Browning-Ferris Industries of v. NLRB
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 16-1028

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2017 at 2:46 AM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207892279 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S ORDER [1655729] filed scheduling oral argument on Thursday, 03/09/2017. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207883524 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE [1650894] filed to withdraw attorney Teague Pryde Paterson who represented Teamsters Local 350 in 16-1028 filed by Teamsters Local 350 in 16-1028 [Service Date: 12/13/2016 ] [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Paterson, Teague)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207875066 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1646404] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. in 16-1028 [Service Date: 11/16/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,915 words. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207874768 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1646227] filed by NLRB in 16-1028 [Service Date: 11/15/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,955 words. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Dreeben, Linda)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207874614 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1646157] filed by Teamsters Local 350 [Service Date: 11/15/2016 ] Length of Brief: 8722 words. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Paterson, Teague)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 01207873368 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1645517] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. in 16-1028 [Service Date: 11/10/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,708 words. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207870937 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              JOINT APPENDIX [1644270] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. in 16-1028, 16-1064. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 11/02/2016 ] [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207868430 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1642925] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. in 16-1028 [Service Date: 10/26/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,939 words. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207859770 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1638297] filed by Teamsters Local 350 [Service Date: 09/28/2016 ] Length of Brief: 8621 Words. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Paterson, Teague)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207858258 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CLERK'S ORDER [1637503] filed granting petitioner Browning-Ferris' unopposed motion to extend time to file the reply brief [1637239-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT Brief due 09/28/2016 (unchanged). PETITIONER Reply Brief due 10/26/2016. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/02/2016. Final Briefs due 11/16/2016. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207821913 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
                      PETITIONER BRIEF [1617566] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. in 16-1028 [Service Date: 06/07/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,722. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207821396 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                        MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE [1617176] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 06/06/2016 ] [16-1028, 16-1064]--[Edited 06/07/2016 by LMC] (Unikowsky, Adam)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207819914 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1616316] filed by Kurt G. Larkin and co-counsel Ronald E. Meisburg Andrea R. Calem on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner American Hospital Association, American Hotel & Lodging Association, Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated General Contractors of America, Inc., International Franchise Association, National Association of Home Builders and National Retail Federation in 16-1028. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Larkin, Kurt)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207816245 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                            MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE [1614385] filed by Microsoft Corporation and HR Policy Association of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/20/2016 ] [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] --[Edited 05/20/2016 by LMC] (Loeb, Robert)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207814669 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                              CLERK'S ORDER [1613487] filed granting motion of National Association of Manufacturers, et al., to participate as amicus curiae [1607892-2] in 16-1028 [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207812219 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE [1612163] filed by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated General Contractors of America, American Hospital Association, American Hotel and Lodging Association, International Franchise Association, National Association of Home Builders, & National Retail Federation of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/06/2016 ] [16-1028, 16-1064]--[Edited 05/09/2016 by LMC] (Larkin, Kurt)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207810591 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                  CLERK'S ORDER [1611283] filed granting petitioner's unopposed motion to extend time [1610786-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: PETITIONER Brief due 06/07/2016. RESPONDENT Brief due on 07/07/2016. INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT Brief due 07/14/2016. PETITIONER Reply Brief due 07/28/2016. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 08/04/2016. Final Briefs due 08/18/2016. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207809644 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION [1610786] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. in 16-1028 to extend time to file brief to 06/07/2016. Pages: 1-10. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207804317 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                      AMENDED MOTION [1607892] filed by National Association of Manufacturers, National Restaurant Association, National Federation of Independent Business, and Coalition for a Democratic Workplace to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/08/2016 ] [16-1028] (Kirsanow, Peter)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207803905 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S ORDER [1607679] filed setting briefing schedule: PETITIONER Brief due 05/17/2016. RESPONDENT Brief due on 06/16/2016. INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT Brief due 06/23/2016. PETITIONER Reply Brief due 07/07/2016. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 07/14/2016. Final Briefs due 07/28/2016. [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207803325 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                          MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1607382] filed by Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, National Federation of Independent Business, National Restaurant Association and National Association of Manufacturers to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] [Service Date: 04/06/2016 ] [16-1028]--[Edited 04/07/2016 by LMC] (Kirsanow, Peter)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207799275 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                                            CLERK'S ORDER [1605208] filed granting motion for leave to intervene [1596298-2] in 16-1028 [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207799048 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None
                                              CLERK'S ORDER [1605054] filed granting motion to consolidate [1602710-2] in 16-1028, [1602724-2] in 16-1063 16-1063 (Consolidation started 03/22/2016) with 16-1028 [16-1028, 16-1063, 16-1064]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207796924 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1603865] filed by NLRB in 16-1028 [Service Date: 03/14/2016 ] [16-1028, 16-1064] (Dreeben, Linda)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207794711 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION [1602710] filed by NLRB in 16-1028, 16-1064 to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/21/2016) [Service Date: 03/07/2016 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [16-1028, 16-1064] (Dreeben, Linda)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207792095 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                    STATEMENT [1601361] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 02/29/2016 ] [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791663 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1601141] to record [1601050-2], statement [1601047-2], statement [1601044-2], certificate [1601042-2], statement [1601041-2], notice [1601040-2] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc.. [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791473 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                        UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1601050] submitted by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. [Service Date: 02/26/2016 ] [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791463 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1601047] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. [Service Date: 02/26/2016 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791459 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                            STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1601044] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. [Service Date: 02/26/2016 ] [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791456 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1601042] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. [Service Date: 02/26/2016 ] [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791453 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT [1601041] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. [Service Date: 02/26/2016 ] [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791450 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1601040] filed by Stuart Newman and co-counsel Joshua L. Ditelberg on behalf of Petitioner Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc.. [16-1028] (Ditelberg, Joshua)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207791114 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK'S ORDER [1600844] filed consolidating cases 16-1064 (Cross-appeal started 02/25/2016) with 16-1028 [16-1028, 16-1064]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207782727 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1596298] filed by Teamsters Local 350 for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 01/29/2016 ] [16-1028]--[Edited 02/01/2016 by LMC] (Paterson, Teague)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207782329 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1596110] filed by Linda Dreeben and co-counsel Joel Heller and Jill Griffin on behalf of Respondent NLRB. [16-1028] (Dreeben, Linda)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207781300 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1595544] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 02/26/2016. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 02/26/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 02/26/2016. PETITIONER underlying decision due 02/26/2016. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 02/26/2016. PETITIONER procedural motions due 02/26/2016. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/14/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 02/26/2016. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 02/26/2016. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/14/2016. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/14/2016 [16-1028]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207781297 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFIED COPY [1595543] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [1595541-2] [16-1028]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207781293 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              PETITION FOR REVIEW [1595541] filed by Browning-Ferris Industries of California, Inc. of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 01/20/2016 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [16-1028]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 830 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?