Yenzer v. Santaella, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-01727

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 4:04 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jill Haverfield Yenzer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by High,stack.palahach & Cruanes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/19/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Rickman Stack +1 305 443 3329 +4445 444 444 5370

Toggle Switch Represented by Podhurst Orseck, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Josefsberg +1 305 358 2800 +1 305 358 2382 rjosefsberg@podhurst.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tew Cardenas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L Rebak +1 305 539 2122 +1 305 536 1116 jlr@tewlaw.com
v.
No Logo 5-F Venture Capital, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mershon, Sawyer, Johnston, Dunwody & Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Rand Surlas +1 305 358 5100
No Logo Aulic Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Leon Richey +1 305 372 8808 +1 305 372 3669 wlr@richeylaw.com
No Logo David Brillembourg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mershon, Sawyer, Johnston, Dunwody & Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Rand Surlas +1 305 358 5100
No Logo Electrocomm Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mershon, Sawyer, Johnston, Dunwody & Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Rand Surlas +1 305 358 5100
No Logo Jorge Villa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Leon Richey +1 305 372 8808 +1 305 372 3669 wlr@richeylaw.com
No Logo Juan Santaella, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Leon Richey +1 305 372 8808 +1 305 372 3669 wlr@richeylaw.com
No Logo Rene Brillembourg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mershon, Sawyer, Johnston, Dunwody & Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Rand Surlas +1 305 358 5100
No Logo Roberto Anez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Leon Richey +1 305 372 8808 +1 305 372 3669 wlr@richeylaw.com
  Entries (147) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by Jill Haverfield Yenzer (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER dismissing and closing case, case settled ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 9/22/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/1998)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
      STIPULATION by All defendants, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Jill Haverfield Yenzer, Roberto Anez In Re: extension of deadlines (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/1998)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: None
        NOTICE of attorney's unavailability by 5-F Venture Capital, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
          NOTICE of change of attorney's address by Aulic Corporation, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/1998)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: None
            NOTICE of unavailability by Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/1998)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting [137-1] motion to extend time for plaintiff to serve response to request for production and for defendants to serve response to second amended complaint reset answer and response to document request due for 9/18/98 for All defendants ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 8/3/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/06/1998)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
                NOTICE of attorney's unavailability by All defendants (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/1998)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of change of attorney's address by All defendants (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/1998)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER sua sponte mooting [37-1] motion to extend time/postpone filing of original scheduling report, mooting [68-1] motion to extend time to serve their response to plaintiff's motion transfer, mooting [86-1] motion to extend time to respond DE#62, mooting [40-1] motion to dismiss complaint ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 7/27/98) CCAP (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: None
                      JOINT MOTION by Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Jill Haverfield Yenzer, Roberto Anez to extend time for plaintiff to serve response to request for production and for defendants to serve response to second amended coplaint (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [135-1] motion to extend time to serve response to plaintiff's second amended complaint reset answer due for 20 days from date of this order ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 7/8/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: None
                          THIRD MOTION by All defendants to extend time to serve response to plaintiff's second amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/1998)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [132-1] stipulation substituting Joseph L. Rebak as Attorney (Terminated: attorney Robert C. Josefsberg for Jill Haverfield Yenzer Added: Joseph L. Rebak) ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 7/6/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/1998)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                              ORDER granting extension of time to respond to defendants' request for production for within 30 days from date of this order ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 7/6/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/1998)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION by Jill Haverfield Yenzer to substitute Joseph L. Rebak (FL BAR #308668) of Tew Cardenas, et al., for Robert C. Josefsberg of Podhurst Orseck, as attorney for Jill Yenzer (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/1998)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: None
                                  ORDER granting [127-1] motion to extend time serve response to second amended complaint reset answer due for 6/19/98 for All defendants ( signed by Magistrate Ann E. Vitunac on 6/23/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/1998)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [129-1] motion to extend time serve response to second amended complaint reset answer due for 14 days from date of this order ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 6/24/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/1998)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: None
                                      SECOND MOTION by All defendants to extend time serve response to second amended complaint (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/1998)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [127-1] motion to extend time serve response to second amended complaint resetting answer due for 6/19/98 for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella, for Jorge Villa, for Rene Brillembourg, for David Brillembourg, for Electrocomm Corp., for Aulic Corporation, for 5-F Venture Capital (signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 6/15/98) CCAP (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/22/1998)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by All defendants to extend time serve response to second amended complaint (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/1998)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: None
                                            ORDER granting [125-1] motion to defer response to defendants' request for production; plaintiff may respond within 30 days of entry of this Order ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 6/2/98) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/1998)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: None
                                              RENEWED MOTION by Jill Haverfield Yenzer to defer response to defendants' request for production (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/29/1998)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jill Haverfield Yenzer , (Answer due 6/1/98 for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella, for Jorge Villa, for Rene Brillembourg, for David Brillembourg, for Electrocomm Corp., for Aulic Corporation amending [1-1] complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/1998)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE by All defendants to [120-1] motion to substitute Robert C. Josefsberg of Podhurst Orseck as Attorney, [120-2] motion for Charles R. Stack of High Stack Lazenby to withdraw as attorney (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/22/1998)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER denying [89-1] motion to defer response to defendants' request for production, striking as moot [62-1] motion for contempt, striking as moot [62-2] motion for sanctions, denying as moot [56-1] motion to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff, denying as moot [56-2] motion for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 5/19/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/21/1998)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER granting [120-1] motion to substitute Robert C. Josefsberg of Podhurst Orseck as Attorney (Terminated: attorney Charles Rickman Stack for Jill Haverfield Yenzer Added: Robert C. Josefsberg), granting [120-2] motion for Charles R. Stack of High Stack Lazenby to withdraw as attorney ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 5/19/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/21/1998)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Jill Haverfield Yenzer to substitute Robert C. Josefsberg of Podhurst Orseck as Attorney , for Charles R. Stack of High Stack Lazenby to withdraw as attorney (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/18/1998)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [117-1] motion to amend [1-1] complaint to substitute Jill Haverfield Yezner, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott H. Yezner, deceased, mooting [118-1] motion to amend [1-1] complaint to substitute Jill Haverfield Yenzer as party-plaintiff ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 5/13/98) CCAP (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/1998)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to amend [1-1] complaint to substitute Jill Haverfield Yenzer as party-plaintiff (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/1998)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to amend [1-1] complaint to substitute Jill Haverfield Yezner, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott H. Yezner, deceased (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/1998)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of attorney's unavailability by All defendants (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/30/1998)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [114-1] motion to extend time to file second amended complaint; plaintiff shall file their Second Amended Complaint by 5/28/98 ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 4/21/98) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/24/1998)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to extend time to file second amended complaint (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/1998)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint, second amended complaint shall be filed within 20 days of this order; derivative action is dismissed with leave to file an application with bankruptcy court ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 4/8/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/10/1998)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                        SECOND NOTICE OF RESETTING OF HEARING, reset evidentiary hearing for 10:00 5/28/98 before Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson , terminated deadlines ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 3/18/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY by All defendants to response to [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION by Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to continue evidentiary hearing scheduled for 3/31/98 (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/1998)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING reset evidentiary hearing for 10:00 3/31/98 before Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 3/12/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/1998)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [106-1] motion to extend time to serve reply in support of motion to dismiss amended complaint reset answer due for 3/19/98 for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella, for Jorge Villa, for Rene Brillembourg, for David Brillembourg, for Electrocomm Corp., for Aulic Corporation, for 5-F Venture Capital, for All defendants ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 3/10/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/1998)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE by Scott H. Yenzer to [106-1] second motion to extend time to serve reply in support of motion to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/1998)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                    SECOND MOTION by All defendants to extend time to serve reply in support of motion to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/1998)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to reset hearing on defendant's motion to disqualify (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/1998)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [102-1] motion to extend time for reply to opposition response to motion to dismiss amended complaint Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/9/98 for [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 3/2/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/05/1998)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [102-1] motion to extend time for reply to opposition response to motion to dismiss amended complaint Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/9/98 for [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 2/27/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/1998)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                            AMENDED MOTION by All defendants to extend time for reply to opposition response to motion to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/1998)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [100-1] motion to extend time to serve reply to plaintiff's memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' moiton to dismiss amended complaint Response to motion reset to 2/11/98 for [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 2/27/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/1998)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION by All defendants to extend time to serve reply to plaintiff's memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' moiton to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/1998)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney's unavailability by Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/24/1998)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney's unavailability by All defendants (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/1998)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Scott H. Yenzer in opposition to [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/1998)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by All defendants to [62-1] motion for contempt, [62-2] motion for sanctions (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/1998)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by All defendants in opposition to the motion for extension of time to serve response to the motion to dismiss amended complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/1998)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Response to motion reset to 2/17/98 for [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint , granting plaintiff's second motion for extension of time to respond to DE#73 ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 1/27/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/1998)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [91-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#62 Response to motion reset to 2/7/98 for [62-1] motion for contempt, reset to 2/7/98 for [62-2] motion for sanctions ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 1/26/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/1998)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY by Scott H. Yenzer to response to [89-1] motion to defer response to defendants' request for production (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/1998)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  FOURTH MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to respond to DE#62 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/1998)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to [89-1] motion to defer response to defendants' request for production (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/1998)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Scott H. Yenzer to defer response to defendants' request for production (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/1998)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson Re: [79-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#62, [78-1] motion to extend time to serve reply to DE#63, that both motions be granted nunc pro tunc ; Signature date: 1/14/98 Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 1/24/98 CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/1998)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [85-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#73 Response to motion reset to 1/27/98 for [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 1/13/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/1998)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            THIRD MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to respond to DE#62 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/20/1998)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to extend time to respond to DE#73 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [78-1] motion to extend time to serve reply to DE#63 Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/31/97 for [56-1] motion to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff, reset to 12/31/97 for [56-2] motion for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/31/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [79-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#62 Response to motion reset to 1/8/98 for [62-1] motion for contempt, reset to 1/8/98 for [62-2] motion for sanctions ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/31/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting defendants' third motion for extension of time to serve their response to DE#62 (motion not found on docket sheet at this time) Response to motion reset to 1/23/98 for [62-1] motion for contempt, reset to 1/23/98 for [62-2] motion for sanctions ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 1/9/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/15/1998)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting joint motion for continuance of evidentiary hearing shceduled 1/12/98 at 10:00 evidentiary hearing shall be continued pending the finalization of settlement documentation ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 1/10/98) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/31/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to response to [56-1] motion to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff, [56-2] motion for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SECOND MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to respond to DE#62 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SECOND MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to serve reply to DE#63 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/31/1997)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [76-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#62 Response to motion reset to 12/29/97 for [62-1] motion for contempt, reset to 12/29/97 for [62-2] motion for sanctions ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/19/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/31/1997)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to respond to DE#62 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [71-1] motion to extend time to reply to DE#63 Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/23/97 for [56-1] motion to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff, reset to 12/23/97 for [56-2] motion for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/15/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez in support of [73-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to dismiss amended complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [67-1] motion to extend time to serve their response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint reset answer due for 12/15/97 for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella, for Jorge Villa, for Rene Brillembourg, for David Brillembourg, for Electrocomm Corp., for Aulic Corporation, for 5-F Venture Capital ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/10/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to reply to DE#63 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RE-NOTICE of attorney appearance for 5-F Venture Capital, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg by Jeffrey Rand Surlas (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [53-1] motion to transfer case ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/10/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SECOND MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to serve their response to plaintiff's motion to transfer (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to serve their response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [60-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#53 Response to motion reset to 12/11/97 for [53-1] motion to transfer case ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 12/28/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [59-1] motion to extend time to respond to DE#52 reset answer due for 12/8/97 for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella, for Jorge Villa, for Rene Brillembourg, for David Brillembourg, for Electrocomm Corp., for Aulic Corporation, for 5-F Venture Capital ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 11/28/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Scott H. Yenzer in support of [63-1] motion response (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Scott H. Yenzer to [56-1] motion to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff, [56-2] motion for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Scott H. Yenzer for contempt , and for sanctions re: depositions (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER and notice, granting [58-1] motion for evidentiary hearing and oral argument on DE#56 set evidentiary hearing for 10:00 1/12/98 ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 12/1/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/04/1997 (Entered: 12/04/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to respond to DE#53 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/03/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time to respond to DE#52 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/03/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez for evidentiary hearing and oral argument on DE#56 (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez in support of [56-1] motion to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff, [56-2] motion for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to disqualify Stack and law firm as co-counsel for plaintiff , and for protective order prohibiting Stack and law firm from assisting in discovery until hearing on this motion (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to response to [40-1] motion to dismiss complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Scott H. Yenzer in support of [53-1] motion to transfer case (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to transfer case (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Scott H. Yenzer , (Answer due 11/20/97 for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella, for Jorge Villa, for Rene Brillembourg, for David Brillembourg, for Electrocomm Corp., for Aulic Corporation, for 5-F Venture Capital ) amending [1-1] complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Scott H. Yenzer in opposition to [40-1] motion to dismiss complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [49-1] motion to extend time to reply to response to request for production Reply to Response to Motion due 2 weeks from date of this order ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 10/29/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to extend time to reply to response to request for production (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [46-1] motion to extend time for reply to response to motion for protective order Reply to Response to Motion due 10/31/97 ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 10/23/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [39-1] motion for protective order against plaintiff taking discovery unless court detrmines that it has subject matter jurisdiction ( signed by Magistrate Linnea R. Johnson on 10/24/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by 5-F Venture Capital, Aulic Corporation, Electrocomm Corp., David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, Jorge Villa, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez to extend time for reply to response to motion for protective order (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [43-1] motion to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to motion reset to 11/10/97 for [40-1] motion to dismiss complaint ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 10/21/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING nondispositive pretrial motions to Magistrate Judge Johnson ( Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 10/16/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Scott H. Yenzer in opposition to [39-1] motion for protective order against plaintiff taking discovery unless court detrmines that it has subject matter jurisdiction (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital in support of [40-1] motion to dismiss complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital to dismiss complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital for protective order against plaintiff taking discovery unless court detrmines that it has subject matter jurisdiction (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34-1] motion to extend time to respond to complaint reset answer due for 10/31/97 for 5-F Venture Capital, for Aulic Corporation, for Electrocomm Corp., for David Brillembourg, for Rene Brillembourg, for Jorge Villa, for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 9/18/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREED MOTION FOR ORDER by Scott H. Yenzer, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital to extend time/postpone filing of original scheduling report (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of attorney's vacation by Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., 5-F Venture Capital (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER requiring compliance with LR 16.1 ( signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 8/28/97) CCAP (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    THIRD JOINT MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital to extend time to respond to complaint (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER transferring case to Judge Gold ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 8/4/97) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [31-1] joint motion to extend time to respond to complaint reset answer due for 9/2/97 for 5-F Venture Capital, for Aulic Corporation, for Electrocomm Corp., for David Brillembourg, for Rene Brillembourg, for Jorge Villa, for Roberto Anez, for Juan Santaella ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 8/4/97) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          2ND JOINT MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital to extend time to respond to complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/10/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [29-1] joint motion to extend time on all pending deadlines, including defendants response to complaint ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 7/10/97) CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital to extend time on all pending deadlines, including defendants response to complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part [26-1] motion to extend time respond to complaint and denying as moot motion for TRO and preliminary injunction ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/26/97) CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/08/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Aulic Corporation by William Leon Richey (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/08/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer, Juan Santaella, Roberto Anez, Jorge Villa, Rene Brillembourg, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital to extend time respond to complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [22-1] motion for adversary Hearing ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/16/97) CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [17-1] notice of voluntary dismissal and dismissing defendant 5-F Venture Capital, Inc. ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/13/97) CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [19-1] motion for temporary restraining order, denying [19-2] motion preliminary injunction ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/11/97) CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer for adversary Hearing (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Jorge Villa, David Brillembourg, Electrocomm Corp., Aulic Corporation, 5-F Venture Capital in opposition to [19-1] motion for temporary restraining order, [19-2] motion preliminary injunction (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of law by Scott H. Yenzer (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  VERIFIED MOTION by Scott H. Yenzer for temporary restraining order , and preliminary injunction (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set scheduling conference for 9:00 10/10/97 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages ( signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/10/97) CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of voluntary dismissal as to party only by Scott H. Yenzer (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing the atatched civil cover by Scott H. Yenzer (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL ( signed by Judge K. M. Moore for Judge Edward B. Davis on 6/3/97) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Jorge Villa, Roberto Anez, David Brillembourg, Rene Brillembourg, 5-F Venture Capital, Electrocomm Corp. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Aulic Corporation by serving David Brillembourg as the representative director (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Jorge Villa as the representative of Aulic Corporation (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Jorge Villa as the representative of F5 Venture Capital, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for Roberto Anez as the representative of Aulic Corporation (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for Roberto Anez as the representative of Electrocomm Corporation (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for Roberto Anez (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for Juan Santaella as the representative of F5 Venture Capital, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Electrocomm Corp. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Aulic Corporation (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Juan Santaella (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Rene Brillembourg (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for 5-F Venture Capital (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 677304; A-7; LRJ (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?