UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. HSBC NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00199

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 7, 2017 at 7:31 AM EDT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Commonwealth of Kentucky, Plaintiff
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Plaintiff
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Plaintiff
No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Plaintiff
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Alabama, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of Alaska,, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Arizona, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Arkansas, Plaintiff
No Logo State of California, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Colorado, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of Connecticut, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Delaware, Plaintiff
No Logo STATE OF FLORIDA, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Georgia, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Hawaii, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Idaho, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Illinois, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Indiana, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Iowa, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Kansas, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Louisiana, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Maine, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Maryland, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Michigan, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Minnesota, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Mississippi, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Missouri, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Montana, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of Nebraska, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Nevada, Plaintiff
No Logo State of New Hampshire, Plaintiff
No Logo State of New Jersey, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of New Mexico, Plaintiff
No Logo State of New York, Plaintiff
No Logo STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Plaintiff
No Logo State of North Dakota, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Ohio, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of Oregon, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Rhode Island, Plaintiff
No Logo State of South Carolina, Plaintiff
No Logo State of South Dakota, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Tennessee, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Texas, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Utah, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Vermont, Plaintiff
No Logo State Of Washington, Plaintiff
No Logo State of West Virginia, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Wisconsin, Plaintiff
No Logo State of Wyoming, Plaintiff
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Hudak +1 202 514 7143 +1 202 252 2599 brian.hudak@usdoj.gov
v.
HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Richmond Maddox +1 205 521 8454 +1 205 488 6454 rmaddox@babc.com
Space JAMES B ROBERTSON +1 205 521 8188 brobertson@babc.com
HSBC Finance Corporation HSBC Finance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Richmond Maddox +1 205 521 8454 +1 205 488 6454 rmaddox@babc.com
Space JAMES B ROBERTSON +1 205 521 8188 brobertson@babc.com
No Logo HSBC Mortgage Services Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Richmond Maddox +1 205 521 8454 +1 205 488 6454 rmaddox@babc.com
Space JAMES B ROBERTSON +1 205 521 8188 brobertson@babc.com
HSBC North America Holdings Inc. HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Richmond Maddox +1 205 521 8454 +1 205 488 6454 rmaddox@babc.com
Space JAMES B ROBERTSON +1 205 521 8188 brobertson@babc.com
No Logo RICHARD A. CARDEN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHARD A. CARDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD A. CARDEN +1 573 647 6265
No Logo ROSALIE P. CARDEN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ROSALIE P. CARDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSALIE P. CARDEN +1 573 647 1513
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Scott Hiromi Ikeda on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA Substituting for attorney Nathan Brennaman (Ikeda, Scott) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Charoenpong on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Charoenpong, Tina) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriela Ivonne Martinez on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Martinez, Gabriela) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Bischoff on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Bischoff, Richard) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Clayton on behalf of STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (Clayton, Keith) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Travis Brown on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Corinne Miner Dethmers on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Miner Dethmers, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa C. Lesher on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Lesher, Theresa) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Irvin on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Irvin, David) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Irvin on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Irvin, David) Modified on 5/9/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Stump on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Stump, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gillian Lorraine Andrews on behalf of STATE OF DELAWARE (Andrews, Gillian) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Intervene Under Rule 24 F.R.C.P. by RICHARD A. CARDEN, ROSALIE P. CARDEN (znmw) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Ann Butler on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Butler, Victoria) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for CM/ECF Password by RICHARD A. CARDEN, ROSALIE P. CARDEN (jf) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. Judge Rosemary M. Collyer no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 271 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?