Girten v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-00727
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2020 at 10:12 AM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dennis Girten, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brooks J. Grainger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 305

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS J. CURRAN, JR. +1 610 566 5300 fcurran@thecurranfirm.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics Corp, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Stryker - Order for Dismissal ADI
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION PURSUANT TO RULE 25(a) as to Dennis Girten. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Envelope)(KNK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 1/20/16. (kt) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This Notice serves as a reminder to all counsel that they shall read and comply with all Orders and Pretrial Orders ("PTOs") filed in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN), even if not filed in the individual member cases. As the Court noted on May 28, 2014 (Doc. No. 326 ), the Court only files all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the master MDL docket. For example, PTO No. 29, filed today on the master MDL docket is applicable to all cases and should be read and complied with by all counsel for all cases. Indeed, counsel is responsible for all documents applicable to all actions and filed in the master MDL docket. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Further, all Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/27/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
      Summons Issued as to Stryker Ireland Limited. (lmb) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE to Attorney: Defendant Stryker Ireland Limited has been added to this case pursuant to 342 Amended Pretrial Order No. 10 in 13-md-2441 DWF/FLN and the Master Short Form Complaint. (lmb) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
          TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: From this date on, all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN will be filed only in the master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN) and will not be filed in the individual member cases. Orders that apply to less than all cases (e.g., an Order of Dismissal of an individual member case) will be filed in the master MDL docket and in the individual member case. All Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO.9 (Protective Order). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER ON REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO SEEK PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION. Defendants' Request for Permission to Seek Partial Reconsideration of PTO No. 13 (Doc. No. 275 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 (Stipulated Order Regarding Bellwether Categories). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 (Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts With Physician-Experts). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15 (Order Regarding Deposition Guidelines for Plaintiffs Who are In Extremis). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 14 (PLCC Appointments to Sub-Committee to Confer with New Jersey Multicounty Litigation). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/21/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 13. (Order on Discovery Motion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/15/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Order Regarding Direct Filing of Cases into this Court Without Need to Associate Local Counsel. (See Order for details.). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Girten. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. served on 3/5/2014, answer due 3/26/2014. (Curran, Francis) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Girten. Stryker Corporation served on 3/7/2014, answer due 3/28/2014. (Curran, Francis) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Girten. Stryker Sales Corporation served on 3/10/2014, answer due 3/31/2014. (Curran, Francis) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J Curran on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Curran, Francis) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Scheduling orders and bellwether cases.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/25/2014 and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/24/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al. (Please note this Amended PTO was originally filed on 3/25/2014, but only in the main MDL case of 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. To be consistent with all of the other PTO's filed in this MDL, it is being refiled on this date in the main MDL case as well as all member cases.) (BJS) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Scheduling orders and bellwether cases.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/14/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index.(kt) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00384. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel per MDL List. (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Multi-District Litigation 2441, District of Minnesota before Judge Donovan W Frank. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi Clerk of the Panel on 3/14/14. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/14/2014.] (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Uncertified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-36), transferring case to District of Minnesota before Judge Donovan W Frank. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/14/2014. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/14/2014.] (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/14/2014.] (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2290562.), filed by Dennis Girten. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons)(Grainger, Brooks) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/14/2014.] (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?