Pantaurus, LLC v. A10 Networks, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00110

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 7:19 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pantaurus LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ferraiuoli LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder jvidal@ferraiuoli.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola +1 787 766 7000 +1 787 766 7001 etorres@ferraiuoli.com
No Logo Ef Johnson Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/25/2016 David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/22/2016 Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2016 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
v.
No Logo A10 Networks Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pantaurus, LLC , Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ferraiuoli LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder jvidal@ferraiuoli.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola +1 787 766 7000 +1 787 766 7001 etorres@ferraiuoli.com
No Logo Allegro Software Development Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/25/2016 David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
TERMINATED: 06/14/2016 Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
TERMINATED: 06/14/2016 Lawrence Kenneth Kolodney +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 lkk@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2016 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2016 Matthew A Colvin +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 colvin@fr.com
No Logo Aviat Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Dolby Laboratories, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Firetide, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
Motorola Solutions, Inc. Motorola Solutions, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo NEOPOST USA INC., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeff E. Schwartz +1 202 461 3100 +1 202 461 3102 jeschwartz@foxrothchild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2016 mark.goodman@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Riverbed Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Schneider Electric Usa, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/12/2016 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Thales E-security, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2016 Scott Melvin Richey +1 202 429 6436 +1 202 429 3902 srichey@steptoe.com
No Logo Vocera Communications, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator
No Logo Pitney Bowes, Inc., Consol Counter Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/25/2016 David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/25/2016 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Pitney Bowes Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Pitney Bowes Inc. (Consolidated Member case # 2:16cv180) and Pitney Bowes Inc. (Consolidated Member case # 2:16cv180) terminated., Attorney David Brandon Conrad and Neil J McNabnay terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/25/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 109 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/25/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Pitney Bowes Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 104 Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv114) with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/21/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 102 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/20/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 103 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlines for 14 days as to Defendant EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. Status Conference set for 8/5/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/20/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlines for 14 days as to Defendant EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion for Fourth Amended Docket Control Order by Pitney Bowes Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conrad, David) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 100 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv119) terminated., Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/12/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION DEEMED PROTECTED BY THE PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/29/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 90 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Motorola Solutions (Consolidated Member case # 2:16cv179). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/27/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fortinet, Inc. of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Neukom, John) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Pitney Bowes Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order Governing Exchange of Information Deemed Protected by the Parties)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Pantaurus, LLC Plaintiff Pantaurus, LLC's Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures as to Pitney Bowes and Fortinet, Inc. (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 89 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 88 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement as to Defendant EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Status Conference set for 7/21/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/22/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Pantaurus, LLC Plaintiff Pantaurus, LLC's Notice of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures as to Pitney Bowes Inc. (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement as to Defendant EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 82 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Allegro Software Development Corporation (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv111) terminated., Attorney Theresa Marie Dawson; Lawrence K Kolodney; Neil J McNabnay; Matthew Alan Colvin and David Brandon Conrad terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/13/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/13/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 77 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/13/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 81 Unopposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement as to Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Status Conference set for 7/8/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/13/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Docket Control Order until and including June 17, 2016 by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement as to Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 76 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/06/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 75 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlines until and including June 27th, 2016 and Notice of Settlement between Pantaurus, LLC and Schneider Electric USA, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Status Conference set for 7/1/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/06/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER; The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:16-cv-110-JRG-RSP. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/2/16. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order - Amended Docket Control Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlines until and including June 27th, 2016 and Notice of Settlement between Pantaurus, LLC and Schneider Electric USA, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternate, to Transfer Venue filed by Pantaurus, LLC . (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pantaurus, LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jean Vidal-Font, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Allegro Software Development Corp)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER re 65 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order filed by Pantaurus, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re 64 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2016., Jury Selection set for 8/7/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 2/14/2017., Markman Hearing set for 1/17/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 6/19/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 66 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Dolby Laboratories, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Dolby Laboratories, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv113) terminated.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/16/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence K Kolodney on behalf of Allegro Software Development Corporation (Kolodney, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Neopost USA, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Neopost USA, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv117) terminated., Attorney Mark A Goodman and Jeff Edward Schwartz terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/13/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/13/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Dolby Laboratories, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternate, to Transfer Venue filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Allegro Software Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conrad, David) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Allegro Software Development Corporation Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Notice of Supplement to It's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conrad, David) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                FILED IN ERROR Additional Attachments to Main Document: 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conrad, David) Modified on 5/11/2016 (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/08/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, David Folsom, filed by Pantaurus, LLC. (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Neopost USA, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternate, to Transfer Venue filed by Pantaurus, LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jean Vidal-Font, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pantaurus, LLC . (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediator by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rafael Rodriguez Muriel on behalf of Pantaurus, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5719736. (Muriel, Rafael) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pantaurus, LLC.(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 49 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice FireTide, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv115). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/22/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Firetide, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 33 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlineas as to Defendant Dolby Laboratories, Inc. and notice of Settlement filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Status Conference set for 5/17/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/19/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 32 Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlines as to Defendant Neopost USA, Inc. and Notice of Settlement filed by Pantaurus, LLC., Status Conference set for 5/17/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/19/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 31 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. filed by Pantaurus, LLC., A10 Networks, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/19/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries S.A.S. for Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Alan Colvin on behalf of Allegro Software Development Corporation, EF Johnson Technologies, Inc. (Colvin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternate, to Transfer Venue by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Todd Nelson, # 2 Declaration of Ognjen Zivojnovic, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Fortinet Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Neukom, John) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Neukom on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Allegro Software Development Corporation (Conrad, David) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Marie Dawson on behalf of Allegro Software Development Corporation (Dawson, Theresa) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Allegro Software Development Corporation (Conrad, David) Modified on 4/18/2016 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Allegro Software Development Corporation (Conrad, David) Modified on 4/18/2016 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Allegro Software Development Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Allegro Software Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allegro Software Development Corporation (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlineas as to Defendant Dolby Laboratories, Inc. and notice of Settlement by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay all Deadlines as to Defendant Neopost USA, Inc. and Notice of Settlement by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant A10 Networks, Inc. by Pantaurus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?