles A. Mouton by Parker Drilling Offshore USA LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mouton, Charles) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Trial Term: August 2017. ETT: 3-4 days. JURY. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/26/2016. Motions to Add New Parties due by 7/26/2016 Pltf Expert List/Report due by 12/19/2016. Deft Expert List/Report due by 1/19/2017. Discovery due by 3/26/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/10/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/24/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2017. Docket Call set for 7/21/2017 at 09:00 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom before Judge George C. Hanks Jr. (Signed by Judge George C. Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                          JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Joe Castillo, filed.(Spagnoletti, Marcus) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Clerks Notice (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference & Disclosure-FORM
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?