USA v. Firtash et al
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-00515

Tags
Last Updated December 5, 2019 at 4:46 PM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
Space Amarjeet Singh Bhachu +1 312 353 5300 amarjeet.bhachu@usdoj.gov
Space Michael Thomas Donovan +1 312 353 3500 michael.donovan@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Persons Robell +1 202 418 6710 +1 202 418 5538 jonathan.robell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Firtash, Dmitry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dmitry Firtash"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth E Grden +1 312 558 3243 +1 Not amember egrden@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris J. Stathopoulos +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 mcarter@winston.com
Space DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Dmitry Firtash (1)
Office Chicago
Filed 6/20/2013
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-3300.F
Offense Level 4
INTERSTATE COMMERCE
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
MONEY LAUNDERING - INTERSTATE COMMERCE; 182 AIDING & ABETTING
Count 3-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1952-7400.F
Offense Level 4
RACKETEERING - TRANSPORTING IN AID OF LAUNDERING MONETARY INSTRUMENTS; 182 AIDING IN ABETTING
Defendant Custody Status
Flag MARTIN
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 82 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Sealed document
SEALED Document (Document not Imaged - Kept as Paper) (cc, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/22/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss
    MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order as to Dmitry Firtash (1), Andras Knopp (2) : For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' motions to dismiss [24] [30] are denied. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/21/2019. Mailed notice (jp, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Letter
      LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 6/6/19 Re: Fifth Update on the Austrian Extradition Proceedings. (Webb, Dan)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
        ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash: Motion for leave to withdraw counsel [77] is granted without an appearance. Alison S. Cooney is granted leave to withdraw. The Clerk's Office should remove her from all services list and as counsel for Defendant. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 15, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 notice of motion
          NOTICE of Motion by Alison S Cooney for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney[77] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/20/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Cooney, Alison)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019, Terminated: 3/15/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
            MOTION to withdraw as attorney as to Dmitry Firtash Alison S. Cooney (Cooney, Alison)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
              ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Elizabeth E Grden (Grden, Elizabeth)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Letter
                LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 10/9/2018 Re: Fourth Update on the Austrian Extradition Proceedings in U.S. v. Firtash, No. 13 CR 515. (Webb, Dan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Reply to Motion
                  REPLY by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp to MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment[63] (In Support) (Webb, Dan)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Order on motion for extension of time
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Defendants Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of their motion for leave to file supplement authority [71] is granted for an additional ten days, without an appearance. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 notice of motion
                      NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for extension of time[71] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/27/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018, Terminated: 9/25/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                        MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for extension of time as to motion for leave to[63] File Supplemental Authority in support of their pending motions to dismiss the indictment (Webb, Dan)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: 9/22/2018 Response to motion
                          RESPONSE by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp regarding MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment[63], MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment[24], MOTION by Andras Knopp to dismiss Indictment[30] Government's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant Firtash's and Knopp's Motions to Dismiss Indictment (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Order on motion for extension of time
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Government's unopposed motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief [67] is granted for an additional seven days, without an appearance. Reply to be filed seven days thereafter. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 notice of motion
                              NOTICE of Motion by Amarjeet Singh Bhachu for presentment of motion for extension of time[67] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/20/2018 at 08:45 PM. (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018, Terminated: 9/18/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                MOTION by USA for extension of time as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order on Motion for leave
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Motion hearing held on 9/5/2018. Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp's motion for leave to file supplement authority in support of their motion to dismiss the indictment [630 is entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed within ten (10) days; reply to be filed seven (7) days thereafter. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 notice of motion
                                    NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for leave to[63] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/5/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                      MEMORANDUM by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp in support of MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment[63] (Webb, Dan)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Motion for Leave to
                                        MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Webb, Dan)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 transcript
                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp held on 7/2/18, before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Order Number: 31367. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. (Ward, Frances)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Status hearing held on 7/2/2018. Additional briefs, if any, to be filed within seven (7) days. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, status hearing is set for 7/2/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Letter
                                                LETTER from Dan Webb dated 4/17/18 Re: Third Update on Proceedings in Europe Related to U.S. v. Firtash, No. 13 CR 515. (Webb, Dan)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Letter
                                                  LETTER from Carolyn Gurland dated March 19, 2018 . (Gurland, Carolyn)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Letter
                                                    LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 3/16/2018 Re: Second Update on Proceedings in Europe Related to U.S. v. Firtash. (Webb, Dan)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Letter
                                                      LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 12/20/2017 regarding Update on Austrian Expedition Proceedings. (Webb, Dan)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                        Government's Supplemental Brief in Response to Defendants Firtash's and Knopp's Motions to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Memorandum In Support
                                                          MEMORANDUM by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp in support of MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment[24] (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Webb, Dan)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 transcript
                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp held on 9/15/17, before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017. (Ward, Frances)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Continued oral argument held on 9/15/2017. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 transcript
                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp held on 9/11/17, before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter Frances Ward (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter Frances Ward (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2017. (Ward, Frances)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Oral arguments held and continued to 9/15/2017 at 10:45 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Dmitry Firtash's and Andras Knopp's motion for leave to file reply brief exceeding page limit [46] is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 notice of motion
                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages[46] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/11/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Webb, Dan)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 reply
                                                                        REPLY by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp to response to motion, [40] Joint Reply of Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp to the Government's Consolidated Response to Defendant Firtash's and Knopp's Motion to Dismiss Indictment (Webb, Dan)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017, Terminated: 8/31/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                          MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages (Joint) (Webb, Dan)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Alison S Cooney (Cooney, Alison)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Matthew Robert Carter (Carter, Matthew)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, oral argument on motions to dismiss set for 9/6/2017 is stricken and re-set to 9/11/2017 at 2:00 PM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, reply in support of motion to dismiss extended to 8/30/2017. Oral argument set for 8/25/2017 is stricken and re-set to 9/6/2017 at 2:00 PM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Government's unopposed motion to file response in excess of fifteen page limit [38] is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp regarding MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment[24], MOTION by Andras Knopp to dismiss Indictment[30] Government's Consolidated Response to Defendant Firtash's and Knopp's Motions to Dismiss Indictment (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 notice of motion
                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Amarjeet Singh Bhachu for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages[38] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM. (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017, Terminated: 7/25/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                          MOTION by USA for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp Government's Unopposed Motion to File Response in Excess of Fifteen Page Limit (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, Government's response to motion to dismiss extended to and including 7/24/2017;reply extended to 8/16/2017. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byMichael Thomas Donovan (Donovan, Michael)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash: Defendants' reply briefs to be filed by or on 8/9/2017; oral argument set for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Andras Knopp: Andras Knopp's motion to dismiss the indictment [30] is entered and continued for briefing. Government's response to be filed by or on 7/17/2017; Defendants' reply briefs to be filed by or on 8/9/2017; oral argument set for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Andras Knopp : Motion for leave to appear as retained counsel [29] granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 notice of motion
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Pelling Gurland for presentment of motion to dismiss[30] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/18/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Gurland, Carolyn)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Andras Knopp in support of MOTION by Andras Knopp to dismiss Indictment[30] (Gurland, Carolyn)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017, Terminated: 6/21/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                          MOTION by Andras Knopp to dismiss Indictment (Gurland, Carolyn)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017, Terminated: 5/16/2017 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                            MOTION by Andras Knopp for leave to appear retained counsel Attorney: Carolyn Pelling Gurland. (Gurland, Carolyn)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byJonathan Robell (Robell, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Dmitry Firtash's motion to dismiss the indictment [24] is entered and continued for briefing. Government's response to be filed by or on 7/17/2017. Dmitry Firtash's motion for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages [22] granted, without an appearance. Presentation date of 5/17/2017 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 notice of motion
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion to dismiss[24] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/17/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Dmitry Firtash in support of MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment[24] (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017, Terminated: 6/21/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 notice of motion
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages[22] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/17/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017, Terminated: 5/11/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                          MOTION by Dmitry Firtash for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Dan K. Webb (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Affidavit
                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT filed by the United States (SEALED). (yap, ) Modified on 10/14/2016 (rao, ). (Main Document 20 replaced on 12/3/2018) (jjr, ).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT Signed by Honorable Judge Castillo. (SEALED) (yap, ) Modified on 10/2/2015 (rao, ). (Main Document 19 replaced on 12/3/2018) (jjr, ).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/2/2014. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao: Status hearing held on 4/2/2014. Government's oral motion to unseal the indictment is granted. Enter Order. (For Further Detail See Separate Order.) Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/2/2014. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                      ORAL MOTION by USA to unseal the indictment as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                        SEALED AFFIDAVIT as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao. (meg, ) (Main Document 16 replaced on 12/3/2018) (jjr, ).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                          SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014, Terminated: 3/17/2014 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION by USA as to Suppressed (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 warrant issued
                                                                                                                                              BENCH WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to Andras Knopp. (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Andras Knopp: The Clerk has advised that the warrant for arrest in this case was issued for the arrest of "Andras Knopp a/k/a Dmytro Firtash a/k/a DF." The Defendant was correctly identified as Andras Knop, but he is not also known as Dmytro Firtash or as DF; those names are aliases for a co-Defendant, not for Mr. Knopp. The Clerk is directed to issue a new warrant for the arrest of Andras Knopp. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/14/2013.Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESTRAINING ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/17/2013. (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by USA for a restraining order as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESTRAING ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/17/2013. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED EX PARTE Application by USA for a restraining order as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to Dmitry Firtash, also known as "Dmytro Firtash", and "DF" and Andras Knopp are hereby quashed. Warrants for Arrest to be issued as to Dmitry Firtash, also know as "Dmytro Firstash", and "DF" and Andras Knopp on the charges of Racketeering Conspiracy; Money Laundering Conspiracy; Interstate Travel in Aid of Racketeering; and Conspiracy to Commit an Offense against the United States. A copy of the warrants are to be provided to the Assistant United States Attorney Amarjeet Singh Bhachu. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 warrant issued
                                                                                                                                                            BENCH WARRANTS issued to U.S. Marshal as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez s to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao: To issue bench warrants as to all defendants. The Government will seek to have the defendants detained without bond pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 3142. The District Court Clerk's Office is directed to disclose to the Assistant U.S. Attorney assigned to this case for the government, the name of the judge, magistrate judge and the docket number assigned to this case in order to expedite the arrest and arraignment of the arrested defendants. Do Not Seal Arrest Warrants. The Government is authorized to disclose any information now under seal in this case, including copies of the indict, warrants of arrest and court orders to interpol and other domestic and foreign authorities as necessary to effect the arrest and extradition of the defendants while otherwise maintaining the case file under seal until further order of the court. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 designation form
                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category II). (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 4/3/2014 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Dmitry Firtash (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, Andras Knopp (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Suren Gevorgyan (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Gajendra Lal (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Periyasamy Sunderalingam (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4 with Forfeiture Allegation One and Two. (meg, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?