Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 6:16-cv-03036-MDH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 5:49 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Brown +1 816 502 4643 +1 816 960 0041 mike.brown@kutakrock.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Henderson +1 816 960 0090 +1 816 960 0041 william.henderson@kutakrock.com
v.
No Logo Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by nnlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Parker +1 417 882 5858 +1 417 882 5951 dparker@nnlaw.com
No Logo Anthony Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neale & Newman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Parker +1 417 882 5858 +1 417 882 5951 dparker@nnlaw.com
No Logo Gerardo (Ben) Marquez, Defendant
No Logo Montana Recovery Service, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neale & Newman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Parker +1 417 882 5858 +1 417 882 5951 dparker@nnlaw.com
Office Springfield
Filed 2/1/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $76000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Greene
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag MAPN
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re [33] MOTION for default judgment filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [53] Clerk's Entry of Default, [52] Order. The Court hereby ORDERS that the parties provide the Court with an update regarding the current status of this litigation and whether a final judgment may be entered by this Court. Plaintiff is ordered to submit any documentation of attorney's fees and costs it seeks with regarding to the Court's prior Order. Status Report due by 10/25/2017. Copy of Order mailed to Anthony Jones at 4319 S. National Avenue, #147, Springfield, MO 65810-2607 and to Gerardo (Ben) Marquez, 7804 US Highway 70, Route 1, Box 155, Waurika, OK 73575 by regular USPS. Signed on 10/5/17 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) Modified on 10/5/2017 (View, Pat). Copy of Order also mailed to Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC and Montana Recovery Service, LLC at addresses shown on court docket.
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Mail Returned
              MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable, marked as "Forwarding Time Exp. Rtn to Sender". Documents resent to Anthony Jones at 4319 S. National Avenue, #147, Springfield, MO 65810-2607 per USPS label. (Attachments: # (1) Enclosures)(Related document(s)[53], [52]) (Keller, Jeanne)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Mail Returned
                  MAIL RETURNED sent to Anthony Jones as undeliverable. Document sent to Anthony Jones at 4319 S. National Avenue, #147, Springfield, MO 65810-2607 per USPS label. Defendant Jones' address updated (Related document(s)[55]) (Schroeppel, Kerry)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Mail Returned
                    MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Gerado (Ben) Marquez. (Related document(s)[53], [52]) Copy of NEF sent to pro se parties via first class mail. (Schroeppel, Kerry)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Mail Returned
                      MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Envelope marked 'Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward.' Mail sent to Gerardo (Ben) Marquez. (Attachments: # (1) Order)(Related document(s)[52]) (Keller, Jeanne) Modified on 11/14/2016 NEF mailed to pro se litigants. (Keller, Jeanne)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Clerk's Entry of Default
                        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC, Anthony Jones, Gerardo (Ben) Marquez, Montana Recovery Service, LLC (copy mailed to dft Marquez) (Howard, Linda) Modified on 11/15/2016 Copy mailed to Dfts Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC, Montana Recovery Services, LLC and Anthony Jones (Howard, Linda)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING re [32] Second MOTION for sanctions Motion for Contempt filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, GRANTING [20] MOTION for sanctions (Motion for Contempt) filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, GRANTING [33] MOTION for default judgment filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [31] MOTION for writ filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, GRANTING [36] MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Montana Recovery Service, LLC, Anthony Jones, Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter default against Defendants Allied American Recovery, Missouri LLC, Anthony Jones, Montana Recovery Service, LLC and Gerardo Marquez pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Defendants are liable to Plaintiff as further described in this Order. Signed on 11/1/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) Modified on 11/1/2016 (View, Pat). Copy of Order mailed to Gerardo (Ben) Marquez via regular U.S. mail. Modified on 11/15/2016 Copy mailed to Dfts Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC, Montana Recovery Services, LLC and Anthony Jones (Howard, Linda).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                            ORDER granting [50] Plaintiff's second motion for extension of time to submit proposed Order. Plaintiff has up to and including Tuesday September 27, 2016 to submit the proposed order. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Roubal, Kristen)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Motion for Extension of Time
                              Second MOTION for extension of time to Submit Proposed Order filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/11/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, William)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [48] motion for extension of time. Plaintiff given extension of time to file Order to be due on or before 9/23/2016. Signed on 9/19/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(View, Pat)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016, Terminated: 9/19/2016 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  MOTION for extension of time to Submit Proposed Order filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/6/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, William)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Evidentiary HearingCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool: EVIDENTIARY HEARING held on 9/12/2016. Time in court: 1:35 p.m. to 1:45 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jeannine Rankin, 417-225-7713. (Howard, Linda)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/12/2016 01:30 PM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Howard, Linda)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Order
                                        ORDER cancelling July 19, 2016 hearing. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the evidentiary hearing set for 7/19/2016 at 09:30 AM is hereby cancelled. The parties are ordered to submit their available dates to the Court so that it may reschedule the evidentiary hearing. The parties' available dates may be emailed to linda_howard@mow.uscourts.gov. Copy of NEF mailed to Defendant Gerardo (Ben) Marquez via regular Mail. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/19/2016 09:30 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Copy of NEF mailed to Defendant Gerardo (Ben) Marquez via regular Mail. (Howard, Linda)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [41] motion to continue hearing Signed on 6/9/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Howard, Linda)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE to motion re [41] MOTION to continue hearing on Motion for Contempt filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. Reply suggestions due by 6/27/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court (Henderson, William)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016, Terminated: 6/9/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                MOTION to continue hearing on Motion for Contempt filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Anthony Jones. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/24/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Parker, Douglas)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/13/2016 10:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool on Motions for Contempt. Defendants Anthony Jones and Gerardo Marquez are ordered to personally appear. Copy of Order mailed to Defendant Gerardo (Ben) Marquez via regular U.S. Mail. Signed on 5/24/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Notice of docket modification
                                                    NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/23/16 as Document No. 38, Suggestions in Support re Motion to Withdraw. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event--Reply Suggestions to Motion. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool: MOTION HEARING held on 5/23/2016 Time in court: 10:07 a.m. to 10:33 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jeannine Rankin, 417-225-7713. (Howard, Linda)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                        SUGGESTIONS in support re [36] MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Defendants Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC, Anthony Jones, Montana Recovery Service, LLC. (Related document(s)[36]) (Parker, Douglas)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                          SUGGESTIONS in opposition re [36] MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. Reply suggestions due by 6/6/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s)[36]) (Henderson, William)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016, Terminated: 11/1/2016 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC, Anthony Jones, Montana Recovery Service, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/6/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Douglas A. Parker added to party Anthony Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Parker added to party Montana Recovery Service, LLC(pty:dft))(Parker, Douglas)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING re [32] Second MOTION for sanctions Motion for Contempt filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [20] MOTION for sanctions (Motion for Contempt) filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [31] MOTION for writ filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2016 10:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.) This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants are directed to show cause within 15 days of date of this Order why default judgment should not be entered. Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2016. Signed on 5/2/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Notice of filing
                                                                  NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016, Terminated: 11/1/2016 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                    MOTION for default judgment filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Exhibit A)(Henderson, William)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016, Terminated: 11/1/2016 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                      Second MOTION for sanctions Motion for Contempt filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, William)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016, Terminated: 11/1/2016 Motion for Writ
                                                                        MOTION for writ filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Henderson, William)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Rule 16 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                          Rule 16 Notice. Rule 26 conference due by 5/16/2016. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/31/2016. Signed on 4/14/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: 4/13/2016 Return of Service of Complaint Executed
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Gerardo (Ben) Marquez served on 4/4/2016, answer due 4/25/2016. (Henderson, William)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Order on Motion for WritCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [27] motion for writ; and given entry of this order, finding as moot Doc. [4] motion for writ; finding as moot Doc. [23] motion for writ. Signed on 3/28/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion for Writ
                                                                                Amended MOTION for writ of Replevin and Immediate Possession filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/11/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, William)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/24/2016. (Text entry only - no document attached) (Howard, Linda)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                    SUMMONSES (3) ISSUED and emailed to plaintiffs counsel as to Anthony Jones, Gerardo (Ben) Marquez, Montana Recovery Service, LLC. (Siegert, Karen)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Henderson, William)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re [20] MOTION for sanctions (Motion for Contempt) filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[20]) (Henderson, William)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion for Writ
                                                                                          Amended MOTION for writ of Replevin and Immediate Possession filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Henderson, William)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. Telephone Conference regarding pending Motion for Contempt set for 3/24/2016 11:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Plaintiff shall initiate the call 417-865-3741. (Roubal, Kristen)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              SUGGESTIONS in opposition re [20] MOTION for sanctions (Motion for Contempt) filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Defendant Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 4/4/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s)[20]) (Parker, Douglas)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016, Terminated: 11/1/2016 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                MOTION for sanctions (Motion for Contempt) filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, William)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Order on Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [5] motion for bond; denying [12] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying [12] motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Signed on 3/15/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re [4] MOTION for writ of Replevin and Immediate Possession, and Suggestions in Support filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Defendant Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. (Related document(s)[4]) (Parker, Douglas)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool: MOTION HEARING held on 3/14/2016 To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jeannine Rankin, 417-225-7713. (Howard, Linda)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2016, Entered: 3/13/2016 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        SUGGESTIONS in opposition re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , [13] MOTION for hearing re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to Shorten Time, [14] MOTION for hearing re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , [13] MOTION for hearing re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss f filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation. Reply suggestions due by 3/31/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s)[12], [13], [14]) (Henderson, William)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Michael E. Brown on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attorney Michael E. Brown added to party Credit Acceptance Corporation(pty:pla))(Brown, Michael)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016, Terminated: 3/15/2016 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                            MOTION for hearing re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , [13] MOTION for hearing re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to Shorten Time Notice of Hearing filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/28/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[12], [13]) (Parker, Douglas)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016, Terminated: 3/15/2016 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                              MOTION for hearing re [12] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to Shorten Time filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/28/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[12]) (Parker, Douglas)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016, Terminated: 3/15/2016 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Douglas A. Parker on behalf of Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/28/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Douglas A. Parker added to party Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC(pty:dft))(Parker, Douglas)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Return of Service of Complaint Executed
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC served on 3/3/2016, answer due 3/24/2016. (Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Credit Acceptance Corporation of Court's Order (Doc. 9) filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER re [6] MOTION for hearing filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [5] MOTION for bond filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [4] MOTION for writ of Replevin and Immediate Possession, and Suggestions in Support filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, [8] MOTION for reconsideration re [7] Order on Motion for Hearing filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation.ORDER setting hearing on motion [6] MOTION for hearing , [5] MOTION for bond , [4] MOTION for writ of Replevin and Immediate Possession, and Suggestions in Support, [8] MOTION for reconsideration re [7] Order on Motion for Hearing Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2016 11:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.) Signed on 3/3/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016, Terminated: 3/15/2016 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                        MOTION for reconsideration re [7] Order on Motion for Hearing filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/18/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[7]) (Henderson, William) Modified on 3/2/2016 attachment 1 replaced at the request of counsel. More information received and submitted to the Court. NEF regenerated to all parties.(Travis, Kendra)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [6] motion for hearing. Plaintiff is ordered to provide Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed on 2/12/16 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016, Terminated: 2/12/2016 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                            MOTION for hearing filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/29/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016, Terminated: 3/15/2016 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                              MOTION for bond filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/29/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Bond)(Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion for Writ
                                                                                                                                MOTION for writ of Replevin and Immediate Possession, and Suggestions in Support filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Notice of MAPN
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # (1) MAP General Order)(Anderson, Christy)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC filed by William H. Henderson on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-4691308. Service due by 5/5/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C)(Henderson, William)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied American Recovery, Missouri, LLC. Summons returned via electronic mail to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (Burch, C. Steve)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 496 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?