US ex rel Patrick Carson v. Manor Care, Incorporated
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1035

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 7:59 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/08/2016. Response Brief due 04/11/2016 [16-1035] (CP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Heartland Employment Services, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999743309] [16-1035] Colin Wrabley
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Manor Care, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999743308] [16-1035] Colin Wrabley
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Colin E. Wrabley for HCR Manor Care, Heartland Employment Services, LLC and Manor Care, Incorporated.[999743306] [16-1035] Colin Wrabley
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by M. Patrick Yingling for HCR Manor Care, Heartland Employment Services, LLC and Manor Care, Incorporated.[999743303] [16-1035] Michael Yingling
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-1035] (MRB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant United States of America ex rel. Patrick Gerard Carson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999742254] [16-1035] William Hurlock
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant United States of America ex rel. Patrick Gerard Carson. [16-1035] William Hurlock
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by William L. Hurlock for United States of America ex rel. Patrick Gerard Carson.[999742246] [16-1035] William Hurlock
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00013-CMH-TCB. Mailed to: Christopher P. Furlong, Brent Gary Ryan, William L. Hurlock, L. Kendall Satterfield, Katherine J. Seikaly, Rosalee B.C.Thomas, Robert O. Wilson. [16-1035] (CP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00013-CMH-TCB. Case manager: CPoulsen. [16-1035] (CP)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 171 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?