Sherman Goodwin v. Antoinette Cockrell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1068

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 7:11 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by William A. M. Burke for Antoinette Magee Cockrell and Judy I. Sullivan in 16-1068, 16-1077.[999753792] [16-1068, 16-1077] William Burke
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
    Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-1068, 16-1077] (MRB)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
      DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Local Rule 12(b)) by Appellee Sherman D. Goodwin in 16-1068, Appellant Sherman D. Goodwin in 16-1077. Name of lead counsel: Stevenson L. Weeks. [16-1068, 16-1077] Stevenson Weeks
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Stacy Schwinn in 16-1068. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: opening statements, pre-trial proceedings, and all proceedings prior to testimony of Sherman Goodwin on 11/7/14. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Sherman Goodwin. Originating case number: 4:13-cv-00199-F. Transcript due from Stacy Schwinn, Official Court Reporter on 04/11/2016. [16-1068, 16-1077] (JR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999747768] rescinding briefing order. Copies to all parties. [16-1068, 16-1077] (JR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellee Sherman D. Goodwin. [16-1068] Wesley Cooper
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Sherman D. Goodwin in 16-1068. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999747665] [16-1068, 16-1077] Wesley Cooper
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Wesley C. Cooper for Sherman D. Goodwin in 16-1068.[999747664] [16-1068, 16-1077] Wesley Cooper
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Stevenson L. Weeks for Sherman D. Goodwin in 16-1068.[999747663] [16-1068, 16-1077] Wesley Cooper
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Antoinette Magee Cockrell and Judy I. Sullivan. [16-1068] Christopher Abel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Antoinette Magee Cockrell and Judy I. Sullivan in 16-1068. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999747624] [16-1068, 16-1077] Christopher Abel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher A. Abel for Antoinette Magee Cockrell and Judy I. Sullivan in 16-1068.[999747617] [16-1068, 16-1077] Christopher Abel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                          BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Antoinette Magee Cockrell; Judy I. Sullivan. Mailed to: Stephen Royce Jackson. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/07/2016. Opening/Response Brief Due: 04/08/2016. Response/Reply Brief Due 05/11/2016. [16-1068, 16-1077] (JR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                            ORDER filed [999741453] consolidating case 16-1077 with 16-1068. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Stephen Royce Jackson. [16-1068, 16-1077] (JR)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                              ORDER filed [999741443] rescinding briefing order. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Stephen Royce Jackson. [16-1068] (JR)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stephen Royce Jackson. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/29/2016. Response Brief due 04/04/2016 [16-1068] (JR)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 4:13-cv-00199-F. Mailed to Stephen Royce Jackson [16-1068] (JR)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 4:13-cv-00199-F. Case manager: JRice. [16-1068] (JR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?