Jackson v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-01404
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 6:50 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abrams, Rachel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel Beth Abrams +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 rabrams@levinsimes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lill, Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Beth Abrams +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 rabrams@levinsimes.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corp., Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Abrams, Rachel) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This Notice serves as a reminder to all counsel that they shall read and comply with all Orders and Pretrial Orders ("PTOs") filed in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN), even if not filed in the individual member cases. As the Court noted on May 28, 2014 (Doc. No. 326 ), the Court only files all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the master MDL docket. For example, PTO No. 29, filed today on the master MDL docket is applicable to all cases and should be read and complied with by all counsel for all cases. Indeed, counsel is responsible for all documents applicable to all actions and filed in the master MDL docket. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Further, all Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/27/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Jackson. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 7/18/2014, answer due 8/8/2014. (Nemo, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
        TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: From this date on, all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN will be filed only in the master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN) and will not be filed in the individual member cases. Orders that apply to less than all cases (e.g., an Order of Dismissal of an individual member case) will be filed in the master MDL docket and in the individual member case. All Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO.9 (Protective Order). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER ON REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO SEEK PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION. Defendants' Request for Permission to Seek Partial Reconsideration of PTO No. 13 (Doc. No. 275 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 (Stipulated Order Regarding Bellwether Categories). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 (Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts With Physician-Experts). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15 (Order Regarding Deposition Guidelines for Plaintiffs Who are In Extremis). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. (MMP) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                      Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (MMP) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 14-cv-1404 (DWF/FLN). (MMP) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Sales Corporation and Stryker Ireland Limited. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-3966188.) Filed by Charles Jackson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abrams, Rachel) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 62 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?