Gilbert v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-05032
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 1:09 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chanda Gilbert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Bufogle, Sr. +1 918 587 3407 +1 918 587 3437 jfbufogle@msn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Kirk Wood, Jr. +1 205 612 0243 +1 866 747 3905 ekirkwood1@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corp., Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chanda Gilbert. (Wood, Edward) Modified text on 8/13/2015 (LPH). (Entered: 08/12/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chanda Gilbert. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (Nemo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This Notice serves as a reminder to all counsel that they shall read and comply with all Orders and Pretrial Orders ("PTOs") filed in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN), even if not filed in the individual member cases. As the Court noted on May 28, 2014 (Doc. No. 326 ), the Court only files all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the master MDL docket. For example, PTO No. 29, filed today on the master MDL docket is applicable to all cases and should be read and complied with by all counsel for all cases. Indeed, counsel is responsible for all documents applicable to all actions and filed in the master MDL docket. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Further, all Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/27/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
        Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (LPH) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W Frank per MDL list referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel. Please use case number 14-cv-5032 DWF/FLN. (LPH) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Sales Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4239144.) Filed by Chanda Gilbert. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Edward) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 66 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?