United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks et al v. New York City Police Department et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-10300

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 16, 2017 at 12:04 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth Posner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth Posner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Posner
No Logo United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks
v.
No Logo Aaron Schock, Defendant
Schiff, Adam Schiff, Adam, Defendant
Officially listed as "Adam B. Schiff"
No Logo Adam Kinzinger, Defendant
No Logo Adam Smith, Defendant
No Logo Adrian, Smith +., Defendant
No Logo Al Franken, Defendant
No Logo Alan Grayson, Defendant
No Logo Alan Lowenthal, Defendant
No Logo Alan Nunnelee, Defendant
No Logo Albert Branson Maris, Defendant
No Logo Albio Sires, Defendant
No Logo Alcee L. Hastings, Defendant
No Logo Alison J. Nathan, Defendant
No Logo Allyson Y. Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Ami Bera, Defendant
No Logo Amy Klobuchar, Defendant
No Logo Ander Crenshaw, Defendant
No Logo Andre Carson, Defendant
No Logo Andrew L. Carter, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Andy Barr, Defendant
No Logo Andy Harris, Defendant
No Logo Angus King, Defendant
No Logo Ann Kirkpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Ann McLane Kuster, Defendant
No Logo Ann Wagner, Defendant
No Logo Anna G. Eshoo, Defendant
No Logo Austin, Scott, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Barbara A. Mikulski, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Boxer, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Lee, Defendant
No Logo Ben Orrison, Defendant
No Logo Ben Ray Lujan, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin L. Cardin, Defendant
No Logo Bennie Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Bernard Sanders, Defendant
No Logo Beto O'Rourke, Defendant
No Logo Betty McCollum, Defendant
No Logo Bill Cassidy, Defendant
No Logo Bill Enyart, Defendant
No Logo Bill Flores, Defendant
No Logo Bill Foster, Defendant
No Logo Bill Huizenga, Defendant
No Logo Bill Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Bill Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Bill Owens, Defendant
No Logo Bill Pascrell, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Bill Posey, Defendant
No Logo Bill Shuster, Defendant
No Logo Billy Long, Defendant
No Logo Blaine Luetkemeyer, Defendant
No Logo Blake Farenthold, Defendant
No Logo Bob Casey, Defendant
No Logo Bob Corker, Defendant
No Logo Bob Gibbs, Defendant
No Logo Bob Latta, Defendant
No Logo Bobby L. Rush, Defendant
No Logo Brad Schneider, Defendant
No Logo Brad Sherman, Defendant
No Logo Brad Wenstrup, Defendant
No Logo Bradley Bryne, Defendant
No Logo Brett Guthrie, Defendant
No Logo Brian Schatz, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Braley, Defendant
No Logo C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Defendant
No Logo Candice S. Miller, Defendant
No Logo CARL LEVIN, Defendant
No Logo Carol Shea-Porter, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn B. Maloney, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn McCarthy, Defendant
No Logo Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Defendant
No Logo Cedric L. Richmond, Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Chaka Fattah, Defendant
No Logo Charles B. Rangel, Defendant
No Logo Charles Boustany, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Charles E. Grassley, Defendant
No Logo Charles E. Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Charles Miller Metzner, Defendant
No Logo Charlie Dent, Defendant
No Logo Charmaigne Odom, Defendant
No Logo Chellie Pingree, Defendant
No Logo Cheri Bustos, Defendant
No Logo Chris Collins, Defendant
No Logo Chris Coons, Defendant
No Logo Chris Gibson, Defendant
No Logo Chris Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Chris Van Hollen, Defendant
No Logo Christopher H. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Christopher S. Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Fleischmann, Defendant
No Logo CIA Director, Defendant
No Logo Claire V. Eagan, Defendant
No Logo Claire McCaskill, Defendant
No Logo Colleen McMAHON, Defendant
No Logo Collen Hanabusa, Defendant
No Logo Collin C. Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner and Director of the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Defendant
No Logo Corrine Brown, Defendant
Booker, Cory A. Booker, Cory A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cory Booker"
No Logo Cory Gardner, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia M. Lummis, Defendant
No Logo Dan Benishek, Defendant
No Logo Dan Coats, Defendant
No Logo Dan Kildee, Defendant
No Logo Dan Maffei, Defendant
No Logo Dana Rohrabacher, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Holcombe Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Webster, Defendant
No Logo Danny K. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Darrel Issa, Defendant
No Logo Dave Camp, Defendant
No Logo Dave Loebsack, Defendant
No Logo Dave Reichert, Defendant
No Logo David B, McKinley, Defendant
No Logo David Cicilline, Defendant
No Logo David E. Price, Defendant
No Logo DAVID JOLLY, Defendant
No Logo David Joyce, Defendant
No Logo David Norton Edelstein, Defendant
No Logo David Schweikert, Defendant
No Logo David Scott, Defendant
No Logo David Valadao, Defendant
No Logo David Vitter, Defendant
No Logo Dean Heller, Defendant
No Logo Deb Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Stabenow, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Defendant
No Logo Deborah A. Batts, Defendant
No Logo Denise L. Cote, Defendant
No Logo Dennis A. Ross, Defendant
No Logo Denny Chin, Defendant
No Logo Denny Heck, Defendant
No Logo Department of Interior, Defendant
No Logo Derek Kilmer, Defendant
Nunes, Devin G. Nunes, Devin G., Defendant
Officially listed as "Devin Nunes"
No Logo Diana DeGette, Defendant
No Logo Diane Black, Defendant
No Logo Dianne Feinstein, Defendant
No Logo Dina Titus, Defendant
No Logo Doc Hastings, Defendant
No Logo Don Young , Defendant
No Logo Donald M. Payne, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Donna Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Doris Matsui, Defendant
No Logo Doug Collins, Defendant
No Logo Doug LaMalfa, Defendant
No Logo Doug Lamborn, Defendant
No Logo Doug Williams , Defendant
No Logo Dr. Mike Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Robert Hurt, Defendant
No Logo Duncan Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Earl Blumenauer, Defendant
No Logo Earl Kohlbacker, Defendant
No Logo Ed Pastor, Defendant
No Logo Ed Perlmutter, Defendant
No Logo Ed Royce, Defendant
No Logo Eddie Bernice Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Edward J. Markey, Defendant
No Logo Edward Joseph McManus, Defendant
No Logo Edward Whitfield, Defendant
No Logo Elijah E. Cummings, Defendant
No Logo Eliot L. Engel, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Esty, Defendant
Warren, Elizabeth Warren, Elizabeth, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elizabeth Warren"
No Logo Emanuel Cleaver, II, Defendant
No Logo Eric Cantor, Defendant
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
No Logo Eric Swalwell, Defendant
No Logo Erik Paulsen, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
No Logo Filemon Vela, Defendant
No Logo Frank A, LoBiondo, Defendant
No Logo Frank D. Lucas, Defendant
No Logo Frank Pallone, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Frank R. Wolf, Defendant
No Logo Fred Upton, Defendant
No Logo Frederica S. Wilson, Defendant
No Logo G.K. Butterfield, Defendant
No Logo Garret Gaetano, Defendant
No Logo Gary G. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Gary Peters, Defendant
No Logo Gene Greene, Defendant
No Logo George C. Young, Defendant
No Logo George B. Daniels, Defendant
No Logo George Holding, Defendant
No Logo George Miller, Defendant
No Logo Gerald D. Connolly, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Negrete McLeod, Defendant
No Logo Grace F. Napolitano, Defendant
No Logo Grace Meng, Defendant
No Logo Greg Walden, Defendant
No Logo Gregg Harper, Defendant
No Logo Gregory W. Meeks, Defendant
No Logo Gus Bilirakis, Defendant
No Logo Gwen Moore, Defendant
No Logo Hakeem Jefferies, Defendant
No Logo Hank Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Harold Baer, Defendant
No Logo Harold Rogers, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Hedi Heitkamp, Defendant
No Logo Henry A. Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Henry Cuellar, Defendant
No Logo Henry Potter, Defendant
No Logo Herrera Jaime Beutler, Defendant
No Logo Hillary Rodnam Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Joy Flowers Conti, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Vincent L. Briccetti, Defendant
No Logo Howard "Buck" McKeon, Defendant
No Logo Howard Coble, Defendant
No Logo Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Defendant
No Logo J. Randy Forbes, Defendant
No Logo Jack Kingston, Defendant
No Logo Jack Reed, Defendant
No Logo Jackie Speier, Defendant
No Logo Jackie Walorski, Defendant
No Logo James B. Renacci, Defendant
No Logo James B. Zagel , Defendant
No Logo James E. Boasberg, Defendant
No Logo James E. Clyburn, Defendant
No Logo James Lankford, Defendant
No Logo James M. Inhofe, Defendant
No Logo James P. Moran, Defendant
No Logo James R. Browning, Defendant
No Logo Jan Schakowsky, Defendant
No Logo Janice Hahn, Defendant
No Logo Jared Huffman, Defendant
No Logo Jared Polis, Defendant
No Logo Jason Chaffetz, Defendant
No Logo Jason Smith, Defendant
No Logo Jay Rockefeller, Defendant
No Logo Jeanne Shaheen, Defendant
No Logo Jeb Hensarling, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Denham, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Duncan, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Flake, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Fortenberry, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Merkley, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Miller, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeff Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Jerrold Nadler, Defendant
No Logo Jerry McNerney, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Moran, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Albert, Defendant
No Logo Jim Brennan, Defendant
No Logo Jim Bridenstine, Defendant
No Logo JIM COOPER, Defendant
No Logo Jim Costa, Defendant
No Logo Jim Gerlach, Defendant
No Logo Jim Himes, Defendant
No Logo Jim Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Jim Langevin, Defendant
No Logo Jim Matheson, Defendant
No Logo Jim McDermott, Defendant
No Logo Jim McGovern, Defendant
No Logo Jim Risch, Defendant
No Logo Jim Sensenbrenner, Defendant
No Logo Joaquin Castro, Defendant
No Logo Joe Courtney, Defendant
No Logo Joe Donnelly, Defendant
No Logo Joe Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Joe Heck, Defendant
No Logo Joe L. Barton, Defendant
No Logo Joe Manchin, III, Defendant
No Logo Joe Pitts, Defendant
No Logo Joe Wilson, Defendant
No Logo John A. Boehner, Defendant
No Logo John B. Larson, Defendant
No Logo John Barrasso, Defendant
No Logo John Boozman, Defendant
No Logo John Campbell, Defendant
No Logo John Carney, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CARTER, Defendant
No Logo John Conyers, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Cornyn, Defendant
No Logo John Culberson, Defendant
No Logo John D. Dingell, Defendant
No Logo John Delaney, Defendant
No Logo John F. Keenan, Defendant
No Logo John F. Tierney, Defendant
No Logo John Fleming, Defendant
No Logo John G. Koeltl, Defendant
No Logo John Garamendi, Defendant
No Logo John Hoeven, Defendant
No Logo John J. Duncan, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Kline, Defendant
No Logo John L. Mica, Defendant
No Logo John Lewis, Defendant
No Logo John McCain, Defendant
No Logo John Sarbanes, Defendant
No Logo John Shimkus, Defendant
No Logo John Thune, Defendant
No Logo John Walsh, Defendant
No Logo John Yarmuth, Defendant
No Logo Johnny Isakson, Defendant
No Logo Jon Runyan, Defendant
No Logo Jon Tester, Defendant
No Logo Jose E. Serrano, Defendant
No Logo Joseph William Woodrough, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Buffington, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Chappell Hutcheson, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Joseph P. Kennedy, II, Defendant
No Logo Jospeh Crowley, Defendant
No Logo Joyce Beatty, Defendant
No Logo Juan C. Vargas, Defendant
No Logo Judy Chu, Defendant
No Logo Julia Brownley, Defendant
No Logo Justin Amash, Defendant
No Logo K. Michael Conaway, Defendant
No Logo Karen Bass, Defendant
No Logo Katherine M. Clark, Defendant
No Logo Katherine Polk Failla, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Castor, Defendant
No Logo Kay Granger, Defendant
No Logo Kay Hagan, Defendant
No Logo Keith Ellison, Defendant
No Logo Keith Rothfus, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Ayotte, Defendant
No Logo Ken Calvert, Defendant
No Logo Ken Salizar, Defendant
No Logo Kenny Marchant, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Bentivolio, Defendant
No Logo Keven P. Caster, Defendant
No Logo Keven T. Duffy, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Brady, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Cramer, Defendant
No Logo Kevin McCarthy, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Yoder, Defendant
Gillibrand, Kirsten Gillibrand, Kirsten, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirsten Gillibrand"
No Logo Kristi Noem, Defendant
No Logo Kurt Schrader, Defendant
No Logo Kyle Kohlbacker, Defendant
No Logo Kyrsten Sinema, Defendant
No Logo Lamar, Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Lamar Smith, Defendant
No Logo Larry Bucshon, Defendant
No Logo Learned Hand, Defendant
No Logo Lee, Terry, Defendant
No Logo Leonard Lance, Defendant
No Logo Linda T. Sanchez, Defendant
Graham, Lindsey O. Graham, Lindsey O., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lindsey Graham"
No Logo Lisa Murkowski, Defendant
No Logo Lloyd Doggett, Defendant
No Logo Lois Capps, Defendant
No Logo Lois Frankel, Defendant
No Logo Loretta Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Lou Barletta, Defendant
No Logo Louie Gohmert, Defendant
No Logo Louise M. Slaughter, Defendant
No Logo Lucille Roybal-Allard, Defendant
No Logo Luis V. Gutierrez, Defendant
No Logo Luke Messer, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Jenkins, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Westmoreland, Defendant
No Logo Mac Thornberry, Defendant
No Logo Marc Veasey, Defendant
No Logo Marcia L. Fudge, Defendant
No Logo Marco Rubio, Defendant
No Logo Marcy Kaptur, Defendant
No Logo Maria Cantwell, Defendant
No Logo Mario Diaz-Balart, Defendant
No Logo Mark Amodei, Defendant
No Logo Mark Begich, Defendant
No Logo Mark Meadows, Defendant
No Logo Mark Pocan, Defendant
No Logo Mark Pryor, Defendant
No Logo Mark S. Kirk, Defendant
No Logo Mark Sanford, Defendant
No Logo Mark Takano, Defendant
No Logo Mark Udall, Defendant
No Logo Mark Warner, Defendant
No Logo Markwayne Mullin, Defendant
No Logo Marlin Stutzman, Defendant
No Logo Marsha Blackburn, Defendant
No Logo Martha Roby, Defendant
No Logo Martin Henrich, Defendant
No Logo Martin L.C. Feldman, Defendant
No Logo Mary A. McLaughlin, Defendant
No Logo Mary L. Landrieu, Defendant
No Logo Matt Cartwright, Defendant
No Logo Matt Salmon, Defendant
No Logo Maxine Waters, Defendant
No Logo Hirono, Mazie K., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mazie K. Hirono"
No Logo Michael B. Enzi, Defendant
No Logo Michael Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Michael C. Burgess, Defendant
No Logo Michael D. Crapo, Defendant
No Logo Michael E. Capuano, Defendant
No Logo Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Michael Grimm, Defendant
No Logo Michael H. Michaud, Defendant
No Logo Michael M. Honda, Defendant
No Logo Michael McCaul, Defendant
No Logo Michael R. Turner, Defendant
No Logo Michael W. Mosman, Defendant
No Logo Michele Bachmann, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Lujan Grisham, Defendant
Mulvaney, Mick Mulvaney, Mick, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mick Mulvaney"
No Logo Mike Coffman, Defendant
No Logo Mike D. Rogers, Defendant
No Logo Mike Doyle, Defendant
No Logo Mike Johanns, Defendant
No Logo Mike Lee, Defendant
No Logo Mike McIntyre, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
No Logo Mike Quigley, Defendant
No Logo MIKE ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo Mike Simpson, Defendant
No Logo Mike Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitch McConnell"
No Logo Mo Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Morgan Griffith, Defendant
No Logo Myron Donovan Crocker, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Nick J. Rahall, II, Defendant
No Logo Niki Tsongas, Defendant
No Logo Nita M. Lowery, Defendant
No Logo Nora Barry Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Nydia M. Velazquez, Defendant
No Logo Officer Daniel Pantaleo, Defendant
No Logo Orie Leon Phillips, Defendant
No Logo Orrin G. Hatch, Defendant
No Logo Pat Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Pat Tiberi, Defendant
No Logo Patrick J. Toomey, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Leachy, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Meehan, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Patrick T. McHenry, Defendant
No Logo Patty Murray, Defendant
No Logo Paul A. Crotty, Defendant
No Logo Paul A. Engelmayer, Defendant
No Logo Paul Broun, Defendant
No Logo Paul Cook, Defendant
No Logo Paul D. Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Paul Gosar, Defendant
No Logo Paul J. Oetken, Defendant
No Logo Paul Tonko, Defendant
No Logo Pete Gallego, Defendant
No Logo Pete Olson, Defendant
No Logo Pete Sessions, Defendant
No Logo Peter A. DeFazio, Defendant
No Logo Peter J. Visclosky, Defendant
No Logo Peter Roskam, Defendant
No Logo Peter T. King, Defendant
No Logo Peter Welch, Defendant
No Logo Phil Gingrey, Defendant
No Logo Phil Roe, Defendant
No Logo Police Officer John Barrow, Defendant
No Logo Ralph M. Hall, Defendant
No Logo Rand, Paul, Defendant
No Logo Randy Hultgren, Defendant
No Logo Randy Neugebauer, Defendant
No Logo Randy Weber, Defendant
No Logo Raul M. Grijalva, Defendant
No Logo Raul R. Labrador, Defendant
No Logo Raul Ruiz, Defendant
No Logo Raymond J. Dearie, Defendant
No Logo Reid Ribble, Defendant
No Logo Renee Ellmers, Defendant
No Logo Renewal Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rich Nugent, Defendant
No Logo Blumenthal, Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Blumenthal"
No Logo Richard C. Shelby, Defendant
No Logo Richard E. Neal, Defendant
No Logo Richard Hanna, Defendant
No Logo Richard Hudson, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Durbin, Defendant
No Logo Richard M. Berman, Defendant
No Logo Richard M. Burr, Defendant
No Logo Ricj Nolan, Defendant
No Logo Rick Crawford, Defendant
No Logo Rick Larsen, Defendant
No Logo Rob Bishop, Defendant
No Logo Rob Portman, Defendant
No Logo Rob Wittman, Defendant
No Logo Rob Woodall, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert B. Aderholt, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Scott, Defendant
No Logo Robert Menendez, Defendant
No Logo Robert Pittenger, Defendant
No Logo Robert W. Goodlatte, Defendant
No Logo Robin Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Rodger Williams, Defendant
No Logo Rodney Davis, Defendant
No Logo Rodney Frelinghuysen, Defendant
No Logo Roger Wicker, Defendant
No Logo Ron Barber, Defendant
No Logo Ron DeSantis, Defendant
No Logo RON JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo Ron Kind, Defendant
No Logo Ron Wyden, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie Abrams, Defendant
No Logo Rosa DeLauro, Defendant
No Logo Rosemary M. Collyer, Defendant
No Logo Roy Blunt, Defendant
No Logo Ruben Hinojosa, Defendant
No Logo Rush D. Holt, Defendant
No Logo Sam Farr, Defendant
No Logo Sam Graves, Defendant
No Logo Sam Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Sander M. Levin, Defendant
No Logo Sanford D. Bishop, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Saxby Chambliss, Defendant
No Logo Saylor Dennis F. , IV, Defendant
No Logo Scott DesJarlais, Defendant
No Logo Whatley Kallas, Llp, Defendant
Officially listed as "Scott Garrett"
No Logo Scott Perry, Defendant
No Logo Scott Peters, Defendant
No Logo Scott Rigell, Defendant
No Logo Scott Tipton, Defendant
No Logo Sean Langford, Defendant
No Logo Sean P. Duffy, Defendant
No Logo Sean Patrick Maloney, Defendant
No Logo Seybourn Harris Lynne, Defendant
No Logo Sheldon Whitehouse, Defendant
No Logo Shelia Jackson Lee, Defendant
No Logo Shelley Moore Capito, Defendant
No Logo Sherrod Brown, Defendant
No Logo Southern District of New York United States Attorney's Office, Defendant
No Logo Spencer Bachus, Defendant
No Logo Steny H. Hoyer, Defendant
No Logo Stephen F. Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Fincher, Defendant
No Logo Steve Chabot, Defendant
No Logo STEVE COHEN, Defendant
No Logo Steve Daines, Defendant
No Logo Steve King, Defendant
No Logo Steve M. Palazoo, Defendant
No Logo Steve Pearce, Defendant
No Logo Steve Scalise, Defendant
No Logo Steve Southerland, II, Defendant
No Logo Steve Stivers, Defendant
No Logo Steve Stockman, Defendant
No Logo Steve Womack, Defendant
No Logo Steven Horsford, Defendant
No Logo Steven Israel, Defendant
No Logo Susan A. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Susan Collins, Defendant
No Logo Susan W. Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Susan Webber Wright, Defendant
No Logo Suzan DelBene, Defendant
No Logo Suzanne Bonamici, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Baldwin, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Duckworth, Defendant
No Logo Ted Cruz, Defendant
No Logo Ted Deutch, Defendant
No Logo Ted Poe, Defendant
No Logo Ted Yoho, Defendant
No Logo Terri A. Sewell, Defendant
No Logo Thad Cochran, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Massie, Defendant
No Logo Thomas R. Carper, Defendant
No Logo Tim Griffin, Defendant
No Logo Tim Huelskamp, Defendant
No Logo Tim Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Tim Kaine, Defendant
No Logo Tim Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Tim Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Tim Scott, Defendant
No Logo Tim Walberg, Defendant
No Logo Tim Walz, Defendant
No Logo Timothy H. Bishop, Defendant
No Logo Todd Rokita, Defendant
No Logo TODD YOUNG, Defendant
No Logo Tom Coburn, Defendant
No Logo Tom Cole, Defendant
No Logo Tom Cotton, Defendant
No Logo Tom Graves, Defendant
No Logo Tom Harkin, Defendant
No Logo Tom Latham, Defendant
No Logo Tom Marino, Defendant
No Logo Tom McClintock, Defendant
No Logo Tom Petri, Defendant
No Logo Tom Price, Defendant
No Logo Tom Reed, Defendant
No Logo Tom Rice, Defendant
No Logo Tom Ronney, Defendant
No Logo Tom Udall, Defendant
No Logo Tony Cardenas, Defendant
No Logo Trent Franks, Defendant
No Logo Trey Gowdy, Defendant
No Logo Tulsi Gabbard, Defendant
No Logo United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Attorney"
No Logo United States Probation Department for the Western District for Pennsylvania , Defendant
No Logo Valerie E. Caproni, Defendant
No Logo Vance McAllister, Defendant
No Logo Vera Buchanan, Defendant
No Logo Vernon S. Broderick, Defendant
No Logo Vicky Hartzler, Defendant
No Logo Victor Marrero, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Foxx, Defendant
No Logo Walter B. Jones, Defendant
No Logo Wesley E. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Wilfred Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo William Augustus Bootle, Defendant
No Logo William Cranch, Defendant
No Logo William Joseph Nealon, Jr., Defendant
No Logo William Keating, Defendant
No Logo William Lacy Clay, Defendant
No Logo Xavier Becerra, Defendant
No Logo Yvette D. Clarke, Defendant
No Logo Zoe Lofgren, Defendant
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re: 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Kenneth Posner: that The Court has considered Plaintiff Posner's notice and accompanying documents and finds that because this case is closed, to the extent the notice could be construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal, it is denied as moot. The Court does, however, direct the Clerk of Court to remove Kenneth Posner as a Plaintiff from this case and terminate the notice (ECF # 7). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be take in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue), and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/23/2015) (tn) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by Kenneth Posner. (Fellig, Thomas) Modified on 6/17/2015 (km). (Entered: 06/16/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CIVIL JUDGMENT in favor of CIA Director, Central Intelligence Agency, Commissioner and Director of the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of Interior, Federal Bureau of Investigation, New York City Police Department, Renewal Inc., Southern District of New York United States Attorney's Office, United States Attorney, United States Probation Department for the Western District for Pennsylvania, Aaron Schock, Adam Kinzinger, Adam Smith, Adam B. Schiff, Adrian Smith, Al Franken, Alan Grayson, Alan Lowenthal, Alan Nunnelee, Albert Branson Maris, Albio Sires, Alcee L. Hastings, Alison J. Nathan, Allyson Y. Schwartz, Ami Bera, Amy Klobuchar, Ander Crenshaw, Andre Carson, Andrew L. Carter, Jr, Andy Barr, Andy Harris, Angus King, Ann Kirkpatrick, Ann Wagner, Ann McLane Kuster, Anna G. Eshoo, Austin Scott, Barack Obama, Barbara Boxer, Barbara Lee, Barbara A. Mikulski, Ben Orrison, Ben Ray Lujan, Benjamin L. Cardin, Bennie Thompson, Bernard Sanders, Beto O'Rourke, Betty McCollum, Bill Cassidy, Bill Enyart, Bill Flores, Bill Foster, Bill Huizenga, Bill Johnson, Bill Nelson, Bill Owens, Bill Pascrell, Jr, Bill Posey, Bill Shuster, Billy Long, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Blake Farenthold, Bob Casey, Bob Corker, Bob Gibbs, Bob Latta, Bobby L. Rush, Brad Schneider, Brad Sherman, Brad Wenstrup, Bradley Bryne, Brett Guthrie, Brian Schatz, Bruce Braley, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Candice S. Miller, Carl Levin, Carol Shea-Porter, Carolyn McCarthy, Carolyn B. Maloney, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Cedric L. Richmond, Chaka Fattah, Charles Boustany, Jr, Charles B. Rangel, Charles E. Grassley, Charles E. Schumer, Charles Miller Metzner, Charlie Dent, Charmaigne Odom, Chellie Pingree, Cheri Bustos, Chris Collins, Chris Coons, Chris Gibson, Chris Stewart, Chris Van Hollen, Christopher H. Smith, Christopher S. Murphy, Chuck Fleischmann, Claire McCaskill, Claire V. Eagan, Colleen McMAHON, Collen Hanabusa, Collin C. Peterson, Corrine Brown, Cory Booker, Cory Gardner, Cynthia M. Lummis, Dan Benishek, Dan Coats, Dan Kildee, Dan Maffei, Dana Rohrabacher, Daniel Pantaleo, Daniel Webster, Daniel Holcombe Thomas, Danny K. Davis, Darrel Issa, Dave Camp, Dave Loebsack, Dave Reichert, David Cicilline, David Jolly, David Joyce, David Schweikert, David Scott, David Valadao, David Vitter, David B, McKinley, David E. Price, David Norton Edelstein, Dean Heller, Deb Fischer, Debbie Stabenow, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Deborah A. Batts, Denise L. Cote, Dennis A. Ross, Denny Chin, Denny Heck, Derek Kilmer, Devin Nunes, Diana DeGette, Diane Black, Dianne Feinstein, Dina Titus, Doc Hastings, Don Young, Donald M. Payne, Jr, Donna Edwards, Doris Matsui, Doug Collins, Doug LaMalfa, Doug Lamborn, Doug Williams, Duncan Hunter, Earl Blumenauer, Earl Kohlbacker, Ed Pastor, Ed Perlmutter, Ed Royce, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Edward Whitfield, Edward J. Markey, Edward Joseph McManus, Elijah E. Cummings, Eliot L. Engel, Elizabeth Esty, Elizabeth Warren, Emanuel Cleaver, II, Eric Cantor, Eric Holder, Eric Swalwell, Erik Paulsen, Filemon Vela, Frank Pallone, Jr, Frank A, LoBiondo, Frank D. Lucas, Frank R. Wolf, Fred Upton, Frederica S. Wilson, G.K. Butterfield, Garret Gaetano, Gary Peters, Gary G. Miller, Gene Greene, George Holding, George Miller, George B. Daniels, George C. Young, Gerald D. Connolly, Glenn Thompson, Gloria Negrete McLeod, Grace Meng, Grace F. Napolitano, Greg Walden, Gregg Harper, Gregory W. Meeks, Gus Bilirakis, Gwen Moore, Hakeem Jefferies, Hank Johnson, Harold Baer, Harold Rogers, Harry Reid, Hedi Heitkamp, Henry Cuellar, Henry Potter, Henry A. Waxman, Herrera Jaime Beutler, Hillary Rodnam Clinton, Howard Coble, Howard "Buck" McKeon, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, J. Randy Forbes, Jack Kingston, Jack Reed, Jackie Speier, Jackie Walorski, James Lankford, James B. Renacci, James B. Zagel, James E. Boasberg, James E. Clyburn, James M. Inhofe, James P. Moran, James R. Browning, Jan Schakowsky, Janice Hahn, Jared Huffman, Jared Polis, Jason Chaffetz, Jason Smith, Jay Rockefeller, Jeanne Shaheen, Jeb Hensarling, Jeff Denham, Jeff Duncan, Jeff Flake, Jeff Fortenberry, Jeff Merkley, Jeff Miller, Jeff Sessions, Jerrold Nadler, Jerry McNerney, Jerry Moran, Jessica Albert, Jim Brennan, Jim Bridenstine, Jim Cooper, Jim Costa, Jim Gerlach, Jim Himes, Jim Jordan, Jim Langevin, Jim Matheson, Jim McDermott, Jim McGovern, Jim Risch, Jim Sensenbrenner, Joaquin Castro, Joe Courtney, Joe Donnelly, Joe Garcia, Joe Heck, Joe Manchin, III, Joe Pitts, Joe Wilson, Joe L. Barton, John Barrasso, John Barrow, John Boozman, John Campbell, John Carney, John Carter, John Conyers, Jr, John Cornyn, John Culberson, John Delaney, John Fleming, John Garamendi, John Hoeven, John Kline, John Lewis, John McCain, John Sarbanes, John Shimkus, John Thune, John Walsh, John Yarmuth, John A. Boehner, John B. Larson, John D. Dingell, John F. Keenan, John F. Tierney, John G. Koeltl, John J. Duncan, Jr, John L. Mica, Johnny Isakson, Jon Runyan, Jon Tester, Jose E. Serrano, Joseph Buffington, Joseph Chappell Hutcheson, Jr, Joseph P. Kennedy, II, Joseph William Woodrough, Jospeh Crowley, Joy Flowers Conti, Joyce Beatty, Juan C. Vargas, Judy Chu, Julia Brownley, Justin Amash, K. Michael Conaway, Karen Bass, Katherine M. Clark, Katherine Polk Failla, Kathy Castor, Kay Granger, Kay Hagan, Keith Ellison, Keith Rothfus, Kelly Ayotte, Ken Calvert, Ken Salizar, Kenny Marchant, Kerry Bentivolio, Keven P. Caster, Keven T. Duffy, Kevin Brady, Kevin Cramer, Kevin McCarthy, Kevin Yoder, Kirsten Gillibrand, Kristi Noem, Kurt Schrader, Kyle Kohlbacker, Kyrsten Sinema, Lamar Alexander, Lamar Smith, Larry Bucshon, Learned Hand, Lee Terry, Leonard Lance, Linda T. Sanchez, Lindsey Graham, Lisa Murkowski, Lloyd Doggett, Lois Capps, Lois Frankel, Loretta Sanchez, Lou Barletta, Louie Gohmert, Louise M. Slaughter, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Luis V. Gutierrez, Luke Messer, Lynn Jenkins, Lynn Westmoreland, Mac Thornberry, Marc Veasey, Marcia L. Fudge, Marco Rubio, Marcy Kaptur, Maria Cantwell, Mario Diaz-Balart, Mark Amodei, Mark Begich, Mark Meadows, Mark Pocan, Mark Pryor, Mark Sanford, Mark Takano, Mark Udall, Mark Warner, Mark S. Kirk, Markwayne Mullin, Marlin Stutzman, Marsha Blackburn, Martha Roby, Martin Henrich, Martin L.C. Feldman, Mary A. McLaughlin, Mary L. Landrieu, Matt Cartwright, Matt Salmon, Maxine Waters, Mazie K. Hirono, Michael Bennett, Michael Grimm, Michael McCaul, Michael B. Enzi, Michael C. Burgess, Michael D. Crapo, Michael E. Capuano, Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Michael H. Michaud, Michael M. Honda, Michael R. Turner, Michael W. Mosman, Michele Bachmann, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Mick Mulvaney, Mike Coffman, Mike Doyle, Mike Johanns, Mike Kelly, Mike Lee, Mike McIntyre, Mike Pompeo, Mike Quigley, Mike Rogers, Mike Simpson, Mike Thompson, Mike D. Rogers, Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Mitch McConnell, Mo Brooks, Morgan Griffith, Myron Donovan Crocker, Nancy Pelosi, Nick J. Rahall, II, Niki Tsongas, Nita M. Lowery, Nora Barry Fischer, Nydia M. Velazquez, Orie Leon Phillips, Orrin G. Hatch, Pat Roberts, Pat Tiberi, Patrick Leachy, Patrick Meehan, Patrick Murphy, Patrick J. Toomey, Patrick T. McHenry, Patty Murray, Paul Broun, Paul Cook, Paul Gosar, Paul Tonko, Paul A Crotty, Paul A. Engelmayer, Paul D. Ryan, Paul J. Oetken, Pete Gallego, Pete Olson, Pete Sessions, Peter Roskam, Peter Welch, Peter A. DeFazio, Peter J. Visclosky, Peter T. King, Phil Gingrey, Phil Roe, Ralph M. Hall, Rand Paul, Randy Hultgren, Randy Neugebauer, Randy Weber, Raul Ruiz, Raul M. Grijalva, Raul R. Labrador, Raymond J. Dearie, Reid Ribble, Renee Ellmers, Rich Nugent, Richard Blumenthal, Richard Hanna, Richard Hudson, Richard C. Shelby, Richard E. Neal, Richard J. Durbin, Richard M. Berman, Richard M. Burr, Ricj Nolan, Rick Crawford, Rick Larsen, Rob Bishop, Rob Portman, Rob Wittman, Rob Woodall, Robert Hurt, Robert Menendez, Robert Pittenger, Robert A. Brady, Robert B. Aderholt, Robert C. Scott, Robert W. Goodlatte, Robin Kelly, Rodger Williams, Rodney Davis, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Roger Wicker, Ron Barber, Ron DeSantis, Ron Johnson, Ron Kind, Ron Wyden, Ronnie Abrams, Rosa DeLauro, Rosemary M. Collyer, Roy Blunt, Ruben Hinojosa, Rush D. Holt, Sam Farr, Sam Graves, Sam Johnson, Sander M. Levin, Sanford D. Bishop, Jr, Saxby Chambliss, Saylor Dennis F., IV, Scott DesJarlais, Scott Garrett, Scott Perry, Scott Peters, Scott Rigell, Scott Tipton, Sean Langford, Sean P. Duffy, Sean Patrick Maloney, Seybourn Harris Lynne, Sheldon Whitehouse, Shelia Jackson Lee, Shelley Moore Capito, Sherrod Brown, Spencer Bachus, Steny H. Hoyer, Stephen Fincher, Stephen F. Lynch, Steve Chabot, Steve Cohen, Steve Daines, Steve King, Steve Pearce, Steve Scalise, Steve Southerland, II, Steve Stivers, Steve Stockman, Steve Womack, Steve M. Palazoo, Steven Horsford, Steven Israel, Susan Collins, Susan A. Davis, Susan W. Brooks, Susan Webber Wright, Suzan DelBene, Suzanne Bonamici, Tammy Baldwin, Tammy Duckworth, Ted Cruz, Ted Deutch, Ted Poe, Ted Yoho, Terri A. Sewell, Thad Cochran, Thomas Massie, Thomas R. Carper, Tim Griffin, Tim Huelskamp, Tim Johnson, Tim Kaine, Tim Murphy, Tim Ryan, Tim Scott, Tim Walberg, Tim Walz, Timothy H. Bishop, Todd Rokita, Todd Young, Tom Coburn, Tom Cole, Tom Cotton, Tom Graves, Tom Harkin, Tom Latham, Tom Marino, Tom McClintock, Tom Petri, Tom Price, Tom Reed, Tom Rice, Tom Ronney, Tom Udall, Tony Cardenas, Trent Franks, Trey Gowdy, Tulsi Gabbard, Valerie E. Caproni, Vance McAllister, Vera Buchanan, Vernon S. Broderick, Vicky Hartzler, Victor Marrero, Vincent L. Briccetti, Virginia Foxx, Walter B. Jones, Wesley E. Brown, Wilfred Feinberg, William Cranch, William Keating, William Augustus Bootle, William Joseph Nealon, Jr, William Lacy Clay, Xavier Becerra, Yvette D. Clarke, Zoe Lofgren against United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks, Kenneth Posner. Pursuant to the order issued March 13, 2015, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with the Court's order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to each Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL: By order dated January 29, 2015, the Court directed Plaintiffs, within thirty days, to each submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") or pay the $400.00 in fees required to file a civil action in this Court. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiffs have not filed IFP applications or paid the fee. Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiffs IFP status for the limited purpose of dismissing the complaint without prejudice. The complaint is dismissed under Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with the Court's order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to each Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be take in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          LETTER from United States Ex Rel. Frederick Banks; re: RETURN OF SERVICE (of Complaint). Document filed by United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks.(sc) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this Order to each Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiffs are directed to render payment of the filing fee or each submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 3/2/2015. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Applications due by 3/2/2015. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/29/2015) (Attachments: # 1 IFP application)(ees) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT against Ronnie Abrams, Robert B. Aderholt, Jessica Albert, Lamar Alexander, Justin Amash, Mark Amodei, Kelly Ayotte, Michele Bachmann, Spencer Bachus, Harold Baer, Tammy Baldwin, Ron Barber, Lou Barletta, Andy Barr, John Barrasso, John Barrow, Joe L. Barton, Karen Bass, Deborah A. Batts, Joyce Beatty, Xavier Becerra, Mark Begich, Dan Benishek, Michael Bennett, Kerry Bentivolio, Ami Bera, Richard M. Berman, Herrera Jaime Beutler, Gus Bilirakis, Rob Bishop, Sanford D. Bishop, Jr, Timothy H. Bishop, Diane Black, Marsha Blackburn, Earl Blumenauer, Richard Blumenthal, Roy Blunt, James E. Boasberg, John A. Boehner, Suzanne Bonamici, Cory Booker, William Augustus Bootle, John Boozman, Charles Boustany, Jr, Barbara Boxer, Kevin Brady, Robert A. Brady, Bruce Braley, Jim Brennan, Vincent L. Briccetti, Jim Bridenstine, Vernon S. Broderick, Mo Brooks, Susan W. Brooks, Paul Broun, Corrine Brown, Sherrod Brown, Wesley E. Brown, James R. Browning, Julia Brownley, Bradley Bryne, Vera Buchanan, Larry Bucshon, Joseph Buffington, Michael C. Burgess, Richard M. Burr, Cheri Bustos, G.K. Butterfield, CIA Director, Ken Calvert, Dave Camp, John Campbell, Eric Cantor, Maria Cantwell, Shelley Moore Capito, Lois Capps, Valerie E. Caproni, Michael E. Capuano, Tony Cardenas, Benjamin L. Cardin, John Carney, Thomas R. Carper, Andre Carson, Andrew L. Carter, Jr, John Carter, Matt Cartwright, Bob Casey, Bill Cassidy, Keven P. Caster, Kathy Castor, Joaquin Castro, Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Central Intelligence Agency, Steve Chabot, Jason Chaffetz, Saxby Chambliss, Denny Chin, Judy Chu, David Cicilline, Katherine M. Clark, Yvette D. Clarke, William Lacy Clay, Emanuel Cleaver, II, Hillary Rodnam Clinton, James E. Clyburn, Dan Coats, Howard Coble, Tom Coburn, Thad Cochran, Mike Coffman, Steve Cohen, Tom Cole, Chris Collins, Doug Collins, Susan Collins, Rosemary M. Collyer, Commissioner and Director of the Bureau of Indian Affairs, K. Michael Conaway, Gerald D. Connolly, Joy Flowers Conti, John Conyers, Jr, Paul Cook, Chris Coons, Jim Cooper, Bob Corker, John Cornyn, Jim Costa, Denise L. Cote, Tom Cotton, Joe Courtney, Kevin Cramer, William Cranch, Michael D. Crapo, Rick Crawford, Ander Crenshaw, Myron Donovan Crocker, Paul A Crotty, Jospeh Crowley, Ted Cruz, Henry Cuellar, John Culberson, Elijah E. Cummings, Steve Daines, George B. Daniels, Danny K. Davis, Rodney Davis, Susan A. Davis, Peter A. DeFazio, Diana DeGette, Rosa DeLauro, Ron DeSantis, Raymond J. Dearie, Suzan DelBene, John Delaney, Jeff Denham, Charlie Dent, Department of Interior, Scott DesJarlais, Ted Deutch, Mario Diaz-Balart, John D. Dingell, Lloyd Doggett, Joe Donnelly, Mike Doyle, Tammy Duckworth, Keven T. Duffy, Sean P. Duffy, Jeff Duncan, John J. Duncan, Jr, Richard J. Durbin, Claire V. Eagan, David Norton Edelstein, Donna Edwards, Keith Ellison, Renee Ellmers, Eliot L. Engel, Paul A. Engelmayer, Bill Enyart, Michael B. Enzi, Anna G. Eshoo, Elizabeth Esty, Saylor Dennis F., IV, Katherine Polk Failla, Blake Farenthold, Sam Farr, Chaka Fattah, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Wilfred Feinberg, Dianne Feinstein, Martin L.C. Feldman, Stephen Fincher, Deb Fischer, Nora Barry Fischer, Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Jeff Flake, Chuck Fleischmann, John Fleming, Bill Flores, J. Randy Forbes, Jeff Fortenberry, Bill Foster, Virginia Foxx, Lois Frankel, Al Franken, Trent Franks, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Marcia L. Fudge, Tulsi Gabbard, Garret Gaetano, Pete Gallego, John Garamendi, Joe Garcia, Cory Gardner, Scott Garrett, Jim Gerlach, Bob Gibbs, Chris Gibson, Kirsten Gillibrand, Phil Gingrey, Louie Gohmert, Robert W. Goodlatte, Paul Gosar, Trey Gowdy, Lindsey Graham, Kay Granger, Charles E. Grassley, Sam Graves, Tom Graves, Alan Grayson, Gene Greene, Tim Griffin, Morgan Griffith, Raul M. Grijalva, Michael Grimm, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Brett Guthrie, Luis V. Gutierrez, Kay Hagan, Janice Hahn, Ralph M. Hall, Collen Hanabusa, Learned Hand, Richard Hanna, Tom Harkin, Gregg Harper, Andy Harris, Vicky Hartzler, Alcee L. Hastings, Doc Hastings, Orrin G. Hatch, Denny Heck, Joe Heck, Hedi Heitkamp, Dean Heller, Martin Henrich, Jeb Hensarling, Jim Himes, Ruben Hinojosa, Mazie K. Hirono, John Hoeven, Eric Holder, George Holding, Chris Van Hollen, Rush D. Holt, Michael M. Honda, Steven Horsford, Steny H. Hoyer, Richard Hudson, Tim Huelskamp, Jared Huffman, Bill Huizenga, Randy Hultgren, Duncan Hunter, Robert Hurt, Joseph Chappell Hutcheson, Jr, James M. Inhofe, Johnny Isakson, Steven Israel, Darrel Issa, Hakeem Jefferies, Lynn Jenkins, Mike Johanns, Bill Johnson, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Hank Johnson, Ron Johnson, Sam Johnson, Tim Johnson, David Jolly, Walter B. Jones, Jim Jordan, David Joyce, Tim Kaine, Marcy Kaptur, William Keating, John F. Keenan, Mike Kelly, Robin Kelly, Joseph P. Kennedy, II, Dan Kildee, Derek Kilmer, Ron Kind, Angus King, Peter T. King, Steve King, Jack Kingston, Adam Kinzinger, Mark S. Kirk, Ann Kirkpatrick, John Kline, Amy Klobuchar, John G. Koeltl, Earl Kohlbacker, Kyle Kohlbacker, Ann McLane Kuster, Doug LaMalfa, Raul R. Labrador, Doug Lamborn, Leonard Lance, Mary L. Landrieu, Jim Langevin, Sean Langford, James Lankford, Rick Larsen, John B. Larson, Tom Latham, Bob Latta, Patrick Leachy, Barbara Lee, Mike Lee, Shelia Jackson Lee, Carl Levin, Sander M. Levin, John Lewis, Frank A, LoBiondo, Dave Loebsack, Zoe Lofgren, Billy Long, Alan Lowenthal, Nita M. Lowery, Frank D. Lucas, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Ben Ray Lujan, Cynthia M. Lummis, Stephen F. Lynch, Seybourn Harris Lynne, Dan Maffei, Carolyn B. Maloney, Sean Patrick Maloney, Joe Manchin, III, Kenny Marchant, Tom Marino, Albert Branson Maris, Edward J. Markey, Victor Marrero, Thomas Massie, Jim Matheson, Doris Matsui, Vance McAllister, John McCain, Carolyn McCarthy, Kevin McCarthy, Claire McCaskill, Michael McCaul, Tom McClintock, Betty McCollum, Mitch McConnell, Jim McDermott, Jim McGovern, Patrick T. McHenry, Mike McIntyre, Howard "Buck" McKeon, David B, McKinley, Mary A. McLaughlin, Gloria Negrete McLeod, Colleen McMAHON, Edward Joseph McManus, Jerry McNerney, Mark Meadows, Patrick Meehan, Gregory W. Meeks, Robert Menendez, Grace Meng, Jeff Merkley, Luke Messer, Charles Miller Metzner, John L. Mica, Michael H. Michaud, Barbara A. Mikulski, Candice S. Miller, Gary G. Miller, George Miller, Jeff Miller, Gwen Moore, James P. Moran, Jerry Moran, Michael W. Mosman, Markwayne Mullin, Mick Mulvaney, Lisa Murkowski, Christopher S. Murphy, Patrick Murphy, Tim Murphy, Patty Murray, Jerrold Nadler, Grace F. Napolitano, Alison J. Nathan, Richard E. Neal, William Joseph Nealon, Jr, Bill Nelson, Randy Neugebauer, New York City Police Department, Kristi Noem, Ricj Nolan, Rich Nugent, Devin Nunes, Alan Nunnelee, Beto O'Rourke, Barack Obama, Charmaigne Odom, Paul J. Oetken, Pete Olson, Ben Orrison, Bill Owens, Steve M. Palazoo, Frank Pallone, Jr, Daniel Pantaleo, Bill Pascrell, Jr, Ed Pastor, Rand Paul, Erik Paulsen, Donald M. Payne, Jr, Steve Pearce, Nancy Pelosi, Ed Perlmutter, Scott Perry, Gary Peters, Scott Peters, Collin C. Peterson, Tom Petri, Orie Leon Phillips, Chellie Pingree, Robert Pittenger, Joe Pitts, Mark Pocan, Ted Poe, Jared Polis, Mike Pompeo, Rob Portman, Bill Posey, Henry Potter, David E. Price, Tom Price, Mark Pryor, Mike Quigley, Nick J. Rahall, II, Charles B. Rangel, Jack Reed, Tom Reed, Dave Reichert, Harry Reid, James B. Renacci, Renewal Inc., Reid Ribble, Tom Rice, Cedric L. Richmond, Scott Rigell, Jim Risch, Pat Roberts, Martha Roby, Jay Rockefeller, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Phil Roe, Harold Rogers, Mike Rogers, Mike D. Rogers, Dana Rohrabacher, Todd Rokita, Tom Ronney, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Peter Roskam, Dennis A. Ross, Keith Rothfus, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Ed Royce, Marco Rubio, Raul Ruiz, Jon Runyan, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Bobby L. Rush, Paul D. Ryan, Tim Ryan, Ken Salizar, Matt Salmon, Linda T. Sanchez, Loretta Sanchez, Bernard Sanders, Mark Sanford, John Sarbanes, Steve Scalise, Jan Schakowsky, Brian Schatz, Adam B. Schiff, Brad Schneider, Aaron Schock, Kurt Schrader, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Charles E. Schumer, Allyson Y. Schwartz, David Schweikert, Austin Scott, David Scott, Robert C. Scott, Tim Scott, Jim Sensenbrenner, Jose E. Serrano, Jeff Sessions, Pete Sessions, Terri A. Sewell, Jeanne Shaheen, Carol Shea-Porter, Richard C. Shelby, Brad Sherman, John Shimkus, Bill Shuster, Mike Simpson, Kyrsten Sinema, Albio Sires, Louise M. Slaughter, Adam Smith, Adrian Smith, Christopher H. Smith, Jason Smith, Lamar Smith, Steve Southerland, II, Southern District of New York United States Attorney's Office, Jackie Speier, Debbie Stabenow, Chris Stewart, Steve Stivers, Steve Stockman, Marlin Stutzman, Eric Swalwell, Mark Takano, Lee Terry, Jon Tester, Daniel Holcombe Thomas, Bennie Thompson, Glenn Thompson, Mike Thompson, Mac Thornberry, John Thune, Pat Tiberi, John F. Tierney, Scott Tipton, Dina Titus, Paul Tonko, Patrick J. Toomey, Niki Tsongas, Michael R. Turner, Mark Udall, Tom Udall, United States Attorney, United States Ex Rel Frederick Banks, United States Probation Department for the Western District for Pennsylvania, Fred Upton, David Valadao, Juan C. Vargas, Marc Veasey, Filemon Vela, Nydia M. Velazquez, Peter J. Visclosky, David Vitter, Ann Wagner, Tim Walberg, Greg Walden, Jackie Walorski, John Walsh, Tim Walz, Mark Warner, Elizabeth Warren, Maxine Waters, Henry A. Waxman, Randy Weber, Daniel Webster, Peter Welch, Brad Wenstrup, Lynn Westmoreland, Sheldon Whitehouse, Edward Whitfield, Roger Wicker, Rodger Williams, Doug Williams, Frederica S. Wilson, Joe Wilson, Rob Wittman, Frank R. Wolf, Steve Womack, Rob Woodall, Joseph William Woodrough, Susan Webber Wright, Ron Wyden, John Yarmuth, Kevin Yoder, Ted Yoho, George C. Young, Todd Young, Don Young, James B. Zagel. Document filed by Kenneth Posner. (Attachments: # 1 cmp 2, # 2 cmp 3)(laq) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kenneth Posner.(laq) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 49 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?