Allstate Insurance Company v. Bienvenido S. Doctor Trust
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00031
District Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 2:15 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom Petrus & Miller LLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley R. Fukutomi +1 808 792 5804 +1 808 792 5809 ashibuya@tpm-hawaii.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B. Miller +7925 792 792 5809 rmiller@tpm-hawaii.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia K. Wall kwall@tpm-hawaii.com
v.
No Logo Bienvenido S. Doctor Trust, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Fukutomi, Ashley) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 01/26/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
      CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: # 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, # 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
        Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 3/28/2016 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 01/26/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
          Summons Issued as to Bienvenido S. Doctor Trust. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 16-00031 KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 01/26/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
              Summons (Proposed) (Fukutomi, Ashley) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Bienvenido S. Doctor Trust ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1660979.), filed by Allstate Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fukutomi, Ashley) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 78 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?