Anthony Rivera v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 16-7008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 2:37 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207782912 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER [1596395] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/02/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/17/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 03/02/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/02/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/02/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/17/2016, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [16-7008]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207782907 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE [1596390] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed ifp in the district court is granted [Case Number 16-7008: IFP] [16-7008]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207782902 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL [1596388] filed by Anthony Rivera seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01065-RCL. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7008. [16-7008]
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 77 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?