Phoenix v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00075

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 5:27 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None 60 Day Order of Dismissal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Discovery Deadlines
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        RULING granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The only remaining claim in this case is Mr. Phoenix's claim of racial discrimination arising under the FHA and the ECOA. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/20/2016. (ELW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?