Chastain v. Hodgdon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02087

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 10:08 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/20/16. Mailed to pro se party Clay Chastain by regular mail. (kao)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Setting Scheduling Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/15/16. Mailed to pro se party Clay Chastain by regular mail. (kao)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Setting Scheduling Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?