Holden v. KOAA TV Channel 5 & 30
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00228
Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2018 at 12:31 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Levi Holden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth Halpern, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lee Schneider +1 303 651 2177 +1 303 678 9953 mleeschneider@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Comcast, Defendant
No Logo Constance (I) O'Neil Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Constance O'Neil Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Cordillera Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Kentucky Corporation Laura Lee Prather +1 512 867 8476 +1 512 867 8609 laura.prather@haynesboone.com
a Kentucky Corporation Catherine Lewis Robb +1 512 867 8421 +51 248 867 8611 Catherine.Robb@haynesboone.com
a Kentucky Corporation Thomas Joseph Williams +1 817 347 6600 +1 817 347 6650 thomas.williams@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Rangel Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Kentucky Corporation Jorge C Rangel +1 361 883 8500 + 361 883 2611 jorge.c.rangel@rangellaw.com
No Logo Elaine (I) Michelle Sheridan, Defendant
No Logo Elaine Michelle Sheridan, Defendant
No Logo Evening Post Industries, Defendant
No Logo Kelly (I) Ann Duffy, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Ann Duffy, Defendant
No Logo KOAA TV Channel 5 & 30, Defendant
No Logo Lisa (I) Lyden, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Lyden, Defendant
No Logo Matthew (I) Lee Prichard, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Lee Prichard, Defendant
NBC Universal, Inc. NBC Universal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Jessica T. Lu +1 617 856 8200 jlu@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Deborah Adler +1 212 489 8230 +1 212 489 8340 DeborahAdler@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Robert D. Balin +1 212 489 8230 +1 212 489 8340 robbalin@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Ambika Kumar Doran +1 206 757 8030 +1 206 757 7700 ambikadoran@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Stuart Russell Dunwoody +1 206 757 8034 +1 206 757 7034 stuartdunwoody@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Eric Joel Feder +1 212 489 8230 +1 212 489 8340 ericfeder@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Rebecca J. Francis +1 206 757 8285 +1 206 757 7700 RebeccaFrancis@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Lance Herman Koonce, III +1 212 603 6467 +1 212 489 8340 lancekoonce@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Elizabeth Anne McNamara +1 212 603 6437 +1 212 489 8340 lizmcnamara@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Marcia Beth Paul +1 212 603 6427 +1 212 489 8340 marciapaul@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Warren Joseph Rheaume +1 206 757 8265 +1 206 757 7265 warrenrheaume@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 James Eric Rosenfeld +1 212 603 6455 +1 212 489 8340 jamesrosenfeld@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Rachel Fan Stern Strom +1 212 489 4069 +1 212 489 8340 rachelstrom@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Andrew J Thomas +1 213 633 6800 +1 213 633 6899 ajthomas@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Erica Eden Frank +1 212 756 2531 +1 212 593 5955 frank@kmm.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Harlan J. Silverstein +1 212 644 1010 +1 212 644 1936 silverstein@kmm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 SEAN ANDREW GORDON +1 678 553 2100 gordonsa@gtlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Gregory W. Herbert +1 407 420 1000 +1 407 841 1295 herbertg@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Eric J. Lobenfeld +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 eric.lobenfeld@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey S. Love

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Jeffrey S. Love

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan Hugh Blavin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Jonathan Hugh Blavin

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph T. Jakubek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Joseph T. Jakubek

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Jeffrey S Jacobson +1 212 808 7640 +1 212 808 7897 jjacobson@KelleyDrye.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Max Klaus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Kelly Max Klaus

Toggle Switch Represented by Klaus H. Hamm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Klaus H. Hamm

Toggle Switch Represented by Laura Ashley Aull

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Laura Ashley Aull

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas A. Leghorn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Brian Adam Kalman +1 212 972 1000 +1 212 972 1030 BKalman@LondonFischer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Amanda M. Leith +1 212 850 6100 +1 212 850 6299 aleith@lskslaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Lee Levine +1 202 508 1100 +1 202 861 9888 llevine@lskslaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Robert Penchina +1 212 850 6109 +1 212 850 6299 rpenchina@lskslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Andrew Paul Marks +1 212 583 9600 +1 212 832 2719 amarks@littler.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Sara Danielle Sheinkin +1 212 583 2689 +1 212 832 2719 sara.sheinkin@town-sports.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Eric W. Hagen +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 ehagen@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Karin G. Pagnanelli +1 310 312 2000 +1 310 312 3786 kgp@msk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NBC Universal, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Daniel M. Kummer +1 212 664 4017 +1 212 664 6572 daniel.kummer@nbcuni.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Hilary Lane +1 212 664 2022 +1 212 664 6572 hilary.lane@nbcuni.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Julie Rikelman +1 212 664 4167 +1 212 664 6572 julie.rikelman@nbcuni.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Mariano Schwed +1 212 664 2413 +1 212 664 6572 mariano.schwed@nbcuni.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pinkham Busny LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Elise Busny +1 617 856 8246 +1 617 856 8201 ebusny@pinkhambusny.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Margaret M. Pinkham +1 781 933 6840 mpinkham@pinkhambusny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rebecca G. Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Rebecca G. Lynch

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Henry Rotstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Robert Henry Rotstein

Toggle Switch Represented by Rohit K. Singla

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Rohit K. Singla

Toggle Switch Represented by Salumeh R. Loesch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Salumeh R. Loesch

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Christopher Gardner Clark +1 617 573 4868 +1 617 305 4868 cclark@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Mary Eleanor Rasenberger +1 212 735 3565 +1 917 777 3565 mary.rasenberger@skaden.com
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Clifford M. Sloan +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 8340 cliff.sloan@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smallman & Hans LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 David Brian Smallman +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 dbs@smallmanhansllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Meeks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Thomas Meeks

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/30/2009 Robert Bruce Rich +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 310 8007 r.bruce.rich@weil.com
No Logo Ronald (I) Raymond Eccher, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Raymond Eccher, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM. Consent Form due by 3/9/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The partie s or their counsel shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/16/16. (nywlc1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Complaint
        COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4805301)Attorney Matthew Lee Schneider added to party Levi Holden(pty:pla), filed by Levi Holden. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons - KOAA, # 4 Summons Summons - Cordillera, # 5 Summons Summons - Evening Post, # 6 Summons Summons - NBC, # 7 Summons Summons - Comcast, # 8 Summons Summons - Prichard, # 9 Summons Summons - Eccher, # 10 Summons Summons - Murphy, # 11 Summons Summons - Sheridan, # 12 Summons Summons - Duffy, # 13 Summons Summons - Lyden)(Schneider, Matthew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 156 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?