Anthony Dorman v. Computer Credit Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-1009

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 7, 2018 at 12:32 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 003012227750 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney James S. Murphy, Esq. for Appellant Computer Credit Inc Letter withdrawing appeal. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2016. (JSM)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012227750 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney James S. Murphy, Esq. for Appellant Computer Credit Inc Letter withdrawing appeal. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2016. (JSM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 003012215591 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
      ORDER (Clerk) directing an Answer to be filed. Answer due 03/09/2016. (SLC)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012215591 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER (Clerk) directing an Answer to be filed. Answer due 03/09/2016. (SLC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012196831 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ari H. Marcus and Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Appellee(s) Anthony Dorman. (AHM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012196831 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ari H. Marcus and Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Appellee(s) Anthony Dorman. (AHM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012196831 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ari H. Marcus and Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Appellee(s) Anthony Dorman. (AHM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012186224 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Scott Murphy, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Computer Credit, Inc.. (JSM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012186224 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Scott Murphy, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Computer Credit, Inc.. (JSM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184799 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ari H. Marcus, Esq. for Anthony Dorman and Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. for Anthony Dorman requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/04/2016. (SLC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184799 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ari H. Marcus, Esq. for Anthony Dorman and Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. for Anthony Dorman requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/04/2016. (SLC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012185762 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to James S. Murphy, Esq. adviseng that counsel must re-file an entry of appearance form indicating whether he represents Appellant or Appellee, as the entry filed on 1/21/16 cointains the names of Appellant and Appellee. Compliance due 01/25/2016. (SLC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012185762 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to James S. Murphy, Esq. adviseng that counsel must re-file an entry of appearance form indicating whether he represents Appellant or Appellee, as the entry filed on 1/21/16 cointains the names of Appellant and Appellee. Compliance due 01/25/2016. (SLC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184323 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Scott Murphy, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Computer Credit, Inc.. (JSM)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184323 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Scott Murphy, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Computer Credit, Inc.. (JSM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184328 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Computer Credit Inc, filed. (JSM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184328 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Computer Credit Inc, filed. (JSM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184335 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Computer Credit Inc, filed. (JSM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184335 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Computer Credit Inc, filed. (JSM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184343 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Computer Credit Inc, received. (JSM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184343 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Computer Credit Inc, received. (JSM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184346 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Computer Credit Inc advising this court that. (JSM)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012184346 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Computer Credit Inc advising this court that. (JSM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012172282 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect., filed. (SB)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012172282 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect., filed. (SB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012186224 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Scott Murphy, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Computer Credit, Inc.. (JSM)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012185762 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                      NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to James S. Murphy, Esq. adviseng that counsel must re-file an entry of appearance form indicating whether he represents Appellant or Appellee, as the entry filed on 1/21/16 cointains the names of Appellant and Appellee. Compliance due 01/25/2016. (SLC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012184799 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                        FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ari H. Marcus, Esq. for Anthony Dorman and Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. for Anthony Dorman requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/04/2016. (SLC)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012184346 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                          ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Computer Credit Inc advising this court that. (JSM)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012184343 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                            ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Computer Credit Inc, received. (JSM)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012184335 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                              ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Computer Credit Inc, filed. (JSM)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012184328 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Computer Credit Inc, filed. (JSM)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012184323 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Scott Murphy, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Computer Credit, Inc.. (JSM)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012172282 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect., filed. (SB)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?