Garden City Boxing Club, Inc. v. Batista
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01044

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 6:50 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Go. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with the R&R. Ordered by Senior Judge Frederic Block on 11/30/2007. (Lee, Tiffeny)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Motion for Default filed by Garden City Boxing Club, Inc. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2007. Ordered by Judge Marilyn D. Go on 9/7/07. (Go, Marilyn)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Garden City Boxing Club, Inc, the Plaintiff, does recover damaged, plus costs and attorneys fees to be determined by MJ Go after a hearing or inquest. The MJ will then prepare a report and recommendation as to her findings. c/m by chambers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/11/05. (Williams-Jackson, Sandy)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?