Yan Ye v. Jeh Johnson
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00458

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 2:26 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Lafferty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@napolilaw.com
No Logo Yan Ye, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Yan Ye

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yan Ye +1 909 706 9905
v.
No Logo David Radel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jeh Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Patricia L. Buchanan +1 212 637 3274 +1 212 637 2786 pattylbuchanan@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Dillon Ariel Fishman +1 202 598 2377 dillon.a.fishman@usdoj.gov
, , , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Christina B. Parascandola +1 202 514 3097 +1 202 514 8865 christina.parascandola@usdoj.gov
, , , Sherease Pratt +1 202 307 0895 sherease.pratt@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Thomas H Barnard +1 410 685 1120 +1 410 547 0699 tbarnard@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by District of New Mexico

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Roberto D Ortega roberto.ortega@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Bureau of Prisons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel wxrolegalinfo@bop.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit +1 907 271 5071 usacae.ecf2241@usdoj.gov
, , , Donald W Yoo +1 213 894 3994 +1 213 894 7819 donald.yoo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Woei-Tyng Daniel Shieh +1 202 305 9802 +1 202 305 1890 Daniel.Shieh@usdoj.gov
, , , Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SARAH L VUONG +1 202 532 4281 sarah.l.vuong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.o. Box 868

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/28/2016, TERMINATED: 11/28/2016, TERMINATED: 11/28/2016, TERMINATED: 11/28/2016 Craig Andrew Defoe +1 202 532 4114 +1 202 305 7000 craig.defoe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Walter Manning Evans +1 202 616 2186 +1 202 305 4829 Manning.Evans@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Colin A. Kisor , +1 202 532 4331 colin.kisor@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lisa Leontiev +1 915 534 3491 lisa.leontiev@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Steven Platt +1 202 532 4074 +1 202 305 7000 steven.a.platt@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/18/2018, ATTORNEY T Steven Platt +1 202 532 4074 +1 202 305 7000 steven.a.platt@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William C. Silvis +1 202 307 4693 +1 202 305 7000 william.silvis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Margaret K. Taylor +1 202 305 0658 margaret.k.taylor@usdoj.gov
, , , , , J. Max Weintraub +1 202 305 7551 jacob.weintraub@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 878

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Yamileth G. Davila +1 202 305 0137 yamileth.g.davila@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Nicole Newcomb Murley +1 202 616 0473 +1 202 616 4950 nicole.murley@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Robins +1 202 616 1246 +1 202 233 0397 jeffrey.robins@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sekret Tamara Sneed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Sekret T Sneed +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 sekret.sneed@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ +1 817 252 5286 brian.stoltz@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Paul L. Lee +1 915 534 6884 +1 915 534 3490 paul.lee@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Jason M. Bigelow +1 504 680 3025 +1 504 589 3602 jason.bigelow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Chad A Blumenfield +1 612 664 5600 chad.blumenfield@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Walter Bocchini +1 202 514 0492 +1 202 353 7709 walter.bocchini@usdoj.gov
, , , Christopher Kendrick Connolly +1 212 637 2761 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.connolly@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov
, , , Daniel David Hu +1 713 567 9518 +1 713 718 3303 daniel.hu@usdoj.gov
, , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Bryan Keith Lonegan +1 212 637 2770 +1 212 637 2786 bryan.lonegan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jason Paul Mehta +1 904 301 6244 +1 904 301 6310 Jason.Mehta@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Ari Nazarov +1 202 514 4120 ari.nazarov@usdoj.gov
, , , Rukhsanah L. Singh +1 718 254 6498 +1 718 254 6081 rukhsanah.singh@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Ana H Voss +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 ana.voss@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , D Gerald Wilhelm +1 612 664 5600 gerald.wilhelm@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Katherine Ann Ross +1 303 454 0286 +1 303 454 0408 katherine.ross@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Sean P. Greene +1 718 254 6484 +1 718 254 7483 sean.greene@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Gary L. Anderson +1 210 384 7365 +1 210 384 7312 stephanie.karam@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Leon Fresco +1 202 307 6482 +1 202 955 5564 leon.fresco@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Shane Patrick Cargo +1 212 210 9460 +1 212 922 3860 shane.cargo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Colin A. Kisor , +1 202 532 4331 colin.kisor@usdoj.gov
, , , , Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Ronald W. Kish +1 212 264 3475 +1 212 264 4534 ronald.kish@dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Elizabeth Marie Gunter +1 213 830 5132 +1 213 894 7819 elizabeth.m.gunter@uscis.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Bradley Heath Cohen +1 202 305 9855 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.cohen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kirsten L Daeubler +1 202 616 4458 +1 202 305 7000 kirsten.daeubler@usdoj.gov
, , , Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn M Girdharry +1 202 532 4807 +1 202 305 7000 glenn.girdharry@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Adam Laurence Goldman +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 Adam.Goldman2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kathryne Gray +1 202 305 7386 +1 202 305 7777 kathryne.m.gray@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Andrew Han +1 703 299 3970 andrew.han@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Joseph D. Hardy, Jr. +1 202 305 7972 +1 202 353 7224 joseph.hardy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kathleen Roberta Hartnett +1 202 514 2331 +1 202 514 8071 kathleen.r.hartnett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 John Inkeles +1 202 532 4309 john.inkeles@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Anna E. Juarez +1 202 532 4402 Anna.Juarez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Devin Thomas Kenney +1 202 305 0476 +1 202 305 0506 devin.kenney@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Troy Liggett +1 202 532 4765 +1 202 305 7000 troy.liggett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Sarah Maloney +1 202 616 1436 sarah.maloney2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Courtney Elizabeth Moran +1 202 514 4587 +1 202 305 7000 courtney.e.moran@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Emily Sue Newton +1 202 305 8356 emily.s.newton@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elianis N. Perez +1 202 616 9124 elianis.perez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Julie Shana Saltman +1 202 532 4252 +1 202 616 8470 julie.saltman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Katherine J. Shinners +1 202 598 8259 +1 202 305 7000 Katherine.J.Shinners@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Shawn Shugert-DOJ +1 202 305 0169 +1 202 305 0506 shawn.shugert@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Gladys M. Steffens Guzman +1 202 305 7181 Gladys.Steffens-Guzman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Lindsay M Vick +1 202 532 4023 +1 202 305 7000 lindsay.vick2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Christopher Ward +1 202 616 9121 brian.c.ward@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lisa T Warwick +1 414 297 1786 +1 414 297 1738 lisa.warwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 ADRIENNE ZACK +1 202 598 2446 adrienne.zack@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Attorney's Office (Alexandria-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Ayana Niambi Free +1 703 299 3785 ayana.free@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lori Scialabba, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.o. Box 868

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Timothy Michael Belsan +1 202 532 4596 +1 202 305 7000 timothy.m.belsan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Derek C Julius +1 202 532 4323 +1 202 305 4117 derek.julius2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Edward S. White +1 202 616 9131 +1 202 305 7000 edward.s.white@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , Stacey Ilene Young +1 202 305 7171 stacey.young@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 878

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jeffrey L Menkin +1 202 353 3920 +1 202 616 2491 Jeff.Menkin2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lindsay M. Murphy +1 202 616 4018 Lindsay.M.Murphy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 dennis.barghaan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Geoffrey Forney +1 202 532 4329 +1 202 305 7000 geoff.forney@usdoj.gov
, , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Lauren Crowell Bingham +1 202 616 4458 +1 202 305 7000 lauren.c.bingham@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Andrew C Brinkman +1 202 305 7035 andrew.brinkman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Joseph Francis Carilli, Jr. +1 202 616 4848 +1 202 305 7000 joseph.f.carilli2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Yamileth G. Davila +1 202 305 0137 yamileth.g.davila@usdoj.gov
, , , , , August Edward Flentje +1 202 514 1278 august.flentje@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Glenn M Girdharry +1 202 532 4807 +1 202 305 7000 glenn.girdharry@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lyle D. Jentzer +1 202 305 0192 +1 202 305 0192 lyle.jentzer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Ethan B Kanter +1 202 616 9123 ethan.kanter@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Aaron R Petty +1 202 532 4542 +1 202 305 7000 aaron.r.petty@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , James Walker +1 202 532 4468 +1 202 305 7000 James.Walker3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Attorney's Office (Alexandria-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kimere Jane Kimball +1 703 299 3700 kimere.kimball@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Brian C Kipnis +1 206 553 7970 Brian.Kipnis@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1329
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus 1 is DENIED. See document for details. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yan Ye. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Jeh Johnson, John Lafferty, David Radel, Lori Scialabba. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              COMPLAINT against Defendants Jeh Johnson, John Lafferty, David Radel, Lori Scialabba. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Yan Ye. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 26 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?